PEARSON v. CHAO
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-01965

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 28, 2019 at 6:43 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CLIFFORD D. PEARSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CLIFFORD D. PEARSON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CLIFFORD D. PEARSON
v.
Chao, Elaine L. Chao, Elaine L., Defendant
Officially listed as "ELAINE L. CHAO"
Officer/Director, Dole Food Company, Inc.
Officer/Director, NORWEST CORP
Officer/Director, PROTECTIVE LIFE CORP
News Corporation Officer/Director, News Corporation
Officer/Director, New Newscorp LLC
Officer/Director, Virginia Holdco, Inc.
Officer/Director, Ingersoll-Rand plc
Officer/Director, Kroger Co
Officer/Director, Tortoise Acquisition Corp.

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Scott Risner +1 202 514 2395 +1 202 616 8470 scott.risner@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Donald Edward Burgess +1 202 326 4000 burgess.donald@pbgc.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Kim Thu Hall +1 202 326 4199 hall.kim@pbgc.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Katherine Leong +1 202 326 4000 +1 202 326 4122 leong.katherine@pbgc.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Stephen E. Williams +1 202 326 4020 williams.steve@pbgc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Labor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. NATALIE APPETTA
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. JOANNE BILETTA JARQUIN +1 215 861 5126 jarquin.joanne@dol.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Kristen Michelle Lindberg +1 202 693 5282 lindberg.kristen@dol.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Emelda Medrano +1 312 353 1169 +1 312 353 5698 medrano.emelda@dol.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Donald K. Neely +1 215 861 5139 neely.donald@dol.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. JOAN M. ROLLER +1 215 861 5142 roller.joan@dol.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Mark V. Swirsky +1 215 861 5146 +1 215 861 5162 swirsky.mark@dol.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. LINDA D. THOMASSON +1 215 861 5137 thomasson.linda@dol.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Strike
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Take Judicial Notice
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Take Judicial Notice
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Take Judicial Notice
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Strike
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Standing Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  COMPLAINT against ELAINE L. CHAO ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616087325) with Jury Demand filed by CLIFFORD D. PEARSON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Space Space

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?