Mandarini et al v. Northeast Services, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-11740
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 20, 2017 at 11:13 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James V. Merloni, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander M. Sugerman-Brozan +1 617 742 0208 abrozan@segalroitman.com
No Logo Joseph Bonfiglio, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander M. Sugerman-Brozan +1 617 742 0208 abrozan@segalroitman.com
No Logo Louis A. Mandarini, III, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander M. Sugerman-Brozan +1 617 742 0208 abrozan@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander M. Sugerman-Brozan +1 617 742 0208 abrozan@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander M. Sugerman-Brozan +1 617 742 0208 abrozan@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander M. Sugerman-Brozan +1 617 742 0208 abrozan@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander M. Sugerman-Brozan +1 617 742 0208 abrozan@segalroitman.com
No Logo New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander M. Sugerman-Brozan +1 617 742 0208 abrozan@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo Northeast Services, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1132
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Anne R. Sills on behalf of Joseph Bonfiglio, Louis A. Mandarini, III, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, James V. Merloni, Jr, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund (Sills, Anne) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Summons Issued as to Northeast Services, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Nici, Richard) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (adminn, ) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        COMPLAINT against Northeast Services, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6794395 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Joseph Bonfiglio, Louis A. Mandarini, III, Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, James V. Merloni, Jr, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet & Title Sheet)(Sugerman-Brozan, Alexander) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 34 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?