In Re: Ex Parte Application of China Petrochemical Development Corporation for Order Pursuant to 28:1782 to Conduct Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings
Federal Court Proceeding Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:17-mc-00157

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 4, 2019 at 11:15 PM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anne Roby, Witness

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Rachel Bess Goldman +1 212 508 6100 +1 212 508 6101 rachel.goldman@bgllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY David Alexander Shargel +1 212 508 6154 +1 212 938 3854 david.shargel@bgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pullman & Comley - Bpt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P. Atkins +1 203 330 2103 +1 203 576 8888 datkins@pullcom.com
No Logo China Petrochemical Development Corporation, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by CHAFFETZ LINDSEY LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter R. Chaffetz +1 212 257 6960 +1 212 257 6950 peter.chaffetz@chaffetzlindsey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Andreas A. Frischknecht +1 212 257 6965 +1 212 257 6950 andreas.frischknecht@chaffetzlindsey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Erin Elaine Valentine +1 212 257 6932 +1 212 257 6950 erin.valentine@chaffetzlindsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by James Wang

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Chris Chen +86 622 729 8000 +88 622 722 6677 chrischen@lcs.com.tw

Toggle Switch Represented by Wofsey, Rosen, Kweskin & Kuriansky LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Leonard Braman +1 203 327 2300 +1 203 967 9273 LBraman@wrkk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M. Frederick +1 203 327 2300 +1 203 967 9273 sfrederick@wrkk.com
No Logo Ex Parte Application of China Petrochemical Development Corporation for Order Pursuant to 28:1782 to Conduct Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings, In Re
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1782
Nature of Suit 990 - Other
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Memorandum of Conference
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    RULING AND ORDER granting 33 Motion to Quash Subpoena; granting 36 Motion to Seal; granting 39 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/28/2017. (Pincus, A)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 40 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
      Sealed Document: Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 and Reply Declaration of Hsin-Hung Chen in Further Support of Dr. Anne K. Roby's Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 by Anne Roby re 33 SEALED MOTION To Quash Subpoena Issued Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1782 . (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Hsin-Hung Chen in Further Support of Dr. Anne K. Roby's Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782, # 2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Hsin-Hung Chen)(Goldman, Rachel)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 39 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
        SEALED MOTION TO SEAL Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 and Reply Declaration of Hsin-Hung Chen in Further Support of Dr. Anne K. Roby's Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 by Anne Roby. (Goldman, Rachel)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Sealed Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 38 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Sealed Document: Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Quash by China Petrochemical Development Corporation re 33 SEALED MOTION To Quash Subpoena Issued Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1782. ( REPLACING DOC #37 ) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Chris Chen, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Chris Chen, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Edward Chen) (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
              ENTERED IN ERROR - SEALED MOTION Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Quash, Declaration of Chris Chen, and Declaration of Edward Chen by China Petrochemical Development Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Chris Chen, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Chris Chen, # 3 Declaration of Edward Chen)(Frischknecht, Andreas) Modified on 10/20/2017 (Oliver, T.).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 36 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                SEALED MOTION TO SEAL Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Quash, Declaration of Chris Chen, and Declaration of Edward Chen by China Petrochemical Development Corporation. (Frischknecht, Andreas)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting 32 Sealed Motion to Seal Motion to Quash Subpoena. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/17/17. (Kaas, E.) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                    AFFIDAVIT re 33 SEALED MOTION To Quash Subpoena Issued Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1782 / Declaration of David A. Shargel in Support of Dr. Anne K. Roby's Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 Signed By David A. Shargel filed by Anne Roby. (Shargel, David)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 33 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                      SEALED MOTION To Quash Subpoena Issued Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1782 by Anne Roby. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Subpoena, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration of Hsin-Hung Chen in Support, # 4 Exhibit A to the Chen Declaration, # 5 Exhibit B to the Chen Declaration, # 6 Exhibit C to the Chen Declaration)(Goldman, Rachel)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 32 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                        SEALED MOTION TO SEAL Motion To Quash Subpoena Issued Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1782, Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion To Quash Subpoena Issued Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1782, and Declaration Of Hsin-Hung Chen In Support Of Dr. Anne K. Robys Motion To Quash Subpoena Issued Pursuant To 28 U.S.C by Anne Roby. (Goldman, Rachel)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                          CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 25 MOTION for Attorney(s) Rachel B. Goldman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4543280) by Anne Roby. (Goldman, Rachel)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                            CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 24 MOTION for Attorney(s) David A. Shargel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4543232) by Anne Roby. (Shargel, David)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: 9/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Shargel on behalf of Anne Roby, a subpoenaed witness in this matter. (Shargel, David)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: 9/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel B. Goldman on behalf of Anne Roby, a subpoenaed witness in this matter. (Goldman, Rachel)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  ORDER granting 25 Motion for Attorney Rachel B. Goldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/24/2017. Signed by Clerk on 9/25/2017. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ORDER granting 24 Motion for Attorney David A. Shargel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/24/2017. Signed by Clerk on 9/25/2017. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION for Attorney(s) Rachel B. Goldman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4543280) by Anne Roby. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Atkins, David) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION for Attorney(s) David A. Shargel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4543232) by Anne Roby. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Atkins, David) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Atkins on behalf of Anne Roby a subpoenaed witness in this matter (Atkins, David) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Chris Chen on behalf of China Petrochemical Development Corporation (Chen, Chris) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Chris Chen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4509157) by China Petrochemical Development Corporation. (Chen, Chris) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Peter R. Chaffetz on behalf of China Petrochemical Development Corporation (Chaffetz, Peter) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Peter R. Chaffetz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4509151) by China Petrochemical Development Corporation. (Chaffetz, Peter) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Peter R. Chaffetz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4509151) by China Petrochemical Development Corporation. (Chaffetz, Peter) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 1 Ex Parte Motion. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/28/17. (Kaas, E.) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        ORDER granting 14 Motion for Attorney Chris Chen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/23/2017. Signed by Clerk on 8/24/2017. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          ORDER granting 13 Motion for Attorney Peter R. Chaffetz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/23/2017. Signed by Clerk on 8/24/2017. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION for Attorney(s) Chris Chen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4509157) by China Petrochemical Development Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Braman, Leonard) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MOTION for Attorney(s) Peter R. Chaffetz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4509151) by China Petrochemical Development Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Braman, Leonard) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Andreas A. Frischknecht on behalf of China Petrochemical Development Corporation (Frischknecht, Andreas) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andreas A. Frischknecht to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4503306) by China Petrochemical Development Corporation. (Frischknecht, Andreas) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Erin E. Valentine on behalf of China Petrochemical Development Corporation (Valentine, Erin) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Erin E. Valentine to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4503274) by China Petrochemical Development Corporation. (Valentine, Erin) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        ORDER granting 4 Motion for Attorney Andreas A. Frischknecht to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/16/2017. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/2017. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/15/2017.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            ORDER granting 3 Motion for Attorney Erin E. Valentine to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/16/2017. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/2017. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Frederick on behalf of China Petrochemical Development Corporation (Frederick, Steven) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MOTION for Attorney(s) Andreas A. Frischknecht to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4503306) by China Petrochemical Development Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Braman, Leonard) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney(s) Erin E. Valentine to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4503274) by China Petrochemical Development Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Braman, Leonard) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by China Petrochemical Development Corporation. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      EXPARTE Application for Order Under 28:1782 to Conduct Discovery by China Petrochemical Development Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Andreas A. Frischknecht, # 3 Declaration of Chris Chen, # 4 Declaration of Edward Chen)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Docket Entry Correction re 37 SEALED MOTION Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Quash, Declaration of Chris Chen, and Declaration of Edward Chen MODIFIED TO NOTE ENTRY HAS BEEN ENTERED IN ERROR AND REDOCKETED AS DOC #38; ORIGINALLY EFILED IN ERROR AS A SEALED MOTION (Oliver, T.)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Filing fee received from Leondard Braman: $47.00, receipt number CTXB00008400. (Fazekas, J.)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?