District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Michigan Eastern District Court Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
  1. Case No. 19-1192
    Filed 2/27/2019
  2. Case No. 18-1634
    Filed 6/5/2018
  3. Case No. 18-1581
    Filed 5/31/2018
United States Supreme Court

Rajapakse v. Credit Acceptance Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:17-cv-12970-MFL-SDD
District Judge Matthew F. Leitman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part II

This docket is featured in the February 9, 2018 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part II.

Last Updated March 30, 2021 at 6:13 AM DT (4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rajapakse, Samantha D., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Samantha Rajapakse"
v.
No Logo Arthur Smith, Defendant
No Logo Board of Credit Acceptance Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Brett A. Roberts, Defendant
No Logo Charles A. Pierce, Defendant
Credit Acceptance Corporation Credit Acceptance Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Daniel A. Ulatowski, Defendant
No Logo Douglas W. Busk, Defendant
No Logo Glenda Flanagan, Defendant
No Logo John S. Soave, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth S. Booth, Defendant
No Logo Scott J. Vassauzzo, Defendant
No Logo Steven M. Jones, Defendant
No Logo Thomas N. Tryforus, Defendant
Office Flint
Filed 9/8/2017
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 450 - Commerce ICC Rates Etc.
Cause No cause code entered
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags IFP,LR11.2_NOTICE,reassigned
  Entries (175) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Notice of appeal
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] re [144] Judgment. Fee Status: Filing fee not paid. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 4/30/2019 (SSch). [PER COURT OF APPEALS DOCUMENT IS A MOTION TO EXPAND THE RECORD]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit*
    Certificate of Service re [149] Notice of Appeal. (SSch)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Notice of appeal
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] re [144] Judgment. Fee Status: Filing fee not paid. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 4/30/2019 (SSch). [PER COURT OF APPEALS DOCUMENT IS A MOTION TO EXPAND THE RECORD]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Appeal Mandate
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or CostsCourt Filing
          ORDER Denying [147] Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: 3/22/2019, Terminated: 3/25/2019 Motion
              MOTION re [146] Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit Application for waiver of filing fee to the appeals court by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 158 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: 2/27/2019 Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit*
                  Certificate of Service re [145] Notice of Appeal. (SSch)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: 2/27/2019 Notice of appealCourt Filing
                    NOTICE OF APPEAL by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] re [120] Order Requiring Responsive Pleading, [143] Order Adopting Report and Recommendation,, [50] Directing Service by the US Marshal, [29] Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, [138] Order on Motion to Stay, [77] Stipulation and Order, Text-Only Order, [34] Directing Service by the US Marshal, [33] Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, [7] Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, [69] Order on Motion - Free,,, Order on Motion to Expedite,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause,,, Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal,,, Order on Motion for Return of Property,,,,,, Order on Motion to Reassign Case,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Recusal,,,,,,,, [130] Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge, Order on Motion for Recusal, [99] Order, [118] Order on Motion - Free,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Stay,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Recusal,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,,,, Order on Motion for Return of Property,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, [65] Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, [72] Order on Motion for Recusal, [4] Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge, [117] Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,, Order on Motion - Free,,, [144] Judgment. Fee Status: Filing fee not paid. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: 2/27/2019 judgmentCourt Filing
                      JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: 2/27/2019 Order Adopting Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                        ORDER (1) Overruling Plaintiff's [140] Objections to the Magistrate Judge's [136] Report and Recommendation, (2) Adopting the Magistrate Judge's Recommended Disposition, (3) Granting Defendants' [123] Motion to Dismiss, (4) Dismissing Plaintiff's [41] First Amended Complaint, (5) Denying Plaintiff's Remaining Motions [119], [127], [129], [134], and [139] as Moot, and (6) Certifying that an Appeal Could Not Be Taken in Good Faith. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: 2/19/2019 Notice - other
                            NOTICE by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] Notice of filing Depriving Plaintiff of her 14th Amendment right, deprivment of rights, and deprivement of equal protection from the courts (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Appeal/Supreme Court Letter
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: 2/14/2019 Notice - other
                                NOTICE by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] re [138] Order on Motion to Stay, [137] MOTION to Stay re [136] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re [129] MOTION to Compel Amend with previous motion to expidite return of propertyEmergency MOTION to Expedite Return of PropertySecond MOTION for Return of Property Violation, [139] MOTION Discovery for Magistrate Dawkins-Davis to reveal her afilliation with Credit Acceptance and others, [140] Objection to Report and Recommendation, NOTICE OF INTENT FILED COMPLAINT FILED AGAINST THE UNITED STATES FOR VIOLATION OF PLAINTIFF SAMANTHA RAJAPAKSE RIGHTS OF DUE PROCESS AND ENTITLEMENT TO RELIEF (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/10/2019, Entered: 2/10/2019 Objection to Report and Recommendation
                                    OBJECTION to [136] Report and Recommendation Objecting the Magistrate Stephanie Dawkins-Davis report showing in the record conspiracy, perjury, judiciary Misconduct. Notice of Plaintiff's objection submitting to the House of Judicary and the Sixth Circuit in support of HIGH CRIME of Perjury; seeking summary judgment based on the evidence in the record by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/3/2019, Entered: 2/3/2019, Terminated: 2/27/2019 Motion
