ABDULRAZZAQ v. TRUMP
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-01928

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 28, 2019 at 1:29 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HARVEY RISHIKOF, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stein, Mitchell & Mezines, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Denis Charles Mitchell +1 202 737 7777 +1 202 296 8312 dmitchell@steinmitchell.com
, Robert F. Muse +1 202 737 7777 +1 202 296 8312 rmuse@steinmitchell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Jason T. Cohen +1 202 305 0207 +1 202 305 0275 jason.cohen@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
, , , , Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
No Logo NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Dazey, Jr. +1 317 383 3520 +1 317 383 3525 bill.dazey@fd.org
, William E Marsh +1 317 383 3520 bill.marsh@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Hennigan Bennett & Dorman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Louis Palmer +1 213 694 1200 +1 213 694 1234 palmer@hbdlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC - Houston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Tiffany Heavlin +1 202 370 8322 +1 202 370 8344 theavlin@mckoolsmith.com
, Brent Nelson Rushforth +1 202 370 8304 +1 202 370 8344 brushforth@mckoolsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF MILITARY COMMISSIONS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam Marc Thurschwell +1 571 256 9694 adam.thurschwell@osd.mil
v.
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "DONALD J. TRUMP"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, SALVATORE T. ALFANO +1 973 743 9390 stalfano@aol.com
, , , HUGH J. BRACKEN +1 610 565 4776 hjbracken@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , PETER S. PANTALEO

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard L. Posen +1 212 728 8000

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Roxane Sokolove Marenberg +1 202 861 3900 +1 202 689 7415 roxane.marenberg@piperrudnick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Allyson Newton Ho +1 214 466 4180 +1 214 466 4001 aho@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by J. SHANE CREAMER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , J. SHANE CREAMER

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , JOHN J. BARRY +1 973 622 4444

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Fred Fisher Fielding +1 202 739 5560 +1 202 739 3001 fred.fielding@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael E. Kenneally +1 202 739 5893 michael.kenneally@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jason R. Scherr +1 202 373 6709 jr.scherr@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Eric W. Sitarchuk +1 215 963 5840 +1 215 963 5001 eric.sitarchuk@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SPRAGUE & SPRAGUE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , RICHARD A. SPRAGUE +1 215 561 7681 rasprague@spragueandsprague.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stark & Stark PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , JOHN LEWIS LASKEY +1 609 945 7638 jlaskey@stark-stark.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
, , , Judith E. Coleman +1 202 637 5600 judith.coleman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Joseph A. Darrow +1 202 598 2445 joseph.a.darrow@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 07/11/2018, TERMINATED: 07/11/2018, TERMINATED: 07/11/2018, TERMINATED: 07/11/2018, TERMINATED: 07/11/2018, TERMINATED: 07/11/2018, TERMINATED: 07/11/2018 Ethan Price Davis +1 202 514 9242 +1 202 616 8470 ethan.p.davis@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Kathryn Celia Davis +1 202 616 8298 +1 202 616 8470 Kathryn.C.Davis@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 08/17/2018, TERMINATED: 08/17/2018, TERMINATED: 08/17/2018, TERMINATED: 08/17/2018, TERMINATED: 08/17/2018, TERMINATED: 08/17/2018, TERMINATED: 08/17/2018, TERMINATED: 08/17/2018, TERMINATED: 08/17/2018, TERMINATED: 08/17/2018, TERMINATED Stephen McCoy Elliott +1 202 305 8177 stephen.elliott@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Brian J. Field +1 202 252 2551 +1 202 234 2806 brian.field@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 08/25/2017, TERMINATED: 08/25/2017, TERMINATED: 08/25/2017, TERMINATED: 08/25/2017 David Bernard Glazer +1 415 744 6477 +1 415 744 6476 david.glazer@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Robert Healy +1 202 514 8095 +1 202 616 8470 christopher.healy@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Coby Healy Howell +1 503 727 1023 +1 503 727 1117 coby.howell@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 01/22/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/22/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/22/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/22/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/22/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/22/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/2 Elizabeth Lanier Kade +1 202 616 8491 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.l.kade@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED REBECCA M. KOPPLIN +1 202 514 3953 rebecca.m.kopplin@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jacqueline Margaret Leonard +1 202 305 0493 +1 202 305 0506 jacqueline.leonard@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 07/02/2018, TERMINATED: 07/02/2018, TERMINATED: 07/02/2018, TERMINATED: 07/02/2018, TERMINATED: 07/02/2018, TERMINATED: 07/02/2018, TERMINATED: 07/02/2018 Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven A. Myers +1 202 305 8648 +1 202 616 8460 steven.a.myers@usdoj.gov
