United States v. $44,000.00 U.S. Currency
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:17-cv-02409

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 23, 2019 at 12:11 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841
Nature of Suit Drug Related Seizure of Property
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Marshal Return
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Judgment - (Case)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Judgment of Forfeiture
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Answer
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Case Management Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Joint Scheduling Plan
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Rule 16 Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Memorandum & ORDERCourt Filing
                MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Claimant Robert Pauli's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (ECF No. 7 ) and Claimant Robert Pauli's Motion to Dismiss or Enjoin the Department of Justice from Prosecuting this Forfeiture Case (ECF No. 9 ) are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 7/27/2018. (AFC)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Marshal Return
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Dismiss Case
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Declaration
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Marshal Return
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Claim
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Marshal Return
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?