Roy E. Doyle v. US Postal Service
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:91-cv-00468-MJG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Roy E. Doyle, Petitioner
v.
United States Postal Service United States Postal Service, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Ira Salem +1 301 344 4433 +1 301 344 4516 David.Salem@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 2/19/1991
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 875 - Taxes: Customer Challenge
Cause Motion to Quash
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County 88888
Terminated 5/14/1991
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 5/14/1991, Entered: 5/19/1991 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER dated 5/13/91 granting [3-1] motion to Transfer Case. "TRANSFERRING" Case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis )(c/m 5/14/91 jrw)(microfilmed 5/19/91 dmt) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/14/1991, Entered: 5/19/1991 Terminated Case
    Case closed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 4/30/1991, Entered: 5/7/1991 Reply to Response to Motion
      REPLY by Roy E. Doyle to response to [1-1] motion to Quash an administrative subpoena memorandum (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 4/19/1991, Entered: 5/19/1991, Terminated: 5/14/1991 Motion to Transfer Case
        MOTION by US Postal Service to Transfer Case (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 4/19/1991, Entered: 4/24/1991, Terminated: 5/14/1991 Response to Motion
          RESPONSE by US Postal Service to [1-1] motion to Quash an administrative subpoena memorandum (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 2/27/1991, Entered: 3/8/1991 Affidavit
            AFFIDAVIT by Roy E. Doyle Re: in support [1-1] motion to Quash an administrative subpoena memorandum (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 2/19/1991, Entered: 3/1/1991 Motion to Quash
              MOTION by Roy E. Doyle to Quash an administrative subpoena memorandum (cc to chambers jf) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 44 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?