, , , Romney Sharpe Philpott +1 202 305 0258 romney.philpott@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joshua Samuel Press +1 202 305 0106 +1 202 305 7000 joshua.press@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SCOTT WEBSTER REID +1 215 861 8358 scott.reid@usdoj.gov
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO Brad P. Rosenberg +1 202 514 3374 +1 202 616 8460 brad.rosenberg@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Michael Sandberg +1 202 514 5838 +1 202 616 8202 justin.sandberg@usdoj.gov
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO Daniel Schwei +1 202 305 8693 +1 202 616 8470 daniel.s.schwei@usdoj.gov
, Nikhel Sus +1 202 514 2071 +1 202 616 8470 nikhel.s.sus@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Kristina Ann Wolfe +1 202 353 4519 kristina.wolfe@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Kathryn L. Wyer +1 202 616 8475 kathryn.wyer@usdoj.gov
No Logo JAMES N. MATTIS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Shanna Laura Cronin +1 202 252 2574 shanna.cronin@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
, , , , Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
No Logo DAVID CULPEPPER, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
, , , , Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
No Logo EDWARD B. CASHMAN, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
, , , , Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (209) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 117 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Joint STATUS REPORT by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: 11/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP (Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 111 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: 11/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT filed by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Declaration, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Classified Filing by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP (Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Joint STATUS REPORT by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Joint STATUS REPORT by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Ronald James Wiltsie (Wiltsie, Ronald) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Terry Marcus Henry (Henry, Terry)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Andrew I. Warden (Warden, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: 10/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP (Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 103 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: 10/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT filed by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit SMO Declaration, # 2 Exhibit SMO Declaration, # 3 Exhibit SMO Declaration, # 4 Exhibit SMO Declaration, # 5 Exhibit SMO Declaration, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Document Under Seal by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP (Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 101 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT filed by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP (Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 99 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT filed by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Medical Record, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Public Filing by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Joint Status Report (public), # 2 Exhibit Declaration (public))(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP (Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 96 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT filed by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP (Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 94 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT filed by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Public Filing by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Joint Status Report, # 2 Exhibit Joint Staus Report Ex. 1 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Joint Status Report Ex. 2 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Joint Status Report Ex. 3 Filing)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP (Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 91 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT filed by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Military Commission Filing, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: 7/25/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE re 89 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 Compel
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Discovery by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Thurschwell, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                              Joint STATUS REPORT by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: 7/5/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Discovery Conference by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ, EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter, # 2 Exhibit Letter)(Wiltsie, Ronald) Modified event and text on 7/12/2018 (ztd).
