Matthews v. LeBlanc

Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-08800
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 18, 2019 at 5:42 PM EST (5.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Ronald Matthews, Plaintiff

Represented by Grodner Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Unkel Grodner +1 225 769 1919 dgrodner@grodnerlaw.com
v.
No Logo A. Moss, Defendant

Represented by Suite 301

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Jeffrey G. Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 jeff@rlagardelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Ross Forrest Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 +1 985 605 0526 ross@rlagardelaw.com
No Logo Audrey Moss, Defendant

Represented by Suite 301

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Jeffrey G. Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 jeff@rlagardelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Ross Forrest Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 +1 985 605 0526 ross@rlagardelaw.com
No Logo Casey Webb, Defendant

Represented by Suite 301

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Jeffrey G. Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 jeff@rlagardelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Ross Forrest Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 +1 985 605 0526 ross@rlagardelaw.com
No Logo Deputy Hoffman, Defendant

Represented by Suite 301

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Jeffrey G. Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 jeff@rlagardelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Ross Forrest Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 +1 985 605 0526 ross@rlagardelaw.com
No Logo Deputy Readhead, Defendant

Represented by Suite 301

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Jeffrey G. Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 jeff@rlagardelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Ross Forrest Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 +1 985 605 0526 ross@rlagardelaw.com
No Logo Deputy Webb, Defendant

Represented by Suite 301

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Jeffrey G. Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 jeff@rlagardelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Ross Forrest Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 +1 985 605 0526 ross@rlagardelaw.com
No Logo Dereck Hoffman, Defendant

Represented by Suite 301

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Jeffrey G. Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 jeff@rlagardelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Ross Forrest Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 +1 985 605 0526 ross@rlagardelaw.com
No Logo M. LeBlanc, Defendant

Represented by Suite 301

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Jeffrey G. Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 jeff@rlagardelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Ross Forrest Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 +1 985 605 0526 ross@rlagardelaw.com
No Logo Mark LeBlanc, Defendant

Represented by Suite 301

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Jeffrey G. Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 jeff@rlagardelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Ross Forrest Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 +1 985 605 0526 ross@rlagardelaw.com
No Logo N. Paternastro, Defendant

Represented by Suite 301

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Jeffrey G. Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 jeff@rlagardelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Ross Forrest Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 +1 985 605 0526 ross@rlagardelaw.com
No Logo Nico Paternastro, Defendant

Represented by Suite 301

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Jeffrey G. Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 jeff@rlagardelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Ross Forrest Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 +1 985 605 0526 ross@rlagardelaw.com
No Logo Samuel Readhead, Defendant

Represented by Suite 301

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Jeffrey G. Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 jeff@rlagardelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Ross Forrest Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 +1 985 605 0526 ross@rlagardelaw.com
No Logo Shannon Coats, Defendant