                                      MOTION Discovery for Magistrate Dawkins-Davis to reveal her afilliation with Credit Acceptance and others by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit of Evidence) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: 2/1/2019 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                        ORDER (1) Denying Plaintiff's [137] Motion to Stay and (2) Directing Plaintiff to Inform the Court if She Wishes to File Separate Objections to the [136] Report and Recommendation. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: 1/31/2019, Terminated: 2/1/2019 Motion To Stay
                                          MOTION to Stay re [136] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re [129] MOTION to Compel Amend with previous motion to expidite return of propertyEmergency MOTION to Expedite Return of PropertySecond MOTION for Return of Property Violation of Tennessee 47-9-625 Notif Notice of filing in District of Columbia seeking the House of Judiciary by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: 1/30/2019, Terminated: 2/27/2019 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                            REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re [129] MOTION to Compel filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer], [127] MOTION to Expedite return Plaintiff property based on Laws, Constitution, and evidence filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer], [123] MOTION to Dismiss filed by 1 Stop Auto Sales, Thomas N. Tryforus, Steven M. Jones, Brett A. Roberts, Scott J. Vassauzzo, John S. Soave, Charles A. Pierce, Sandy Pollack, Arthur Smith, Kenneth S. Booth, Daniel A. Ulatowski, Glenda Flanagan, Board of Credit Acceptance Corporation, Credit Acceptance Corporation, Douglas W. Busk, [134] Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer], [119] MOTION for Summary Judgment Summary Judgment against Def. CAC filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/27/2019, Entered: 1/27/2019 statement
                                              To the district court related to the return of my property emotional how I feel statement STATEMENT of To the court on the condition of my personal property was returned to me and addressing the court by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: 1/25/2019 motion to amend/correct
                                                Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct [132] Exhibit,, [133] Exhibit, [119] MOTION for Summary Judgment Summary Judgment against Def. CAC, [131] Notice (Other),,,, To include medical damages caused by Credit Acceptance wrongful repossession. Attach exhibt of medical documentation of Dr. Holly Gadd,PhD, APRN, FNP-BC by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 1/29/2019 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "MOTION TO INCLUDE SUMMARY JUDGMENT LIFE CARE EXPENSES SHORT TERM AND LONG TERM PLAINTIFF'S MEDICAL TREATMENT"]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 Exhibit
                                                  EXHIBIT Introducton of Edmund Ford, Jr. Master Degree in Mathematics and Science providing his experience and education over the reviews documents presented to the court on the record related to Credit Acceptance payment histories re [132] Exhibit,, [119] MOTION for Summary Judgment Summary Judgment against Def. CAC, [131] Notice (Other),,,, by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] (Attachments: # (1) Letter from Mr. Edmund Ford, Jr.) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 ExhibitCourt Filing
                                                    EXHIBIT Plaintiff 2018 wages to support damages for Summary Judgement and Return of her property re [129] MOTION to Compel Amend with previous motion to expidite return of propertyEmergency MOTION to Expedite Return of PropertySecond MOTION for Return of Property Violation of Tennessee 47-9-625 Notification of property, [128] Notice (Other),, [119] MOTION for Summary Judgment Summary Judgment against Def. CAC, [131] Notice (Other),,,, by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] (Attachments: # (1) loss of wages to show financial hardship, emotional and physical damages) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: 1/22/2019 Notice - other
                                                      NOTICE by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] re [129] MOTION to Compel Amend with previous motion to expidite return of propertyEmergency MOTION to Expedite Return of PropertySecond MOTION for Return of Property Violation of Tennessee 47-9-625 Notification of property, [128] Notice (Other),, [127] MOTION to Expedite return Plaintiff property based on Laws, Constitution, and evidenceEmergency MOTION Return of property including personal property re [83] Emergency MOTION injunctive relief on new evidence, [29] Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, Status Conference,, [103] MOTION Order the Federal Bureau of InvestigAmended MOTION for Return of Property Immediately, [119] MOTION for Summary Judgment Summary Judgment against Def. CAC Supportive Medical documentation from Plaintiff's physician (Attachments: # (1) Document Continuation letter of medical of Samantha Rajapakse) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 1/22/2019 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "DOCUMENTATION TO SUPPORT PLAINTIFF'S PHYSICAL AND EMOTIONAL DAMAGES IN SEEKING SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTOIN FOR THE IMMEDIATE RETURN OF PROPERTY"]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019 Order on Motion to Disqualify JudgeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER denying [73] Motion to Disqualify Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/15/2018, Entered: 12/15/2018, Terminated: 2/27/2019 Motion to compel
                                                          MOTION to Compel Amend with previous motion to expidite return of property, Emergency MOTION to Expedite Return of Property, Second MOTION for Return of Property Violation of Tennessee 47-9-625 Notification of property by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 Notice - other
                                                            NOTICE by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] re [127] MOTION to Expedite return Plaintiff property based on Laws, Constitution, and evidenceEmergency MOTION Return of property including personal property re [83] Emergency MOTION injunctive relief on new evidence, [29] Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, Status Conference,, [103] MOTION Order the Federal Bureau of InvestigAmended MOTION for Return of Property Immediately to support motion for return of property and immediate return of property and the proceedings itself (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018, Terminated: 2/27/2019 Motion to Expedite