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                Joint STATUS REPORT by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint STATUS REPORT by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: 6/6/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Public Filing by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Joint Status Report, # 2 Exhibit Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Letter)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 82 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT filed by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Letter, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Public Filing by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Status Report, # 2 Exhibit Declaration)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 80 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: 5/24/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT filed by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Public Filing of May 17, 2018 Joint Status Report by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP re 78 Sealed Document, (Attachments: # 1 Joint Status Report, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Joint Status Report, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Joint Status Report, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Joint Status Report, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Joint Status Report)(Henry, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 78 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT filed by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Joint Status Report, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Joint Status Report, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Joint Status Report, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Joint Status Report)(Henry, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to 73 Status Report --Exhibit 2-- by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2)(Henry, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT CJA Form 23 Financial Affidavit by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ. (Thurschwell, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 74 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT filed by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP re 73 Status Report (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Henry, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint STATUS REPORT by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Henry, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Regarding Camp II, Building (refiled due to linkage issue) by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, DONALD J. TRUMP, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, TOM COPERMAN, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, ASHTON B. CARTER, JOHN DOE, DAVID E. HEATH, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD J. TRUMP, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, JAY HOOD, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, KYLE J. COZAD, DAVID HEATH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD J. TRUMP, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wiltsie, Ronald) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE Regarding Camp II, Building 8 by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wiltsie, Ronald) Modified on 4/24/2018 to enter in error due to linkage issues; counsel will refile.(ztnr) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heavlin, Tiffany)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint STATUS REPORT by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ERRATA Supplementing Respondent's Reply Concerning Order to Show Cause by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY Supporting Respondents' 66 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Wiltsie, Ronald) Modified on 4/10/2018 to add docket link (jf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, Petitioner's Reply to Respondent's Response to Order to Show Cause filed by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Medical Record Production Table, # 2 Exhibit Feb. 4 Transcript, # 3 Exhibit Email)(Hensler, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: 4/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint STATUS REPORT by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP . (Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint STATUS REPORT by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declartion, # 2 Exhibit Notice)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 47 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Second Amended Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transcript, # 2 Exhibit Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Transcript)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 2-9-18; Page Numbers: 1-33. Date of Issuance:2-28-18. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2018.(Wallace, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint STATUS REPORT by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE re 47 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Second Amended Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Interrogation Summary)(Thurschwell, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 2-9-18; Page Numbers: 1-33. Date of Issuance:2-26-18. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2018.(Wallace, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: 2/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint STATUS REPORT by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to the Briefing Schedule by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hensler, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE re [53] Notice (Other) Respondents' Opposition To Motion For Temporary Restraining Order filed by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Feb. 4 Transcript, # (2) Exhibit Feb. 6 Transcript, # (3) Exhibit Jan. 31 Transcript)(Warden, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint STATUS REPORT by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Senior Medical Officer, # (2) Exhibit Military Commission Transcript)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Hensler, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Amelia Hensler on behalf of NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Hensler, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Regarding Camp Four by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Rear Admiral Cashman)(Warden, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint STATUS REPORT by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Decl. of Senior Medical Officer)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Order Unopposed Motion for Briefing Schedule for Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Petitioner's Second Amended Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Petitioners Unopposed Motion)(Thurschwell, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint STATUS REPORT by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Senior Medical Officer, # (2) Exhibit E-Mail)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Second Amended Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration, # (2) Exhibit Declaration, # (3) Exhibit Declaration, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint STATUS REPORT by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Senior Medical Officer, # (2) Exhibit Declaration of James Cobey, M.D.)