United States v. Purcell
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-05116

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 9, 2019 at 2:10 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Lewis Stier +1 415 436 7017 +1 415 436 6748 cynthia.stier@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo William E. Purcell, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite A

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Woodford G. Rowland +1 415 472 3434 +1 415 472 1298 woody@rowlandatty.com
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7402
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Breyer on 12/6/2017. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION for Voluntary Dismissal filed by United States of America. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation To Reschedule Hearing And [Proposed] Order filed by United States of America. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/24/2017, Entered: 11/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
        Reply to 15 Opposition to Order to Show Cause by United States of America. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 11/24/2017) Modified on 11/27/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
          Proposed Order re 15 Response by William E. Purcell. (Rowland, Woodford) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
            Declaration of Tracy Luy in Support of 15 Response filed byWilliam E. Purcell. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Rowland, Woodford) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
              Declaration of Jill B. Purcell in Support of 15 Response filed byWilliam E. Purcell. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Rowland, Woodford) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                Declaration of William E. Purcell in Support of 15 Response filed byWilliam E. Purcell. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Rowland, Woodford) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                  Response to 1 Petition by William E. Purcell. (Rowland, Woodford) (Filed on 11/17/2017) Modified on 11/20/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Woodford G. Rowland (Rowland, Woodford) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                      CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Woodford G. Rowland on behalf of William E. Purcell (Rowland, Woodford) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: 10/3/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ENFORCEMENT OF INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE SUMMONS: Re 11 Proposed Order filed by United States of America. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/8/2017 at 10:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/3/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                          Proposed Order re 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons by United States of America. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Judge Hon. Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer filed on 9/19/2017. Granting 3 Motion to Relate Case. The Court finds the following cases related: C17-5110 CRB and C17-5116 KAW. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/19/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER Order to Show Cause Hearing Re: Enforcement of IRS Summons set for 10/27/2017 09:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/8/17. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/7/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 9/6/2017) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION to Relate Case Adminstrative Motionto Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 9/6/2017) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/15/2017. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons . Filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 9/1/2017) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety with a signature and using the correct event - Civil Events > Other Filings > Notices > Notice of Appearance. Re: 13 Certificate of Counsel filed by William E. Purcell. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Vacating OSC Re: Enforcement of IRS Summons before Judge Illston as a result of the case being reassigned to Judge Breyer. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?