Erin Jones v. PHEAA
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 17-56224

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 22, 2017 at 11:33 PM DT (3.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Filed order MEDIATION (KS): On or before September 28, 2017, counsel for appellee shall provide a status report by email to all counsel and the Circuit Mediator (Kay_Suk@ca9.uscourts.gov). The status report should not be filed with the court. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellant shall file an opening brief on or before November 13, 2017; appellee shall file an answering brief on or before December 13, 2017; appellant may file an optional reply brief within twenty one (21) days from the service date of the answering brief. [10586362] (GWL) [Entered: 09/19/2017 01:24 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Filed (ECF) Appellant Erin C. Jones Correspondence: Certificate of transcript. Date of service: 09/18/2017 [10584511] [17-56224] (Chami, David) [Entered: 09/18/2017 11:06 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 09/18/2017, 2:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [10560618] (CL) [Entered: 08/28/2017 12:21 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Filed (ECF) Appellant Erin C. Jones Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/18/2017. [10551093] [17-56224] (Chami, David) [Entered: 08/18/2017 05:43 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/22/2017. Appellant Erin C. Jones opening brief due 10/13/2017. Appellee Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency answering brief due 11/13/2017. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [10544725] (JBS) [Entered: 08/15/2017 09:39 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 51 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?