United States v. Purcell
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-05110

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 15, 2019 at 2:15 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Lewis Stier +1 415 436 7017 +1 415 436 6748 cynthia.stier@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Jill B. Purcell, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite A

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Woodford G. Rowland +1 415 472 3434 +1 415 472 1298 woody@rowlandatty.com
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7402
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Breyer on 12/6/2017. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION for Voluntary Dismissal filed by United States of America. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation To Reschedule Hearing And [Proposed] Order filed by United States of America. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/24/2017, Entered: 11/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
        Reply to Opposition to 9 Order to Show Cause by United States of America. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 11/24/2017) Modified on 11/27/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Appearance by Woodford G. Rowland on behalf of Jill B. Purcell (Rowland, Woodford) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: 10/3/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ENFORCEMENT OF INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE SUMMONS: Re 8 Proposed Order filed by United States of America. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/8/2017 at 10:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/3/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
              Proposed Order re 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons [Proposed] Order by United States of America. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer filed on 9/19/2017. Granting 3 Motion to Relate Case. The Court finds the following cases related: C17-5110 CRB and C17-5116 KAW. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/7/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 9/6/2017) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by United States of America. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 9/6/2017) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/15/2017. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons . Filed byUNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 9/1/2017) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 5 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?