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint STATUS REPORT by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Senior Medical Officer)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint STATUS REPORT by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Senior Medical Officer)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Thurschwell, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Relief from filing courtesy copies of classified filing by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Thurschwell, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint STATUS REPORT by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Decl of Senior Medical Officer)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Reply to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY re [36] Notice (Other), Petitioner's Reply to Respondents' Response to Petitioner's Revised Proposed Orders Concerning Counsel Access and Forced Cell Extractions filed by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ. (Rushforth, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Abu-Elgassim Gadem, Raul Ayala, Aimee M. Cooper, and Adam Thurschwell's Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information, Acknowledgment and Affirmation by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Rushforth, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Robert L. Palmer's Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information, Acknowledgment and Affirmation by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Rushforth, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Proposed Date for Response to the Amended Petition by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP (Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE Respondents' Response to Petitioner's Revised Proposed Orders Concerning Counsel Access and Forced Cell Extractions by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP re [30] Notice of Proposed Order, [31] Notice of Proposed Order (Wiltsie, Ronald) Modified event title on 11/6/2017 (znmw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint STATUS REPORT by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP filed by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ. (Attachments: # (1) Petitioner's Exhibit List, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit G, # (9) Exhibit H, # (10) Exhibit I, # (11) Exhibit J, # (12) Exhibit K, # (13) Exhibit L, # (14) Exhibit M, # (15) Exhibit N, # (16) Exhibit O, # (17) Exhibit P, # (18) Exhibit Q, # (19) Exhibit R, # (20) Exhibit S, # (21) Exhibit T, # (22) Redlined Version of Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus)(Rushforth, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Notice of withdrawal of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ re [32] MOTION for Relief from Filing Courtesy Copies of Classified Filings (Rushforth, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 11/1/2017.....MOTION for Relief from Filing Courtesy Copies of Classified Filings by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Rushforth, Brent) Modified event title on 10/31/2017 (znmw). Modified on 11/2/2017 (znmw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Proposed Order Concerning "Forced Cell Extractions" by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Rushforth, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Proposed Order re October 19, 2017 hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Rushforth, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental STATUS REPORT of Respondents by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental STATUS REPORT by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Rushforth, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of Supplemental Declaration by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # (1) Supplementary Declaration)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE Of Filing Of Public Version Of Exhibit #3 In Support Of Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion For Preliminary Injunction by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP re [19] Sealed Document, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 3 - Public Version)(Warden, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint STATUS REPORT by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ. (Rushforth, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint STATUS REPORT by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ, EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald James Wiltsie on behalf of EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP (Wiltsie, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Regarding Camp Five Echo Block by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, DONNIE THOMAS, TOM COPERMAN, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, ASHTON B. CARTER, JOHN DOE, DAVID E. HEATH, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD J. TRUMP, ROBERT GATES, ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, JAY HOOD, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, KYLE J. COZAD, DAVID HEATH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD J. TRUMP, ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD J. TRUMP, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1: Cashman Declaration)(Warden, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT filed by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ re [20] Reply to opposition to Motion (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal))(Rushforth, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re [10] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Exhibit 1 filed by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Sealed), # (2) Exhibit B)(Rushforth, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT filed by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP re [18] Memorandum in Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 3, # (2) Exhibit 4)(Warden, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re [10] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Exhibit 1 filed by EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Text of Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Rushforth, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/05/17. (Attachment: # (1) Exhibit 1) (mac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Marc Thurschwell on behalf of NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Thurschwell, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew I. Warden on behalf of EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP (Warden, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP (Henry, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint STATUS REPORT by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ. (Rushforth, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER. In view of [10] petitioner's motion for preliminary injunction, plaintiffs are HEREBY DIRECTED to contact forthwith the Department of Justice to identify counsel for the respondent. The parties shall thereafter submit, by no later than 5:00 pm on October 2, 2017, a joint status report proposing a date and time for a status conference to be held by no later than seven calendar days from the date of the filing of the motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/29/2017. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Exhibit 1 by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support Points and Authorities and Exhibits A-B, # (2) Declaration of Aimee M. Cooper and Exhibits A-K, # (3) Declaration of James Cobey, M.D. and 1-5, # (4) Certificate of Service)(Rushforth, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert L. Palmer, :Firm- McKool Smith Hennigan, :Address- 300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Phone No. - 213-694-1149. Fax No. - 213-694-1234 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5134577. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Declaration of Robert L. Palmer, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Rushforth, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/26/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/25/2017. (Rushforth, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP, and U.S. Attorney. (znmw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Request for Summons to Issue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE directed to Donald J. Trump, James N. Mattis, Harvey Rishikof, Captain David Culpepper, Rear Admiral Edward B. Cashman (Respondents) and Channing D. Phillips (U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia) filed by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ.(Rushforth, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Nelson Rushforth on behalf of NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Rushforth, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Errata
