Rowe v. Social Security
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-13264

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 26, 2019 at 10:41 AM EDT (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 206
Nature of Suit Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Attorney Fees
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None order on report and recommendationCourt Filing
          ORDER (1) Accepting the Recommendation Contained in the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation Dated November 21, 2018 (Dkt. 17 ), (2) Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 15 ),and (3) Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 16 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Report and Recommendation
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order for Social Security Case*
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Answer
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER (1) Adopting the Recommendation Contained in the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation Dated October 13, 2017 (Dkt. 4 ), and (2) Denying as Moot Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Dkt. 2 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Notice - Other
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/3/2017, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/24/2017, Entered: None Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Report and Recommendation
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Referral of Social Security Case*
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?