United States v. Brooks
Federal Civil Lawsuit South Carolina District Court, Case No. 6:17-cv-02010
District Judge Timothy M. Cain, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 17, 2019 at 11:49 PM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Douglas Barnett +1 803 929 3000 +1 803 252 2759 doug.barnett@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Barbara D Brooks, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barbara D Brooks

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara D Brooks
No Logo Coach Hills Homeowner's Association Inc, Defendant
No Logo Dennis D Brooks, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dennis D Brooks

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis D Brooks
No Logo Greenville County Tax Collector, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by greenvillecounty.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey D Wile +1 864 467 7111 +1 864 467 5964 jwile@greenvillecounty.org
No Logo South Carolina Department of Revenue, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by South Carolina Department of Revenue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean Gordon Ryan +1 803 898 5375 ryans@sctax.org

Toggle Switch Represented by South Carolina Office of Regulatory Staff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kiera Courtney Dillon +1 803 898 5213 kiera.dillon@dor.sc.gov
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7402
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopts in part 114 Report and Recommendation. The court adopts the portion of the magistrate judges Report that recommends that the Plaintiff be granted default judgment establishing that Defendant Coach Hills has no interest in, and can take nothing from, any sale of the property described in the complaint. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 11/16/2018. (gpre, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ***DOCUMENT MAILED 16 Notice Change of Case Number, placed in U.S. Mail to Barbara D Brooks and Dennis D Brooks (kmca) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER. New case number 6-17-cv-2010-TMC-JDA. Please make a note of it for all future filings as well as Judge's preferences. (kmca) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Pro Se ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Barbara D Brooks, Dennis D Brooks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Courthouse closed 9/11/17)(kmca) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Greenville County Tax Collector.(Wile, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Department of Revenue.(Dillon, Kiera) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ANSWER to 1 Complaint by South Carolina Department of Revenue.(Dillon, Kiera) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Dennis D Brooks served on 8/21/2017, answer due 9/11/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Barnett, John) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Coach Hills Homeowner's Association Inc served on 8/16/2017, answer due 9/6/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Barnett, John) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Barbara D Brooks served on 8/21/2017, answer due 9/11/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Barnett, John) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Greenville County Tax Collector served on 8/16/2017, answer due 9/6/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Barnett, John) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Greenville County Tax Collector.(Wile, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Summons Issued as to Dennis D Brooks, Barbara D Brooks, Greenville County Tax Collector, Coach Hills Homeowner's Association Inc, South Carolina Department of Revenue. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Barbara D Brooks, # 2 Summons Greenville County Tax Collector, # 3 Summons Coach Hills Homeowner's Association Inc, # 4 Summons South Carolina Dept of Revenue)(kmca) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America.(kmca) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              COMPLAINT against Barbara D Brooks, Dennis D Brooks, Coach Hills Homeowner's Association Inc, Greenville County Tax Collector, South Carolina Department of Revenue, filed by United States of America. Service due by 10/26/2017.(kmca) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 118 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?