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ERRATA Correcting Initial Case Caption Pursuant to Local Rule 5.1(c) and 11.1 by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ [1] Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ. (Heavlin, Tiffany)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Heavlin on behalf of NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ (Heavlin, Tiffany)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ. Case related to Case No. 09-1462. (jf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4616087272.) filed by NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER. The Court, sua sponte, cancels the motions hearing scheduled for November 14, 2018. In the event the Court is unable to resolve the pending motion to dismiss without a hearing, the Court will advise the parties and reschedule the hearing for a mutually agreeable date and time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/26/2018. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER STAYING CASE. In view of the motion hearing scheduled for November 14, 2018, further proceedings in this case are STAYED pending the hearing and Courts resolution of the pending Motion to Dismiss, EXCEPT that the parties shall continue to file the biweekly joint status reports ordered in the Courts Minute Order of October 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/8/2018. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Stayed (mac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER denying 89 motion to compel discovery without prejudice to refiling, if appropriate, following the Court's ruling on 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 47 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/7/2018. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER. The Court, sua sponte, schedules a motion hearing to hear oral argument on the pending 47 Motion to Dismiss. The motion hearing shall take place on November 14, 2018 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 24A. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/7/2018. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (mac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER. In view of 64 respondent's response to order to show cause in which the respondent stated that it would be able to eliminate approximately two weeks from the production of medical records, 66 petitioner's reply, and 67 respondent's reply, as well as the biweekly joint status reports submitted between May 3, 2018, and July 26, 2018, it appears to the Court that the respondent has produced some of the medical records on a faster schedule. For example, medical records created in mid May 2018 were produced on June 13, 2018, and medical records created on May 11, 2018 were produced on June 22, 2018. The Court credits the respondent's explanation regarding the constraints on a shorter production schedule, the availability of a weekly courier to bring the documents from Guantanamo Bay to Washington, DC, and the need for the records to undergo classification review. Id. at 3-7. Therefore, the Court discharges the order to show cause. In discharging this order to show cause, the Court expects the respondent to "produce [medical] records 'approximately monthly' for records created approximately 4 to 6 weeks earlier" as stated in the respondent's response to the Courts order to show cause. ECF No. 64 at 7. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/7/2018. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER denying 87 joint request for discovery conference. Any discovery related motion shall be filed by no later than 5:00 pm on July 23, 2018. A response shall be filed by no later than 5:00 pm on July 25, 2018. The motion and the response shall be no longer than 5 pages each. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/20/2018. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery Related Motions due on 7/23/2018 By 5:00PM. Responses due on 7/25/2018 by 5:00PM. (mac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting 70 motion for withdrawal of counsel. Tiffany Heavlin is hereby withdrawn as counsel in this proceeding. Attorney Tiffany Heavlin terminated. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/20/2018. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER. In view of 54, 60, and 63 joint status reports, the respondent is HEREBY ORDERED to show cause by no later than April 3, 2018, why medical records cannot be released to habeas counsel in a non-classified format within two weeks of creation. Petitioner shall respond to respondent's response to this show cause order by no later than April 6, 2018. Also in view of 60 joint status report, the Court has been unable to locate a pending request before this Court from the petitioner to allow him to be examined by an independent medical examiner. To the extent the petitioner seeks such relief, it must be filed as a motion with this Court. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/27/2018. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Respondent To Show Cause due by 4/3/2018. Petitioner Response To Respondent's Response To Show Cause Order due by 4/6/2018. (mac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Petitioner's Opposition due by 3/2/2018. Respondent' Reply due by 3/14/2018. (mac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting 56 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner's opposition shall be filed by no later than March 2, 2018. Respondent's reply shall be filed by no later than March 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/15/2018. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER. In view of 53 and the exigent nature thereof, a status hearing on Petitioner's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is hereby scheduled for February 9, 2018 at 5:00 pm in Courtroom 24A. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/9/2018. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Petitioner's Opposition To Respondents Motion To Dismiss due by 2/16/2018. Respondents Reply due by 2/28/2018. (mac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting 49 unopposed motion for briefing schedule. Petitioner's opposition to respondents' motion to dismiss shall be filed by no later than February 16, 2018. Respondents' reply shall be filed by no later than February 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/19/2018. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER. In view of 37 Notice of Proposed Date for Response to the Amended Petition, and 43 Notice of Filing the Second Amended Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus on November 29, 2017, the respondent shall respond to the petition by no later than January 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/6/2017. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Respondent Response To The Petition due by 1/10/2018. (mac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 42 unopposed motion for relief from filing courtesy copies of petitioner's second amended complaint in view of 43 Notice of Filing. Petitioner's counsel is reminded of Local Civil Rule 7(c) which requires each motion and opposition to be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/29/2017. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER. In view of the Petitioner's request during the motion hearing held on October 19, 2017 to file an amended complaint and the government's lack of opposition to that request, is it HEREBY ORDERED that the Petitioner shall file his amended complaint by no later than November 1, 2017. By no later than November 3, 2017, the government shall submit a proposed date for responding to the amended complaint. It is FURTHER ORDERED that by no later than October 27, 2017, the Petitioner shall file on the docket in this case the proposed order Petitioner provided to the Court and government counsel during the October 19, 2017 motion hearing, and any additional proposed order relating to 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction the Petitioner seeks to put before the Court. The government shall file any response to the proposed order(s) by no later than November 3, 2017; and the Petitioner shall file any reply by no later than November 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/20/2017. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER. In view of 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and the matters discussed at the October 19, 2017 motion hearing, the parties are HEREBY ORDERED to submit a biweekly joint status report until further Order of the Court. The joint report shall provide the status of the following: (1) current medical condition of the Petitioner; (2) production of the Petitioner's medical records to habeas counsel in a non-classified format; (3) the number of times the Petitioner was subjected to FCE procedures during the preceding two week period and the reason for the use of FCE procedures; and (4) the number of times an attorney-client meeting occurred between the Petitioner and habeas counsel during the preceding two week period. The first joint status report shall be filed by no later than November 2, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/20/2017. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Petitioner Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2017. Government To Submit A Proposed Date For Responding For Responding To The Amended Complaint due by 11/3/2017. Petitioner To File The Proposed Order Petitioner Provided To The Court And Government Counsel During The October 19, 2017 Motion Hearing due by 10/27/2017. Government Response To The Proposed Order due by 11/3/2017. Petitioner Reply due by 11/10/2017. (mac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/2/2017. (mac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Preliminary Injunction Hearing Held on 10/19/2017. (Court Reporter SCOTT WALLACE.) (mac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER. In view of 28 Petitioner's Supplemental Status Report filed October 17, 2017, the respondent is HEREBY ORDERED to file a response by no later than 5:00 pm EDT on October 18, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/18/2017. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Respondent Declaration due by 10/17/2017. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 10/19/2017 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (mac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER. In view of 25 Status Report, respondent is HEREBY ORDERED to file, by no later than 5:00 pm EDT on October 17, 2017, an updated Declaration by the Senior Medical Officer of Camp VII informing the Court of the current status of the petitioner's recuperation including, but not limited to the following: (1) whether additional recuperation time beyond the original 4 weeks is anticipated, and (2) the time frame for any removal of the petitioner from the recovery area. So that the petitioner may have an opportunity to review this information, the October 17, 2017 hearing date is HEREBY VACATED, and the hearing on motion for preliminary injunction is rescheduled for October 19, 2017 at 3:00 pm in Courtroom 24A. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/13/2017. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5:00PM on 10/12/2018. (mac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER. In view of 20 petitioner's revised positions as to the relief requested, the parties are HEREBY ORDERED as follows: by no later than 5:00 pm on October 12, 2017, the parties shall submit a joint status report stating what preliminary relief remains at issue. To the extent relief remains at issue, the parties shall fully explain the basis for the disagreement and support the basis for disagreement with citations to points and authorities as appropriate. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/11/2017. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Petitioner's reply due by 10/10/2017. Preliminary Injunction Hearing reset for 10/17/2017 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zcdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting 17 motion for extension of time. Petitioner's reply shall be filed by no later than 5:00 pm EDT on October 10, 2017 rather than October 9, 2017. Given that counsel requested that the hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction be scheduled on October 9, 2017, see ECF No. 10 at 3, and in view of there being four counsel of record for the petitioner, the Court is perplexed by the purported reason given by counsel for the need for the extension of time. Nevertheless, the Court will reluctantly grant the motion. Further, the October 13, 2017 hearing date is HEREBY VACATED, and the hearing on motion for preliminary injunction is rescheduled for October 17, 2017 at 1:00 pm in Courtroom 24A. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/6/2017. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Respondent Opposition To 10 Motion For Preliminary Injunction due by 10/6/2017. Petitioner Reply due by 10/9/2017. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Joint Report due by 5:00PM On 10/11/2017. (mac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/2/2017 (mac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Robert L. Palmer is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/2/2017. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER. In view of 12 joint status report, The Court hereby adopts the TS/SCI Protective Order issued by Judge Hogan in In re Guantanamo Bay Detainee Litigation, Misc. No. 08-442, Dkt No. 1481 as amended in Dkt No. 1496. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/2/2017. (lcegs1) Modified to add event title on 10/3/2017 (znmw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER. In view of 12 joint status report, respondent shall file its opposition to 10 motion for preliminary injunction by no later than October 6, 2017. Petitioner shall file his reply by no later than October 9, 2017. A motion hearing shall take place on October 13, 2017 at 11:00 am in Courtroom 24A. By no later than 5:00 pm on October 11, 2017, the parties shall file a joint report informing the Court of whether any portion of the motion hearing will need to be sealed. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/2/2017. (lcegs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?