USA v. Jahanrakhshan
Criminal Case Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cr-00414-N

Tags
Last Updated July 23, 2018 at 12:41 PM DT (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Candina S Heath-DOJ +1 214 659 8634 +1 214 767 2846 candina.heath@usdoj.gov
Space Sid P Mody-DOJ +1 214 659 8600 Siddharth.Mody@usdoj.gov
No Logo Kamyar Jahanrakhshan, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Todd Hayden +1 214 678 9663 +1 214 631 2375 haydenlaw@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by BRODEN & MICKELSEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space F Clinton Broden +1 214 720 9552 +1 214 720 9594 clint@texascrimlaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (1)
Office Dallas
Filed 8/8/2017
County Dallas
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1030A.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. § 1030(a)(5)(A) and 18 U.S.C. § 1030(c)(4)(A)(i)(I) and (B) Knowingly Causing the Transmission of a Command to a Protected Computer
Defendant Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags EXH-ADM,TOLIVER
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 80 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 Memorandum Opinion and OrderCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan granting in part and denying in part [68] Motion for Acquittal or New Trial. The Court will, by separate order, reset the case for trial. The Court will, by separate proceeding, address what if any sanction or discipline should be imposed on Jahanrakhshan's counsel for their failure to provide Jahanrakhshan with an adequate defense. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/18/2018) (axm)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [77] Motion to Continue as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (1). The Court is currently reviewing pending motions and a sentencing date will be set at a later date. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/18/2018) (ndt)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 Motion to Continue
      Unopposed MOTION to Continue Sentencing Hearing filed by USA as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Heath-DOJ, Candina)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 76 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [74] Motion for Leave to File. as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (1) (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/12/2018) (chmb)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018, Terminated: 6/12/2018 motion for leave to file
          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Objections to the PSR filed by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Hayden, Steven)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 reply
            REPLY filed by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan re: [68] MOTION for Judgment of Acquittal or, in the Alternative, New Trial. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment F) (rekc)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 71 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [70] Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (1)(Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/17/2018) (chmb)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018, Terminated: 5/17/2018 motion for leave to file
                MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Government's Response to Defendant's Motion for Judgment of Acquittal or, in the Alternative, New Trial filed by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit(s) Reply to Government's Response to Defendant's Motion for Judgment of Acquittal or, in the Alternative, New Trial, # (3) Exhibit(s) Attachment F to Reply to Government's Response to Defendant's Motion for Judgment of Acquittal or, in the Alternative, New Trial) (Broden, F)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: 5/9/2018 Response/Objection
                  RESPONSE AND OBJECTION by USA as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan re: [68] MOTION for Acquittal Judgment of Acquittal or, in the Alternative, New Trial (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Attachment A, # (2) Exhibit(s) Attachment B, # (3) Exhibit(s) Attachment C, # (4) Exhibit(s) Attachment D, # (5) Exhibit(s) Attachment E) (Heath-DOJ, Candina)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018, Terminated: 7/18/2018 Motion for Acquittal
                    MOTION for Acquittal Judgment of Acquittal or, in the Alternative, New Trial filed by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A, # (2) Attachment B, # (3) Attachment C, # (4) Attachment D, # (5) Attachment E) (Broden, F)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [66] Motion for Extension of Time as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (1). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/3/2018) (aaa)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: 4/2/2018, Terminated: 4/3/2018 MOTION for Extension of Time
                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 29(c) and/or Fed. R. Crim. P. 33(b) filed by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Broden, F)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Scheduling Order - SentencingCourt Filing
                          Sentencing Scheduling Order as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan: Presentence Investigation Report due by 5/21/2018. Sentencing set for 6/25/2018 09:00 AM before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/23/2018) (ndt)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Jury ChargeCourt Filing
                            Jury Charge as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan. Signed by Judge David C Godbey on 3/22/2018. (ndt)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 61 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                              ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: Jury Trial as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan held on 3/22/2018 Location interval set to: LC. Closing arguments and jury verdict. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Candina Heath and Sid Mody; Defense - Steven Todd Hayden and F. Clinton Broden. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (Exhibits admitted by goveernment; Submitted to Court on CD) Time in Court - 05:00. (chmb)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Court's Exhibit/Witness List
                                Court's Exhibit and Witness List from Trial held 3/19/2018-3/22/2018 as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan. (ndt)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 jury verdict
                                  JURY VERDICT as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (1) Guilty on Count 1 Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (1) Guilty of Lesser Offense Count 1 Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (1) Not Guilty on Count 1. (ndt)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 60 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                    ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: 3rd day of Jury Trial as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan held on 3/21/2018 Location interval set to: LC. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Candina Heath and Sid Mody; Defense - Steven Todd Hayden and F. Clinton Broden. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - 05:30. (chmb)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Motion for Acquittal
