Jang v. The Trustees of St. Johnsbury Academy
Federal Civil Lawsuit Vermont District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00162

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 29, 2019 at 10:29 AM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Transmitted Index on Appeal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of appeal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Alter JudgmentCourt Filing
        OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's 37 MOTION to Alter Judgment, MOTION to Amend Judgment, and 38 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint are DENIED. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 10/12/2018. (hbc)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Alter Judgment
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None judgment
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
                      OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' 8 JOINT MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint is DENIED and Defendants' 11 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 25 MOTION for Leave to File Affidavits is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 7/6/2018. (hbc)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None transcript
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time (general)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Consent to Direct Assignment
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Consent to Direct Assignment
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Amended Document (NOT Motion, NOT Complaint)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Strike
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Waiver of Service Returned Executed
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?