Fisher v. eBay, Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:17-cv-04623

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 24, 2019 at 1:51 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charles Fisher, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Charles Fisher

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Fisher +1 203 266 7121
v.
eBay, Inc. eBay, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Bamboo.com, Inc.
Officer/Director, PayPal Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mercadolibre Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Ilan Holtzman +1 415 743 6900 +1 415 743 6910 david.holtzman@hklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyong Mi Kim +1 415 743 6952 kyong.kim@hklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Patrick Joseph Sweeney +1 212 513 3547 +1 212 341 7122 patrick.sweeney@hklaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/17/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/17/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER of dismissal. THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THIS FILE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/17/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018) Modified on 1/17/2018 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/17/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff's response due 1/12/2018. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/3/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT AND TERMINATING MOTIONS AS MOOT. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 36 Hearing set for 2/15/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
          Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES filed by EBay Inc. Responses due by 11/15/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of David I. Holtzman in Support of Joint Administrative Motion to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines, # 2 Proposed Order)(Holtzman, David) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. District Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 11/3/17. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ***E-FILED IN ERROR, INCORRECT PDF, SEE DOCKET 51 ***ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. District Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 11/3/17. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2017) Modified on 11/3/2017 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/2/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/17/2017. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2017: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                  Declaration of David I. Holtzman in Support of 46 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES filed byEBay Inc. (Related document(s) 46 ) (Holtzman, David) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EBay Inc re 45 Notice of Appearance, 46 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES (Holtzman, David) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                      Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES filed by EBay Inc. Responses due by 11/15/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of David I. Holtzman In Support of Joint Administrative Motion to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines, # 2 Proposed Order)(Holtzman, David) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of Appearance by David Ilan Holtzman (Holtzman, David) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 10/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                          ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 40 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Order Reassigning Case (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              **CLERK'S NOTICE** Following the case reassignment to Judge Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for Wednesday, November 15, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The Motion to Dismiss (ECF no. 36 ) reset to January 4, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings pursuant to Order that case be Reassigned to District Judge. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as referral judge assigned to case. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Order reassigning case and vacating hearing on Defendant's motion to dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/28/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                    Renotice motion hearing re 36 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint For Failure To State A Claim; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities filed byEBay Inc. (Related document(s) 36 ) (Kim, Kyong) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: 9/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                      REPLY (re 36 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint For Failure To State A Claim; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities ) (Reply to Non-Opposition) filed byEBay Inc. (Kim, Kyong) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: 9/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                        ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** NOTICE by EBay Inc re 36 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint For Failure To State A Claim; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities (Amended Notice of Motion) (Kim, Kyong) (Filed on 9/27/2017) Modified text on 9/28/2017 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          MOTION to Dismiss Complaint For Failure To State A Claim; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities filed by EBay Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Responses due by 9/21/2017. Replies due by 9/28/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kyong M. Kim In Support of Defendants Motion To Dismiss Complaint For Failure To State A Claim And Request For Judicial Notice, # 2 Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Defendants Motion To Dismiss Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Defendant eBay Inc.s Motion To Dismiss Complaint For Failure To State A Claim)(Kim, Kyong) (Filed on 9/7/2017) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Kyong Mi Kim as Counsel for Defendant eBay Inc. (Kim, Kyong) (Filed on 8/25/2017) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:17-cv-00008. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 7/26/17. (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER. The Motion Hearing set for May 17, 2017, see 27, is hereby cancelled. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 4/12/17.(Pike, C.) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Dominic J. Squatrito for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 4/11/2017. (Walker, A) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by eBay, Inc re 28 Reply to Response to Motion (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          REPLY to Response to 18 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue, filed by eBay, Inc. (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing re 18 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue set for 5/17/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Landman, M) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting 23 Motion to Stay. Discovery is stayed pending resolution of the 18 Motion to Dismiss/Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/28/2017. (Landman, M) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                OBJECTION re 18 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue, filed by Charles Fisher. (Attachments: # 1 copy of envelope) (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Memorandum in Support re 23 Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by eBay, Inc. (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery by eBay, Inc.Responses due by 4/14/2017 (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      26(f) NOTICE: The Court has reviewed the file in this case to monitor the parties compliance with Local Rule 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) provides that, within 30 days after the appearance of any defendant, the attorneys of record and any unrepresented parties must confer for purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) further provides that, within 10 days after the conference, the participants must jointly file a report of the conference using Form 26(f). It appears that more than forty four days have passed since the appearance of a defendant in this case but no report has been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the parties must file on or before : [2 weeks from today], (1) a written statement signed by all counsel of record demonstrating that this case is exempt from the requirement of filing a form 26(f) report; or (2) a form 26(f) report along with a written statement signed by all counsel of record explaining why sanctions should not be imposed for the parties failure to comply with Local Rule 26(f). Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the complaint. ( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/24/2017) Signed by Clerk on 3/10/2017.(Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by eBay, Inc re 19 Affidavit, 18 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue,, 20 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Memorandum in Support re 18 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue, filed by eBay, Inc. (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT re 18 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue, Signed By Rebekah Long filed by eBay, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue, by eBay, Inc.Responses due by 3/24/2017 (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/17/2017. (Landman, M) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Third MOTION for Extension of Time until March 3, 2017 respond to complaint by eBay, Inc. (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/8/2017. (Landman, M) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Second MOTION for Extension of Time until February 17, 2017 response to complaint by eBay, Inc. (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/11/2017. (Landman, M) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          EXHIBIT No. 1, email re consent by eBay, Inc re 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 9, 2017 respond to complaint. (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 9, 2017 respond to complaint 1 Notice of Removal by eBay, Inc. (Sweeney, Patrick) Modified on 1/10/2017 TO LINK TO DOC #1 (Oliver, T.). (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE by eBay, Inc Standing Order Statement re Removal Action (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE by eBay, Inc No Pending Motions in State Court Action (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Amended CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by eBay, Inc re 1 Notice of Removal, 4 Electronic Filing Order, 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Docket Entry Correction re 6 Electronic Service Documents, ADDED PDF (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE PARTIES : Counsel or pro se parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Civil Covery Sheet filed by eBay, Inc, 5 Standing Protective Order, 1 Notice of Removal filed by eBay, Inc, 4 Electronic Filing Order, 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 1/5/2017.(Fazekas, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2017: # 1 REMOVAL STANDING ORDER) (Fazekas, J.). (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/3/2017.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/3/2017.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 4/3/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 3/4/2017. Discovery due by 7/5/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 8/4/2017. Signed by Clerk on 1/3/2017.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE by eBay, Inc re 1 Notice of Removal (Civil Cover Sheet) (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ebay Inc. from Superior Court of Connecticut, case number LLI-CV16-5008300-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0205-4250136, filed by Ebay Inc..(Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Clerk mailed copy of Reassignment Order to Plaintiff Charles Fisher to the address of 530 Main St. South, Bethlehem, CT 06751 via USPS First Class Mail. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 37 Notice (Other) filed by EBay Inc (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Answer deadline updated for eBay, Inc to 3/3/2017. (Landman, M)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Answer deadline updated for eBay, Inc to 2/17/2017. (Landman, M)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Answer deadline updated for eBay, Inc to 2/9/2017. (Landman, M)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Walker, A)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?