                                                              MOTION to Expedite return Plaintiff property based on Laws, Constitution, and evidence, Emergency MOTION Return of property including personal property re [83] Emergency MOTION injunctive relief on new evidence, [29] Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, Status Conference,, [103] MOTION Order the Federal Bureau of Investigation to review case to protect Plaintiff's civil rights re [101] MOTION for Recusal of Magistrate Stephanie Dawkins motion of sufficient conspiracy, [109] Emergency MOTION Return of Enrichment of Plaintiff's property immedatelyEmergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction barring Credit Acceptance from bringing action on a quasi-contract against PlaintiffEmergency MOTION for Return of Property prima face evidence, [35] Summons Issued, Motion Hearing,,, [112] MOTION Writ of Replivin, [114] Notice of Lis Pendens, [12] MOTION for Summary Judgment , [110] Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction barr Credit Acceptance holding property under quasi-contraceEmergency MOTION for Return of Property Tennessee law on quasi-property MOTION re [43] Response to Motion, [48] Affidavit, [54] Affidavit, [30] Exhibit, Status Conference,, [93] Affidavit, [84] MOTION Use Mr. Greepan with Affidavit in support of Plaintiff complaint, Injunctive and appeal Expert of Mr. Gr, [11] Exhibit Index, evidence on the record before this court filed by Credit Acceptance and Plaintiff, Amended MOTION for Return of Property Immediately by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document 126 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: 11/16/2018 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument
                                                                Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re [123] MOTION to Dismiss , [119] MOTION for Summary Judgment Summary Judgment against Def. CAC (THal)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                  REPLY to Response re [123] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Board of Credit Acceptance Corporation, Kenneth S. Booth, Douglas W. Busk, Credit Acceptance Corporation, Glenda Flanagan, Steven M. Jones, Charles A. Pierce, Sandy Pollack, Brett A. Roberts, Arthur Smith, John S. Soave, Thomas N. Tryforus, Daniel A. Ulatowski, Scott J. Vassauzzo. (King, Stephen)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Response - Free
                                                                    RESPONSE to [123] MOTION to Dismiss Reply to Defendant's Credit Acceptance Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's complaint. by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018, Terminated: 2/27/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss by Board of Credit Acceptance Corporation, Kenneth S. Booth, Douglas W. Busk, Credit Acceptance Corporation, Glenda Flanagan, Steven M. Jones, Charles A. Pierce, Sandy Pollack, Brett A. Roberts, Arthur Smith, John S. Soave, Thomas N. Tryforus, Daniel A. Ulatowski, Scott J. Vassauzzo. (King, Stephen)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                        [CORRECTION: THIS IS A REPLY TO [119] MOTION] REPLY to Response re [9] MOTION Reply to Defendant's Response filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 10/18/2018 (THal).
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 121 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Response to motion
                                                                          RESPONSE to [119] MOTION for Summary Judgment Summary Judgment against Def. CAC filed by Board of Credit Acceptance Corporation, Kenneth S. Booth, Douglas W. Busk, Credit Acceptance Corporation, Glenda Flanagan, Steven M. Jones, Charles A. Pierce, Sandy Pollack, Brett A. Roberts, Arthur Smith, John S. Soave, Thomas N. Tryforus, Daniel A. Ulatowski, Scott J. Vassauzzo. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (King, Stephen)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 120 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/26/2018 Order Requiring Responsive PleadingCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER Requiring Response to [119] Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due by 10/9/2018. Reply due by 10/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/15/2018, Entered: 9/15/2018, Terminated: 2/27/2019 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment Summary Judgment against Def. CAC by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Order on Motion - FreeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER striking [47] Motion; striking [68] Motion; striking [76] Motion to Amend/Correct; striking [83] Motion; striking [94] Motion; denying [96] Motion to Stay; striking [98] Motion to Compel; striking [100] Motion; striking [101] Motion for Recusal; striking [103] Motion; granting [105] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; striking [107] Motion for Preliminary Injunction; striking [109] Motion; striking [109] Motion for Permanent Injunction; striking [109] Motion for Return of Property; striking [110] Motion for Permanent Injunction; striking [110] Motion for Return of Property; striking [110] Motion; striking [111] Motion for Leave to File; striking [111] Motion; striking [112] Motion; granting [113] Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Order on motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER Denying Plaintiff's [9],[12], [55], [86] and [115] Motions for Summary Judgment Without Prejudice and Permitting Plaintiff to Re-File the Single Motion for Summary Judgment Allowed Under the Local Rules. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re [109] Emergency MOTION Return of Enrichment of Plaintiff's property immedatelyEmergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction barring Credit Acceptance from bringing action on a quasi-contract against PlaintiffEmergency MOTION for Return of Property prima face evidence, [87] Notice (Other), [113] MOTION withdrawn to remove order appoint counsel order, [115] MOTION for Summary Judgment Original and Amend Complaint, [114] Notice of Lis Pendens, [110] Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction barr Credit Acceptance holding property under quasi-contraceEmergency MOTION for Return of Property Tennessee law on quasi-property MOTION re [43] Response to Motion, [48] Affidavit, [54] Affidavit, [30] Exhibit, Status Conference,, [93] Affidavit, [84] MOTION Use Mr. Greepan with Affidavit in support of Plaintiff complaint, Injunctive and appeal Expert of Mr. Gr, [102] Notice to Appear Affidavit supporting violation of accounting and warranty against CAC filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Expedite
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018, Terminated: 9/10/2018 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment Original and Amend Complaint by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Attachments: # (1) Document Continuation Plaintiff's Brief) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/26/2018, Entered: 8/26/2018 Notice of lis pendens