                                      MOTION for Acquittal filed by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Broden, F)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: 3/21/2018 Notice - other
                                        NOTICE of Jury Stipulation filed by USA, Kamyar Jahanrakhshan as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan. (epm)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: 3/21/2018 Proposed Jury Charge/Instructions
                                          Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Broden, F)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 56 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: 3/21/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                            ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: 2nd day of Jury Trial as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan held on 3/20/2018 Location interval set to: LC. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Candina Heath and Sid Mody; Defense - Steven Todd Hayden and F. Clinton Broden. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - 03:15. (chmb)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 55 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: 3/21/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                              ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: 1st day of Jury Trial as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan held on 3/19/2018 Location interval set to: LC. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Candina Heath and Sid Mody; Defense - Steven Todd Hayden and F. Clinton Broden. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - 04:30. (chmb)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 Jury Roll
                                                (Document Restricted) Jury Roll as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (This document is for district court access only and will not be included in any ROA that may later be prepared.) (epm)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Trial Brief
                                                  TRIAL BRIEF by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Broden, F)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 52 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                    ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: Pretrial Conference as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan held on 3/16/2018. Location interval set to: LC. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Candina Heath/Sid Moody; Defense - Steven Hayden/Clint Broden. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :30. (Interpreter N/A.) (kkf)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: 3/15/2018 Response/Objection
                                                      Amended OBJECTION by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan re: [41] Notice (Other) (Broden, F) Modified title on 3/16/2018 (awc).
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: 3/15/2018 Trial Brief
                                                        TRIAL BRIEF by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Attachments: # (1) Additional Page(s) Attachments A-D) (Broden, F)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: 3/15/2018 Response/Objection
                                                          OBJECTION by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan re: [41] Notice (Other) (Broden, F)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: 3/15/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by F Clinton Broden (Clerk to Set Designation as: Retained) appearing for Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Broden, F)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Witness List and First Amended Exhibit LIst filed by USA as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Amendment First Amended Witness List, # (2) Proposed Amendment First Amended Exhibit List) (Heath-DOJ, Candina)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 witness list
                                                                WITNESS LIST by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Hayden, Steven)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 Exhibit
                                                                  EXHIBIT LIST by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Hayden, Steven)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 proposed voir dire
                                                                    Proposed Voir Dire by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Hayden, Steven)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 Proposed Jury Charge/Instructions
                                                                      Proposed Jury Charge filed by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Hayden, Steven)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 Designation of Experts
                                                                        Designation of Experts (Hayden, Steven)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/11/2018, Entered: 3/11/2018 Notice - other
                                                                          NOTICE of Government's Intent to Introduce Records Under Fed. R. Evid. 902(11) filed by USA as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Heath-DOJ, Candina)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 witness list
                                                                            WITNESS LIST by USA as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Heath-DOJ, Candina)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Exhibit
                                                                              EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Heath-DOJ, Candina)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Proposed Jury Charge/Instructions
                                                                                Proposed Jury Instructions filed by USA as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Heath-DOJ, Candina)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 proposed voir dire
                                                                                  Proposed Voir Dire by USA as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Heath-DOJ, Candina)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sid P Mody-DOJ appearing for USA . (Clerk to set designation as: Assistant US Attorney). (Mody-DOJ, Sid)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/4/2018, Entered: 3/4/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                      NOTICE Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 16(a)(1)(G) filed by USA as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Heath-DOJ, Candina)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                        NOTICE of Intent to Introduce Evidence Pursuant to FRE 404(b) filed by USA as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Heath-DOJ, Candina)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                          Correspondence filed by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan. (aaa) Modified docket text and event per DJ Chambers on 1/23/2018 (aaa).
