Banks v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Tennessee Middle District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-01290
District Judge Aleta A. Trauger, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 30, 2018 at 11:41 AM ST (3.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FREDERICK BANKS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by #05711-068

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space FREDERICK BANKS
v.
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Respondent
Officially listed as "Central Intelligence Agency"
No Logo District Attorney, Nashville, Respondent
No Logo Governor, State of Tennessee, Respondent
No Logo Metropolitan Nashville Police Department, Respondent
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Respondent
Officially listed as "Mike Pompeo"
No Logo Office of the Tennessee Attorney General, Respondent
Officially listed as "Tennessee Attorney General"
No Logo Tennessee, state of, Respondent
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Appeal In Forma Pauperis
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Appeal In Forma Pauperis
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Frederick Banks. (dt) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Frederick Banks.(dt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2017: # 1 Attachment - Cover Letter) (dt). (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 17 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?