Green v. United States of America
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00433
District Judge Roslyn O Silver, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 30, 2020 at 6:46 PM DT (6.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Randy S Green, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KIRK A. MCCARVILLE, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KIRK A MCCARVILLE +1 602 468 1714 +1 602 468 2404
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Charles Wilson +1 602 468 1714 +1 602 468 2404 phil@mccarvillelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Howard B. Cohen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John L Dillingham +1 602 468 1811 JLDillingham@qwestoffice.net
United States of America United States of America, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles M Duffy , +1 202 307 6406 +1 202 307 0054 Charles.M.Duffy@usdoj.gov
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles M Duffy , +1 202 307 6406 +1 202 307 0054 Charles.M.Duffy@usdoj.gov
No Logo Joseph G Guerra, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Randy S Green, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KIRK A. MCCARVILLE, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KIRK A MCCARVILLE +1 602 468 1714 +1 602 468 2404
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Charles Wilson +1 602 468 1714 +1 602 468 2404 phil@mccarvillelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Howard B. Cohen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John L Dillingham +1 602 468 1811 JLDillingham@qwestoffice.net
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7422
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver: Scheduling Conference held on 9/21/2017. The parties are to submit a revised Rule 16 Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 9/28/17. The revised order shall reflect the new initial disclosure deadline, as well as the status report deadline and status conference date. The Court approves all other dates proposed. APPEARANCES: Philip Wilson and John Dillingham for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by Charles Duffy for Defendant. Joint Status Report due by 7/13/2018. Interim Status Conference set for 7/20/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver. (Court Reporter Elva Cruz-Lauer.) Hearing held 3:33 PM to 4:02 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CLB) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 25 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER Counsel for the United States, Mr. Charles Duffy, may appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on September 21, 2017 at 3:30 P.M. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED each individual permitted to appear telephonically must use a landline phone; cell phone and speaker phone appearances are not permitted. All individuals who received permission to appear telephonically must join a conference call on one line prior to calling the Court at the scheduled time. The Court's telephone number is (602) 332-7520. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver on 9/15/17. (CLB) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: 10/17/2017 Notice of Service of Discovery
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, presently set for 09/22/2017 at 1:30 PM is VACATED and RESET for 9/21/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver. Ordered by Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver. (ROS, sg)( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 28 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 Scheduling Order
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, presently set for 9/06/2017 at 10:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 9/22/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver. Ordered by Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver. (ROS, sg)( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 27 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017 Notice of Errata
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER Defendant United States' unopposed motion 21 is GRANTED in part. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, presently set for August 17, 2017 at 2:30 PM is VACATED and RESET for September 6, 2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the stipulation (Doc. 16) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O.Silver on 7/26/17. (CLB) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      * MOTION to Continue the August 17, 2017 Rule 16 Conference and Allow the Telephonic Appearance of Counsel (Unnopposed) re: 17 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Proposed Order)(Duffy, Charles). * Added MOTION to Allow Telephonic Appearance of Certain Counsel on 7/27/2017 (LAD). (Entered: 07/26/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      *REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Joint Proposed Case Management Plan by Randy S Green. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCarville, Kirk) *Modified on 7/26/2017 to correct event (ATD). (Entered: 07/25/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Counter Defendant Joseph G Guerra. (ATD) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          *APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Counter Claimant United States of America against Counter Defendant Joseph G Guerra. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Charles Duffy, # 2 Duffy Dec Ex A, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Duffy, Charles) *Modified on 7/21/2017 to correct event (ATD). (Entered: 07/20/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, presently set for 08/04/2017 at 10:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 8/17/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver. Ordered by Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver. (ROS, sg)( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              STIPULATION Requesting that Counsel Be Allowed to Appear by Telephone at the August 4, 2017 Court Conference by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Duffy, Charles) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: Proof of Service re: Counter-Claim upon Joseph G. Guerra on 05/25/2017. (Duffy, Charles) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Summons Issued as to Joseph G. Guerra. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 05/19/2017)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/4/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver. [See attached Order for details.] Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 5/18/2017. (KAL) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      SUMMONS Submitted by United States of America. (Duffy, Charles) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Randy S Green, Joseph G. Guerra by United States of America.(Duffy, Charles) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER: Pursuant to the United States' Unopposed Motion for a Twenty-five (25) Day Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED the motion (Doc. 9 ) is GRANTED. The United States shall have through and including May 18, 2017, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 4/18/2017. (KAL) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Duffy, Charles) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon any Defendant(s) who have not yet appeared and file notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 3/8/2017. (KAL) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Roslyn O. Silver. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-17-433-PHX-ROS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  Order that Randy S Green show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 3/27/2017 at 04:30 PM before Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: # 1 Instructions, # 2 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Summons Issued as to United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(KGM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-13907728. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-17-00433-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: # 1 MAG 25 Instructions)(KGM) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      SUMMONS Submitted by Randy S Green (submitted by Kirk McCarville). (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(KGM) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13907728 filed by Randy S Green (submitted by Kirk McCarville). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KGM) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 78 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?