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: 1/8/2018 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (1): This Order addresses the Defendant's [29] Motion to Expedite the Trial filed 12/22/2017 and the Government's Response and Objection to the motion filed 1/8/2018. The Court therefore denies the motion to expedite. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/8/2018) (sss)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: 1/8/2018 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (1): This Order addresses the Defendant's Motion in Limine and Request for Expedited Hearing filed 11/22/2017, the Defendant's Motion to Amend and/or Correct the Motion in Limine filed 11/29/2017 and the Government's Response and Objection to the motions filed 12/6/2017. At this time, the motions are denied as being premature. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/8/2018) (sss)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: 1/8/2018 Response/Objection
                                                                                                RESPONSE AND OBJECTION by USA as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan re: [29] MOTION to Expedite Trial (Heath-DOJ, Candina)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017, Terminated: 1/8/2018 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                  MOTION to Expedite Trial filed by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Hayden, Steven)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Response/Objection
                                                                                                    RESPONSE AND OBJECTION by USA as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan re: [25] MOTION to Amend/Correct [24] MOTION in Limine and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Clerical and E-Signature), [24] MOTION in Limine and Request for Expedited Hearing (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Email 2/2/2015) (Heath-DOJ, Candina)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017, Terminated: 1/8/2018 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct [24] MOTION in Limine and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Clerical and E-Signature) filed by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Hayden, Steven)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017, Terminated: 1/8/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Hayden, Steven)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 10/30/2017 order on motion to revokeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: denying [14] Motion to Revoke as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (1); Motion Hearing as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan held on 10/18/2017 re [14] MOTION to Revoke Detention Order (De Novo) filed by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan. re: [14] MOTION to Revoke Detention Order (De Novo) Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Candina Heath; Defense - Steven Todd Hayden. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 01:05. (chmb)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: 10/26/2017 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan. Jury Trial set for one-week docket beginning 3/19/2018 before Judge David C Godbey. Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2018 10:00 AM before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/26/2017) (rekc)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: 10/26/2017 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [16] MOTION to Continue Trial Date and to Declare the Case Complex as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (1). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/26/2017) (rekc)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 motion for discovery
                                                                                                                MOTION for Discovery Reciprocal filed by USA as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Heath-DOJ, Candina)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE AND OBJECTION by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan re: [16] MOTION to Continue Trial Date and to Declare the Case Complex (Hayden, Steven)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: 10/17/2017 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE AND OBJECTION by USA as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan re: [14] MOTION to Revoke Detention Order (De Novo) (Heath-DOJ, Candina)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: 10/17/2017 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan re: [16] MOTION to Continue Trial Date and to Declare the Case Complex (Hayden, Steven)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017, Terminated: 10/26/2017 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Continue Trial Date and to Declare the Case Complex filed by USA as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Heath-DOJ, Candina)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Order Setting Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan: This Order addresses the Defendant's Motion to Revoke Detention Order (De Novo) filed October 12, 2017. The motion is set for hearing on Wednesday, 10/18/2017 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 1505. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/16/2017) (ndt)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: 10/12/2017, Terminated: 10/30/2017 motion to revoke
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Revoke Detention Order (De Novo) filed by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Hayden, Steven)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's one-week docket beginning 11/13/17. A final pretrial conference in this case is set for 11/9/17 at 10:00 a.m. Lead counsel must attend the pretrial conference. All pretrial motions will be heard and resolved at that time and procedures for trial will be discussed. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/10/2017) (ash)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven Todd Hayden (Clerk to Set Designation as: Retained) appearing for Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Hayden, Steven)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/22/2017 Warrant Returned
                                                                                                                                  Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 9/15/2017 as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan. (aaa)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: 9/18/2017 Arraignment/Not GuiltyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney: Arraignment as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (1) Count 1 held on 9/15/2017. Plea entered by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan: Not Guilty on count(s) 1 Location interval set to: LC. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :01. (rekc)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: 9/18/2017 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                      (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Kamyar Jahanrakhshan. (rekc)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: 9/18/2017 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney: Initial Appearance as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan held on 9/15/2017. Date of Arrest: 7/26/2017 Location interval set to: LC. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :02. (rekc)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: 8/28/2017 Rule 5/32/40 Documents Received
                                                                                                                                          Rule 5 Documents Received as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan Date Arrested: 7/26/2017 (ykp)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: 8/9/2017 indictment
                                                                                                                                            INDICTMENT as to Kamyar Jahanrakhshan (1) count 1. (ran)
                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 49 times.

                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?