Mosser Companies, Inc. v. Eberwein
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:17-cv-05707

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 14, 2018 at 11:37 PM DT (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1442
Nature of Suit Federal Employer's Liability
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/22/17. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If plaintiff fails to respond within 28 days of this Order, the Clerk of the Court shall terminate the docket and close the file. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/13/17. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 4 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?