                                                                                        NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/25/2018, Entered: 8/25/2018, Terminated: 9/10/2018 Motion
                                                                                          MOTION withdrawn to remove order appoint counsel order by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 8/27/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "MOTION TO WITHDRAW COUNSEL"]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018, Terminated: 9/10/2018 Motion
                                                                                            MOTION Writ of Replivin by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018, Terminated: 9/10/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File , MOTION re [110] Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction barr Credit Acceptance holding property under quasi-contraceEmergency MOTION for Return of Property Tennessee law on quasi-property MOTION re [43] Response to Motion, [48] Affidavit, [54] Affidavit, [30] Exhibit, Status Conference,, [93] Affidavit, [84] MOTION Use Mr. Greepan with Affidavit in support of Plaintiff complaint, Injunctive and appeal Expert of Mr. Gr by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/22/2018, Entered: 7/22/2018, Terminated: 9/10/2018 Motion for Permanent Injunction
                                                                                                Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction barr Credit Acceptance holding property under quasi-contrace, Emergency MOTION for Return of Property Tennessee law on quasi-property, MOTION re [43] Response to Motion, [48] Affidavit, [54] Affidavit, [30] Exhibit, Status Conference,, [93] Affidavit, [84] MOTION Use Mr. Greepan with Affidavit in support of Plaintiff complaint, Injunctive and appeal Expert of Mr. Greenspan of PlainSite, [109] Emergency MOTION Return of Enrichment of Plaintiff's property immedatelyEmergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction barring Credit Acceptance from bringing action on a quasi-contract against PlaintiffEmergency MOTION for Return of Property prima face evidence, [14] MOTION to Expedite , [89] Affidavit, [95] Affidavit,, [31] Exhibit, Motion Hearing,,, [91] Affidavit, [78] Affidavit, [92] Affidavit by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Attachments: # (1) Document Continuation) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/22/2018, Entered: 7/22/2018, Terminated: 9/10/2018 Motion
                                                                                                    Emergency MOTION Return of Enrichment of Plaintiff's property immedately, Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction barring Credit Acceptance from bringing action on a quasi-contract against Plaintiff, Emergency MOTION for Return of Property prima face evidence by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Payment history from Credit Acceptance dated July 29, 2016) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018, Terminated: 7/20/2018 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [105] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to amended complaint Untimely without leave from the court by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 7/20/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "PLAINTIFF RESPONSE OBJECTING CREDIT ACCEPTANCE MOTION SEEKING ADDITIONAL TIME"]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018, Terminated: 9/10/2018 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                        Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction restriaing the sell of vehicle pending appointment of counsel by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 7/20/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED " MOTION FOR CEASE AND DESIST"]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 106 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                          NOTICE by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] re Status Conference,, [102] Notice to Appear Notice seeking counsel (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 7/20/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "NOTICE OF COUNSEL"]
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: 7/19/2018, Terminated: 9/10/2018 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to amended complaint by All Defendants. (King, Stephen)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 104 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: 7/19/2018 Notice to Withdraw Motion
                                                                                                              NOTICE by All Defendants of withdrawal of [44] MOTION to compel arbitration and/or to stay proceedings. (King, Stephen)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/19/2018. Plaintiff has 48 hours to file on the Court's docket a written statement telling the Court whether she wants the Court to appoint counsel for her (at no expense to her as provided in ECF #99). If Plaintiff does not affirmatively indicate that she wants counsel appointed for her, counsel will not be appointed and the case will proceed. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/19/2018. Plaintiff has 48 hours to file on the Court's docket a written statement telling the Court whether she wants the Court to appoint counsel for her (at no expense to her as provided in ECF #99). If Plaintiff does not affirmatively indicate that she wants counsel appointed for her, counsel will not be appointed and the case will proceed. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018, Terminated: 9/10/2018 Motion
                                                                                                                      MOTION Order the Federal Bureau of Investigation to review case to protect Plaintiff's civil rights re [101] MOTION for Recusal of Magistrate Stephanie Dawkins motion of sufficient conspiracy by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 7/19/2018 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED VIA EMAIL AND IN THIS NOTICE** (HMon)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018, Terminated: 9/10/2018 Motion for Recusal
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Recusal of Magistrate Stephanie Dawkins by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Attachments: # (1) Document Continuation of Docket Text 72 affidavit of bias and prejudice and violation federal statue) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 7/13/2018 (SSch).[DOCUMENT TITLED "MOTION DEMANDING THE REMOVED ORDER FOR COUNSEL DISTRICT TO ENFORCE AFFIDAVIT OF 351 APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MAGISTRATE"]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018, Terminated: 9/10/2018 Motion
