United States v. Monheimer
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Hampshire District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00354

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 24, 2019 at 3:06 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip L. Bednar +1 202 307 6415 +1 202 514 5238 philip.l.bednar@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Myra W. Korin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Daut Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert F. Daut +1 781 444 1515 bdaut@masslegalcounsel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Kelly Norton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly A. Norton +1 603 828 6295 Kelly@knortonlaw.com
No Logo Wolfeboro, NH, Town of, Defendant
No Logo Robert H. Monheimer, Defendant - Defaulted
No Logo Unnamed Successor, Trustee, Defendant - Defaulted
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7403
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Response - not to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Stay
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Mediation Notice
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Mediation Statement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Extend Time
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Extend Time
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Leave to File
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Status report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Suggestion of Death
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                  Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Amend Pleadings filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law)(Bednar, Philip)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Order on Discovery Plan
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER approving 23 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 2 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 10/5/2018. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 4/16/2018. Mediation Follow Up on 8/15/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(ko) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        NO CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Because not all parties to the case consent to the assignment of a United States Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, 28 U.S.C. sec. 636(c), and Local Rule 73.1(b)(2), the case will be assigned to a United States District Judge. Clerk Daniel J. Lynch. (Bednar, Philip)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                          Joint Assented to MOTION Telephonic Appearance at Preliminary Pretrial Conference filed by USA.(Bednar, Philip)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            Proposed Discovery Plan filed by USA. In cases assigned to the Magistrate Judge, plaintiff, or the removing defendant if the case was initiated by a Notice of Removal, is responsible for filing a consent form on or before the deadline for filing the Discovery Plan using the Other Documents/Magistrate Judge Assignment--Consent/Objection event.(Bednar, Philip)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by USA re: 21 Clerk's Entry of Default (Bednar, Philip)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Unnamed Successor, Trustee. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court.(kad) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                  SERVICE by Publication as to Defendant Unnamed Successor to Craig R. Evans, as Trustee of the George Evans Memorial Trust filed by USA. Last publication date 12/1/2017. Claim due on 1/1/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bednar, Philip)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by USA re: 17 Clerk's Entry of Default (Bednar, Philip)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                      Defendant Myra Korin's ANSWER to 1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Myra W. Korin.(Daut, Robert)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Robert H. Monheimer. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court.(kad) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: 11/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                            Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Serve Summons and Complaint filed by USA.(Bednar, Philip)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                              Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to November 17, 2017 filed by Myra W. Korin.(Norton, Kelly)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                Addendum/ to 12 Assented to MOTION for Robert Daut, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1578910.) by Myra W. Korin. (Norton, Kelly)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT re 9 Notice Regarding Service filed by USA(Bednar, Philip)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 10/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Robert Daut, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1578910.) filed by Myra W. Korin. Attorney Kelly A. Norton added to party Myra W. Korin(pty:dft). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Attorney Robert Daut)(Norton, Kelly)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Joint Assented to MOTION to Excuse Town of Wolfeboro (regarding answer filing requirement and active participation in the case) filed by USA.(Bednar, Philip)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION for Default as to Robert H. Monheimer filed by USA. Follow up on Objection on 11/8/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Philip L. Bednar, # 2 Proposed Order)(Bednar, Philip)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE Regarding Service as to Myra W. Korin, Robert H. Monheimer, Wolfeboro, NH, Town of. Affidavit of Service due on 11/2/2017.(kad) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to Robert H. Monheimer by USA. Served/Mailed on 9/23/2017. Answer Follow Up on 10/16/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bednar, Philip)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Myra W. Korin by USA. Served/Mailed on 8/15/2017. Answer Follow Up on 10/17/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bednar, Philip)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                STIPULATION re: Participation in this Case by USA (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bednar, Philip) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Wolfeboro, NH, Town of by USA. Served/Mailed on 9/8/2017. Answer Follow Up on 9/29/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bednar, Philip) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MOTION for Service by Publication filed by USA. Follow up on Objection on 9/20/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit (Affidavit) Bednar Declaration)(Bednar, Philip) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      Summonses issued electronically as to Myra W. Korin, Robert H. Monheimer, Unnamed Successor, Trustee, Wolfeboro, NH, Town of. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: # 1 Notice ECF, # 2 Assignment to Magistrate.) (lml) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties.(lml) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons - Waiver Summons (Monheimer), # 3 Summons - Waiver Summons (Korin), # 4 Summons - Waiver Summons (unknown successor), # 5 Summons - Waiver Summons (Town Clerk), # 6 Summons - Waiver Summons (Selectman))(Bednar, Philip) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            ENDORSED ORDER granting 27 Motion to Extend Time to Amend Pleadings. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing. Discovery Status Conference set for 6/14/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. At least 7 days prior to the date of the conference, the parties shall submit a joint statement regarding the status of discovery.(kad)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 1/2/2019. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 1/16/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Joseph A. DiClerico Jr. JERS Statement due 1/23/2019. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 2/5/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Joseph A. DiClerico Jr. (ko)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER granting 24 Joint Assented to MOTION Telephonic Appearance at Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Text of Order: Granted. Counsel shall provide the clerk's office with direct dial numbers where they can be reached for the pretrial conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(ko)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Case reassigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. Reason for Reassignment: not all parties consent to the assignment of this case to the magistrate judge. The new case designation is: 17-cv-354-JD. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings.(kad)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 1/24/2018. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(kad)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Motion for Default. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Text of Order: Granted.(kad)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          ENDORSED ORDER granting 16 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Serve Summons and Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. As not all parties have been served in the case, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). The court will schedule the pretrial conference once all defendants have been served or upon the expiration of time allowed for service on remaining defendants under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 12/15/2017.(kad)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            ENDORSED ORDER granting 12 Assented to MOTION for Robert Daut, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Robert Daut, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 11/17/2017.To access the online registration form, click HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click HERE.(kad)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              ENDORSED ORDER granting 15 Motion to Extend Time to November 17, 2017. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 11/17/2017. (kad)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE of ECF Filing Error NO ACTION REQUIRED re: 12 Assented to MOTION for Robert Daut, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1578910.) filed by Myra W. Korin. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(kad)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER granting 11 Joint Assented to MOTION to Excuse Town of Wolfeboro (regarding answer filing requirement and active participation in the case). Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(ko)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    ACTION REQUIRED - NOTICE Nonconforming Document re 12 Assented to MOTION for Robert Daut, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1578910.) filed by Myra W. Korin. The document fails to comply with LR 7.1 - No statement of concurrence was included. File statement as addendum using the Other Documents/Addendum event and link filing(s) to document no. 12. The document will remain on file. Please note that unless a document curing the defect is filed by the Notice of Compliance Deadline the matter may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423. Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 11/8/2017.(kad)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER 6 Stipulation. Text of Order: The court has reviewed the stipulation. It does not appear that the representations in paragraphs 1 and 3 require court involvement at this time. To the extent the parties seek a court order with respect to paragraph 2, then they must file a formal motion seeking such relief. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(vln)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER granting 4 Motion for Service by Publication. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(vln)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:17-cv-354-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (lml)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click HERE. (lml)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?