United States v. Hulse
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-01338

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 11, 2018 at 6:13 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"
No Logo Meredith P. Hulse, Respondent
Citation Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE in light of 20 Notice of Compliance. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/13/2017. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE by USA re 1 MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons (Soufer, Jessica)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: 9/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
      STATUS REPORT by USA. (Soufer, Jessica)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET 09/13/2017 Show Cause Hearing to 10/16/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER adjourning 09/13/2017 Hearing on 15 Amended Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 09/12/2017. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Order to Show Cause, Petition to Enforce IRS Summons with exhibits including Declaration served on Meredith Hulse on August 25, 2017, filed by USA. (Soufer, Jessica) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Failure to Comply with IRS Summons. Rescheduled Show Cause Hearing set for 9/13/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. The Government shall serve Respondent with this Amended Order to Show Cause by 8/25/2017. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/17/2017. (Chen, C.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 07/27/2017.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ENTERED IN ERROR-NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE PARTIES : Counsel or pro se parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 8 Order to Show Cause, 2 Electronic Filing Order, 9 Show Cause Hearing, 12 Standing Protective Order, 11 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 1 MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by USA, 6 Order to Show Cause, 5 Order to Show Cause, 7 Affidavit of Service filed by USA, 4 Order to Show Cause, 10 Affidavit of Service filed by USA, 3 Order of Transfer Signed by Clerk on 08/09/2017.(Hernandez, T.) Modified on 8/9/2017 (Hernandez, T.). (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 07/27/2017.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ENTERED IN ERROR-Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 10/27/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 9/25/2017. Discovery due by 1/26/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 2/25/2018. Signed by Clerk on 07/27/2017.(Hernandez, T.) Modified on 8/9/2017 (Hernandez, T.). (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order to Show Cause, Petition to Enforce IRS Summons with exhibits including Declaration served on Meredith P. Hulse on August 2, 2017, filed by USA. (Soufer, Jessica) Modified on 8/9/2017 (Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Show Cause Hearing held on 7/27/2017. Respondent Meredith P. Hulse did not appear. Amended Order to Show Cause to follow. Total time: 4 minutes(Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Perez, J.) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Failure to Comply with IRS Summons Show Cause Hearing set for 8/17/2017 04:30 PM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Please see attached Order. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/27/2017. (Chen, C.) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order to Show Cause, Electronic Filing Order, Petition to Enforce IRS Summons served on Meredith Hulse on 6/22/17, filed by USA. (Soufer, Jessica) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Failure to Comply with IRS Summons Show Cause Hearing set for 7/27/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. The Government shall serve Ms. Hulse on or before 6/23/2017. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/20/2017. (Chen, C.) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Failure to Comply with IRS Summons; Show Cause Hearing set for 7/27/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. The Government shall serve Ms. Hulse on or before 6/23/2017. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/19/2017. (Chen, C.) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Failure to Comply with IRS Summons Show Cause Hearing set for 7/20/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. The Government shall serve Ms. Hulse on or before 6/23/2017. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/16/2017. (Chen, C.) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Victor A. Bolden for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 6/1/2017.(Gould, K.) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/25/17.(Campbell, A) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Order to Show Cause, # 4 Enforcement Order and Judgment)(Campbell, A) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 14 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?