                                                                                                                            MOTION Relief for my vehicle re [93] Affidavit, [99] Order, [95] Affidavit,, [98] MOTION to Compel Objection to Credit Acceptance Stay against Credit Acceptance, Board of Credit Acceptance Kenneth S. Booth Douglas W. Busk Glenda Flanagan Steven M. Jones Charles A. Pierce Sandy Pollack Brett A. Roberts Arthur Smith John S. Soav, [91] Affidavit, [92] Affidavit Cruel and Inhuman treatment violation of Plaintiff 4th Amendment Objecting Stay of Credit Acceptance by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 7/13/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "MOTION TO AMEND DKT9 SEEKING IMMEDIATE RETURN OF HER PROPERTY. VIOLATION OF PLAINTIFF'S 4TH AMENDMENT RIGHT AND 8TH AMENDMENT RIGHT OBJECTING ORDER ISSUING STAY PENDING COUNSEL"]
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER Conditionally Appointing Counsel and Staying Case until Counsel is Appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Case Stayed
                                                                                                                                Case Stayed (THal)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018, Terminated: 9/10/2018 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Objection to Credit Acceptance Stay against Credit Acceptance, Board of Credit Acceptance Kenneth S. Booth Douglas W. Busk Glenda Flanagan Steven M. Jones Charles A. Pierce Sandy Pollack Brett A. Roberts Arthur Smith John S. Soave Thomas N. Tryforus Daniel A. Ulatowski Scott J. Vassauzzo Rob Williams by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment
                                                                                                                                    ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit [Appeal Case Number 18-1634] (DWor)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018, Terminated: 9/10/2018 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay further proceedings pending Plaintiff's interlocutory appeal by All Defendants. (King, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 95 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT re [90] Reply to Response to Motion, [93] Affidavit, [84] MOTION Use Mr. Greepan with Affidavit in support of Plaintiff complaint, Injunctive and appeal Expert of Mr. Greenspan of PlainSite, [89] Affidavit, [1] Complaint, [78] Affidavit, [86] Renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment Summary Judgment against Def. CAC, [92] Affidavit Ashley Poole of CAC refusal to accept payoff and release of title by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018, Terminated: 9/10/2018 Motion
                                                                                                                                          MOTION Add Amercian Credit Acceptance for affidavits purpose only by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 7/10/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "MOTION TO ALLOW AMERICAN CREDIT ACCEPTANCE"]
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Kamecia Sherrod re [90] Reply to Response to Motion, [89] Affidavit, [91] Affidavit, [86] Renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment Summary Judgment against Def. CAC, [92] Affidavit Kamecia Sherrod in support of warranty fraud and summary judgment by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Shaniece A. Harris support of Samantha Rajapakse related to knowledge of Credit Acceptance by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/8/2018, Entered: 7/8/2018 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Kip Fitzgerald and Synthia Johnson Affidavit supporting violation of accounting and warranty against CAC by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Missing payments to CAC, # (2) Exhibit Violation of warranty) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: 7/3/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response re [47] MOTION objection to arbitrate/ other Objection to Arbitration New evidence supporting Fraud filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 7/10/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "SECOND OBJECTION TO ARBITRATION ON FRAUD"]
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: 7/2/2018 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Amanda Stinson to support Summary Judgment by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit of Amanda Stinson to support summary judgment) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: 7/2/2018 Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re [70] Notice of Appeal filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] [Appeal Case Number 18-1581] (DWor)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 87 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 Notice - otherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Regarding Appointment of Counsel by Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis (THal)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018, Terminated: 9/10/2018 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                          Renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment Summary Judgment against Def. CAC by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 7/10/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED " MOTION AND BRIEF FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT COMPLAINT/AMEND COMPLAINT AGAINST CREDIT ACCEPTANCE"]
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 85 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re [70] Notice of Appeal filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] [Appeal Case Number 18-1581] (SKra)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice of Error
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Error re [80] MOTION Notice of Discovery Location of documents, [79] MOTION to Produce addtional information related to warranty and defendant MOTION Notice of Interrogatories. Document is prohibited discovery, disclosure or a certificate of service thereof. Document was stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 84 Filed: 6/24/2018, Entered: 6/24/2018, Terminated: 6/24/2018 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Use Mr. Greepan with Affidavit in support of Plaintiff complaint, Injunctive and appeal Expert of Mr. Greenspan of PlainSite by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Data of Mr. Greenspan for PlainSite) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 6/25/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "EXPERT WITNESS AND TESTIMONY UNDER RULE 702"]
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018, Terminated: 9/10/2018 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                Emergency MOTION injunctive relief on new evidence by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018, Terminated: 6/25/2018 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  DOCUMENT IS TITLED "NOTICE OF WRITTEN DEPOSITION"] MOTION Notice of Written Deposition by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 6/25/2018 (THal).
