Aflalo v. Weiner
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:17-cv-61923

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 10, 2019 at 4:20 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Order dismissing case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claimCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 20 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. Plaintiff may file a second amended complaint by July 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (koa)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER denying 10 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court; denying as moot 15 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/29/2017. (kcg)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Remand to State Court
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Court Practice
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 1 time.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?