PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-01937

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 20, 2019 at 11:37 AM ST (1.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Public Citizen, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Citizen Litigation Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009
2025881000 Adina Rosenbaum +1 202 588 1000 +1 202 588 7795 arosenbaum@citizen.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean M Sherman +1 202 588 1000 ssherman@citizen.org
v.
Executive Office of the President Office Of Management And Budget Executive Office of the President Office Of Management And Budget, Defendant
Officially listed as "OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
725 17th Street NW
Washington, DC 20503 Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                    ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET.(Sroka, Scott)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Sean M. Sherman on behalf of PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. (Sherman, Sean) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Sroka, Scott)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: 9/26/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order.Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 09/26/17. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: 9/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                            SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5127842) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Sherman, Sean) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?