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/19/2018 Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit [Appeal Case Number 18-1634] (DWor)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/16/2018, Entered: 6/16/2018, Terminated: 6/25/2018 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      [STRICKEN] MOTION Notice of Discovery Location of documents by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 6/25/2018 (SSch).
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/16/2018, Entered: 6/16/2018, Terminated: 6/25/2018 Motion to Produce
                                                                                                                                                                        [STRICKEN] MOTION to Produce addtional information related to warranty and defendant, MOTION Notice of Interrogatories by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 6/25/2018 (SSch).
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Robert Williams/ One Stop Auto Sales Rob Williams owner of 1 Stop Auto Sales by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 6/18/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "EXHIBIT C"]
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATED ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendants 1 Stop Auto Sales and Robert Williams Only. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018, Terminated: 9/10/2018 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct Amend to include Affidavit in Appeal by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit from One Stop Auto Sales / Robert Williams) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by 1 Stop Auto Sales (Castmore, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua C. Castmore on behalf of 1 Stop Auto Sales, Rob Williams. (Castmore, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/2/2018, Entered: 6/2/2018, Terminated: 1/11/2019 Motion to Disqualify JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Renewed MOTION to Disqualify Judge Magistrate Dawkins Davis, Renewed MOTION for Recusal by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Attachments: # (1) Document Continuation Cerfiticate of service) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Order on Motion for RecusalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [51] Motion for Recusal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit*
                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service re [70] Notice of Appeal. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. Fee Status: Filing fee not paid. (Attachments: # (1) Document Continuation waiver fee) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 69 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Order on Motion - FreeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER striking [38] Motion ; striking [38] Motion to Expedite; striking [39] Motion to Strike; striking [45] Motion for Order to Show Cause; striking [46] Motion for Leave to Appeal; striking [49] Motion for Return of Property; striking [52] Motion ; striking [52] Motion to Reassign Case ; striking [53] Motion ; striking [60] Motion ; striking [62] Motion to Reassign Case ; striking [62] Motion for Recusal ; striking [62] Motion for Return of Property; striking [62] Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018, Terminated: 9/10/2018 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Answer why pending motion on bias were not addressed prior to approving report by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit*
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service re [66] Notice of Appeal. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE on Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] at samantharajapakse@ymail.com of Recommendation to Consult with Pro Se Clinic Form (THal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. Fee Status: Filing fee not paid. (Attachments: # (1) Document Continuation) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 65 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Order Adopting Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER (1) Overruling Plaintiff's [58] Objections to Magistrate Judge's [57] Report and Recommendation, (2) Adopting Report and Recommendation's Recommended Disposition, and (3) Denying Plaintiff's [13], [14], [16], [17], [18], [25], [26], [27], and [28] MOTIONS for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: 5/24/2018 Notice of Joinder/Concurrence
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Joinder/Concurrence in [44] MOTION filed by 1 Stop Auto Sales, Credit Acceptance Corporation by Sandy Pollack (King, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: 5/23/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W. King on behalf of Sandy Pollack. (King, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/13/2018, Entered: 5/13/2018, Terminated: 5/31/2018 motion to reassign case
                                                                                                                                                                                                              [STRICKEN] MOTION to Reassign Case showing bias of the court, Third MOTION for Recusal , Emergency MOTION for Return of Property based on bias of the court, Third MOTION by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 Acknowledgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (NAhm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018, Terminated: 5/31/2018 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [STRICKEN] MOTION to introduce audio between plaintiff and CFPB Intro of Evidence to the court by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Amended document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] Regulation of Consumer Finance Protection Bueau (Attachments: # (1) Document Continuation Rajapakse complaints filed to CFPB to the three credit bureaus, # (2) Document Continuation CAC eithics) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Objection to Report and Recommendation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION to [57] Report and Recommendation by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 57 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018, Terminated: 5/30/2018 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re [28] Emergency MOTION for Return of Property filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer], [26] Emergency MOTION to Stay filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer], [13] MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer], [17] MOTION to Expedite filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer], [18] MOTION to Expedite filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer], [14] MOTION to Expedite filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer], [25] Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer], [27] Emergency MOTION for Return of Property filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer], [16] MOTION to Expedite filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 56 Filed: 4/15/2018, Entered: 4/15/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT proof of education/ by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit proof of education) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE on Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] Rob Williams owner of 1 Stop Auto Sales at 1005 E. Brooks Road, Memphis, TN 38116. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Recusal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE on Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] Certificate of Service of All Pleadings at 1005 E. Brooks Road, Memphis, TN 38116. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018, Terminated: 9/10/2018 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants except Sandy Pollack and 1 Stop Auto Sales by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit for Summary Judgment) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 4/16/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "PARITAL 55 DEFAULT JUDGMENT 56(a) SUMMARY JUDGMENT"]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Marcus Mayes Affidavit of Marcus Mayes by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018, Terminated: 5/31/2018 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [STRICKEN] Emergency MOTION ENFORCEMENT EQUAL PROTECTION AND RETURN OF MY PROPERTY FOR WRONGFUL SEIZURE by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 4/10/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "MOTION TO COMPEL DISTIRCT COURT JUDGE MATTHEW LEITMAN TO ENFORCE MAGISTRATE STEPHANIE DAWKINS DAVIS TO UPHOLD PLAINTIFF SAMANTHA RAJAPAKSE'S EQUAL RIGHTS UNER THE EQUAL PORTECTION RIGHTS 28 USC 1443(1)]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/8/2018, Entered: 4/8/2018, Terminated: 5/31/2018 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [STRICKEN] Emergency MOTION return of property and enforcement of equal rights , MOTION to Reassign Case by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 4/9/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "MOTION TO COMPEL DISTRICT COURT JUDGE MATTHEW LEITMAN TO ENFORCE DISTRICT COURT IN PLAINTIFF'S EQUAL PROTECTION UNDER 28 USC 1443(1)"]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/8/2018, Entered: 4/8/2018, Terminated: 6/1/2018 Motion for Recusal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Emergency MOTION for Recusal Motion seeking recusal by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit A: CAC reporting, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit B: Rajapakse credit score) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 Directing Service by the US MarshalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Directing Service of Process as to defendants Sandy Pollack, Rob Williams and 1 Stop Auto Sales by the US Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018, Terminated: 5/31/2018 Motion for Return of Property
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [STRICKEN] Renewed MOTION for Return of Property Return of property by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: 3/29/2018 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Arthur Affidavit of C. Arthur by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/18/2018, Entered: 3/18/2018, Terminated: 9/10/2018 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION objection to arbitrate/ other Objection to Arbitration by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Emails from Counsel King related to Arbitration 2017) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/17/2018, Entered: 3/17/2018, Terminated: 5/31/2018 motion for leave to appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [STRICKEN] MOTION for Leave to Appeal by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018, Terminated: 5/31/2018 ~Motion for Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [STRICKEN] MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018, Terminated: 7/19/2018 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint Motion & Brief to Compel Arbitration, Etc. in lieu of Answer to Complaint/Amended Complaint by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit of Laura Belleville, # (2) Exhibit Garcia v Weltman case) (King, Stephen)[DOCKET ERROR - WRONG EVENT USED - DOCUMENT IS TITLED MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO DISMISS Modified on 3/19/2018 (NAhm). Modified on 3/27/2018 (THal).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [38] Emergency MOTION MOTION to Expedite and Certificate of Service filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit of Laura Belleville) (King, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [39] MOTION to Strike and Certificate of Service filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (King, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 41 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT Amend Complaint/Additonal Defendants filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] against Rob Williams. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint Amend Complaint/ add Defendants by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 3/6/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "AMENDED COMPLAINT"]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/4/2018, Entered: 3/4/2018, Terminated: 5/31/2018 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [STRICKEN] MOTION to Strike by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018, Terminated: 5/31/2018 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [STRICKEN] Emergency MOTION , MOTION to Expedite by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 3/5/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "SANCTION AGAINST CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION ON VIOLATION OF COURT ORDER"]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Acknowledgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (DPer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W. King on behalf of All Defendants. (King, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Issued for *Board of Credit Acceptance Corporation, Kenneth S. Booth, Douglas W. Busk, Credit Acceptance Corporation, Glenda Flanagan, Steven M. Jones, Charles A. Pierce, Brett A. Roberts, Arthur Smith, John S. Soave, Thomas N. Tryforus, Daniel A. Ulatowski, Scott J. Vassauzzo* (THal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 Directing Service by the US MarshalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Directing Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 2/23/2018 re [28] Emergency MOTION for Return of Property filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer], [26] Emergency MOTION to Stay filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer], [13] MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer], [17] MOTION to Expedite filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer], [18] MOTION to Expedite filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer], [14] MOTION to Expedite filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer], [25] Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer], [27] Emergency MOTION for Return of Property filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer], [16] MOTION to Expedite filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] Disposition: Motions taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (THal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: 2/22/2018 Order Adopting Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OVERRULING [22] Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, ADOPTING [21] Report and Recommendation's Recommended Disposition, and DENYING [19] Plaintiff's Motion for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (AChu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 32 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: 2/21/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [28] Emergency MOTION for Return of Property , [26] Emergency MOTION to Stay , [13] MOTION for Permanent Injunction , [17] MOTION to Expedite , [18] MOTION to Expedite , [14] MOTION to Expedite , [25] Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , [27] Emergency MOTION for Return of Property , [16] MOTION to Expedite filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (King, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 31 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT Missing payment to CAC by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Missing payments to CAC) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT Intro of Exhibits seeking injunctive relief by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Letter to Board of Directors, # (2) Exhibit emails from Counsel, # (3) Exhibit CAC removed from credit, # (4) Exhibit showing reporting of CAC showing original loan amount, # (5) Exhibit showing date and loan amount yr. 16, # (6) Exhibit showing date and loan amount yr 16, # (7) Exhibit example of how payments were made to CAC) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Hearing on [26] Emergency MOTION to Stay , [14] MOTION to Expedite , [13] MOTION for Permanent Injunction , [17] MOTION to Expedite , [18] MOTION to Expedite , [16] MOTION to Expedite , [28] Emergency MOTION for Return of Property , [25] Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , [27] Emergency MOTION for Return of Property : Response due by 2/21/2018. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis: Telephonic Conference held on 2/13/2018 regarding briefing schedule and hearing on plaintiff's motions for injunctive relief. Counsel for defendant, Credit Acceptance Corporation, indicated that vehicle will be held and will not be sold before plaintiff's motions for injunctive relief are resolved. Order setting response deadline and hearing date will be entered. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (THal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018, Terminated: 5/30/2018 Motion for Return of Property
