Coffman v. Queen of the Valley Medical Center
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-05575

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 2, 2020 at 6:38 PM ST (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Regional Director National Labor Relations Board, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marta Isabel Novoa +1 628 221 8865 +1 415 356 5156 mnovoa@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Queen of the Valley Medical Center, Respondent
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Response to order to show cause
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None USCA order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED; VACATING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/31/2018 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 8/24/2018. The Compliance hearing set for 7/27/2018 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/24/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Status report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None USCA order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None USCA Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None USCA Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 34 Administrative Motion for Stay of Injunction Pending Appeal. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None USCA Case Number
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO SECTION 10(J) OF THE NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS ACT re 1 Petition, filed by Jill H. Coffman. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/30/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Objection
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Brief
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Response
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Brief
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: 9/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Marta Isabel Novoa Designation of Counsel Christy Kwon for Purpose of E-Filing Notifications (Novoa, Marta) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: 9/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Proposed Summons. (Novoa, Marta) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: 9/26/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by National Labor Relations Board.. (Novoa, Marta) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: 9/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Civil Cover Sheet by National Labor Relations Board Petition for Temporary Injunction under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act. (Novoa, Marta) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: 9/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Order to Try Petition for Temporary Injunction on Administrative Hearing Record and Affidavits re 1 Petition, for Temporary Injunction under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act filed by National Labor Relations Board. Responses due by 10/2/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration In Support of Motion to Try Petition on Administrative Hearing Record and Affidavits, # 2 Proposed Order To Try Petition on Administrative Hearing Record and Affidavits)(Novoa, Marta) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: 9/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Brief re 1 Petition, Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Temporary Injunction Under Section 10(j) of the NLRA filed byNational Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Index of Exhibits in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Exhibit A in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 3 Exhibit B part 1 in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 4 Exhibit B part 2 in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 5 Exhibit B part 3 in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 6 Exhibit B part 4 in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 7 Exhibit C in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 8 Exhibit D part 1 in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 9 Exhibit D part 2 in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 10 Exhibit E in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 11 Exhibit F in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 12 Exhibit G in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Related document(s) 1 ) (Novoa, Marta) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: 9/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  PETITION for Temporary Injunction under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act against Queen of the Valley Medical Center (). Filed byNational Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit In Support of Petition for Temporary Injunction, # 3 Declaration In support of Petition for Temporary Injunction, # 4 Proposed Order Granting Petition for Temporary Injunction, # 5 Proposed Order To Show Cause)(Novoa, Marta) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 14 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?