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Emergency MOTION for Return of Property by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 2/13/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "SUPPLEMENT OF SEEKING RETURN OF PROPERTY AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF"]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018, Terminated: 5/30/2018 Motion for Return of Property
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Emergency MOTION for Return of Property by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018, Terminated: 5/30/2018 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Emergency MOTION to Stay by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 2/8/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "MOTION SEEKING STAY OR INJUNCTIVE ORDER TO STOP THE SALE OF PROPERTY"]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018, Terminated: 5/30/2018 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 2/8/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "MOTION SEEKING STAY OR INJUNCTIVE ORDER TO STOP THE SALE OF PROPERTY"]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018, Terminated: 2/8/2018 ~Motion for Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [DOCUMENT IS A RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE] MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 2/12/2018 (THal).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018, Terminated: 2/13/2018 Motion for More Definite Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [STRICKEN] MOTION for More Definite Statement by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 2/13/2018 (THal).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018, Terminated: 2/7/2018 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [DOCUMENT IS OBJECTIONS TO [21] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION] MOTION to Expedite by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 2/7/2018 (THal).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018, Terminated: 2/22/2018 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re [19] Third MOTION to Expedite filed by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018, Terminated: 2/5/2018 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended MOTION to Expedite by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit evidence of emails) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 2/6/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "EVIDENCE TO SUPPORT IN SEEKING INJUNCTIVE RELIEF"]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/4/2018, Entered: 2/4/2018, Terminated: 2/22/2018 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Third MOTION to Expedite by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 2/5/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "SUPPLEMENT SEEKING INJUNCTIVE RELIEF"]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/4/2018, Entered: 2/4/2018, Terminated: 5/30/2018 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Expedite by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 2/5/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "AMEND MOTION SEEKING INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AGAINST CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION"]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/4/2018, Entered: 2/4/2018, Terminated: 5/30/2018 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Expedite by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 2/5/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT IS TITLED "AMEND MOTION SEEKING AN INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AGAINST CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION"]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/4/2018, Entered: 2/4/2018, Terminated: 5/30/2018 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Expedite by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 2/5/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT IS TITLED "MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE AND SEEKING AN INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AGAINST CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION"]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER for Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] to Show Cause why she has failed to make service of the summons and complaint. Show Cause Response due by 2/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018, Terminated: 5/30/2018 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Expedite by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit letter from Attorney General, # (3) Exhibit documents from CAC, # (4) Exhibit CAC payment request) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 1/30/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "PLAINTIFF PETITION THE COURT FOR IMMEDIATE INJUNCTION RELIEF AGAINST CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION"]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018, Terminated: 5/30/2018 Motion for Permanent Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/28/2018, Entered: 1/28/2018, Terminated: 9/10/2018 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: 1/10/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            INDEX of Exhibits by Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer] Exhibt A- Report (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit Report of Credit Acceptance) (Rajapakse [E-Filer], Samantha) Modified on 1/10/2018 (SSch). [DOCUMENT TITLED "PLAINTIFF SUBMISSION OF INDEPENDENT REPORT RELATED TO CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION SHOWING PATTERN OF PRACTICE AND UNETHICAL BEHAVIOR"]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Pro Se Efiling Account Created
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pro Se E-filing Account Created for Samantha Rajapakse [E-Filer]. (DPer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Samantha Rajapakse. (BGar)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/11/2017 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Demanding Credit Acceptance to Immediately Release the title of Vehicle and Seeking Summary Judgment by Samantha Rajapakse. (Ahmed, N)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re [8] Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Samantha Rajapakse at 45 7th Calvary Rd., Fort Leavenworth, KS 66027. (HMon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: 9/26/2017 Order of Reassignment/DisqualificationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge David M. Lawson to District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes*
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or CostsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting [2] Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re [3] Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, [4] Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Samantha Rajapakse at 45 7th Calvary Road, Fort Leavenworth, KS 66027. (SPin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 Pro Se Application for E-filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Pro Se Application for E-filing submitted by Samantha Rajapakse [APPROVED PENDING COMPLETION OF ON-LINE TRAINING] (DPer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: 9/12/2017 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Samantha Rajapakse. (BGar)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: 9/12/2017 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT filed by Samantha Rajapakse against All Defendants. (BGar)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 275 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?