Represented by Suite 301

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Jeffrey G. Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 jeff@rlagardelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Ross Forrest Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 +1 985 605 0526 ross@rlagardelaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Timeline
  Entries (96) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: 6/6/2018 judgmentCourt Filing
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Audrey Moss, Casey Webb, Dereck Hoffman, Mark LeBlanc, Nico Paternastro, Samuel Readhead, Shannon Coats against Ronald Matthews. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 6/6/2018.(blg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Jury Verdict Form
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Jury Verdict Form
JURY VERDICT FORMS. (blg) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Trial Exhibit List
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Trial Exhibit List
Trial Exhibit List. (blg) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Jury Trial - Completed
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Jury Trial CompletedCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Jury Trial completed on 6/5/2018. (Court Reporter Sandy Minutillo.) (Attachments: # 1 Jury Instructions, # 2 Certification of Trial Exhibits) (blg) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Jury Trial - Begun
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Jury Trial BegunCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Jury Trial begun on 6/4/2018. Evidence entered. Court recessed to reconvene on 6/5/2018 at 7:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Sandy Minutillo.) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Removal of Exhibits) (blg) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum Issued
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Rhamad Jackson for 6/5/2018. (blg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandumCourt Filing
ORDER granting 82 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Rhamad Jackson to appear June 5, 2018 before Judge Lance M. Africk. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 6/4/2018. (cc: USM) (blg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum as to Rhamad Jackson by Ronald Matthews. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Grodner, Donna) Modified on 6/4/2018 (blg).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Telephone Conference held on 6/1/2018. ORDERED that the plaintiff's objection regarding the number of exhibits containing medical records from the St. Tammany Parish Sheriff's Office is OVERRULED. FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff's objection regarding the presentation of defense excerpts from said medical records as joint exhibits is SUSTAINED. (blg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Objections
OBJECTIONS by Ronald Matthews to Joint Bench Book submission (Grodner, Donna)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 proposed voir dire
Proposed Voir Dire by Ronald Matthews. (Grodner, Donna)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 stipulation
JOINT STIPULATION by All Defendants, Ronald Matthews. (Lagarde, Jeffrey) Modified text and filers on 5/31/2018 (sbs).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 proposed voir dire
Proposed Voir Dire by All Defendants. (Lagarde, Jeffrey)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Status ConferenceCourt Filing
MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER for Conference held on 5/22/2018 before Judge Lance M Africk. Per the discussion in the conference, the plaintiff's pending objections (Doc. 70 ) are set forth as stated in document. (sa) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 proposed jury instructions
Proposed Jury Instructions by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit)(Lagarde, Jeffrey)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 proposed jury instructions
Joint Proposed Jury Instructions by Ronald Matthews, Derek Hoffman, Mark LeBlanc, Audrey Moss, Nico Paternastro, Samuel Readhead, Casey Webb, Shannon Coats. (Grodner, Donna) Modified text and filers on 5/22/2018 (sbs).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 Response/Reply
Response/Reply by All Defendants Opposition to R. Doc. 70 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Lagarde, Jeffrey) Modified text on 5/22/2018 (sbs).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018 Proposed Jury Verdict Form
Proposed Jury Verdict Form by Ronald Matthews, and All Defendants. (Grodner, Donna) Modified text and filers on 5/21/2018 (sbs).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018 Witness List *
Witness List by All Defendants. (Lagarde, Jeffrey)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 Objections
OBJECTIONS by All Plaintiffs re 54 Pretrial Conference to Defendants evidence as listed in the PTO (Grodner, Donna)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Proposed Pretrial Order
Joint Proposed Pretrial Order by Ronald Matthews, Shannon Coats, Dereck Hoffman, Casey Webb, Samuel Readhead, Nico Paternastro, Audrey Moss, Mark LeBlanc. (Grodner, Donna) Modified text and filers on 5/16/2018 (sbs).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Telephone Conference held on 5/15/2018. ORDERED that the parties file a joint pretrial order no later than 5/16/2018 at 10:00 A.M. FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' 60 motion to file a separate proposed pretrial order is DENIED. (blg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum Issued
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Jonathan Nall for June 4, 2018. (blg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum Issued
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Curtis Hall for June 4, 2018. (blg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum Issued
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Ronald Matthew for June 4, 2018. (blg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandumCourt Filing
ORDER granting 58 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Ronald Matthew, Curtis Hall and Jonathan Nall to appear June 4, 2018 before Judge Lance M. Africk. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/15/2018. (3cc-USM) (blg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum Issued
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Calvin Jefferson for June 4, 2018. (blg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandumCourt Filing
ORDER granting 58 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Calvin Jefferson to appear June 4, 2018 before Judge Lance M. Africk. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/15/2018. (3cc-USM) (blg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that Matthews' 55 objection regarding qualified immunity is OVERRULED, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/14/2018.(blg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Leave to File Document
MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Pre-Trial Order by Shannon Coats, Deputy Hoffman, Dereck Hoffman, M. LeBlanc, Mark LeBlanc, A. Moss, Audrey Moss, N. Paternastro, Nico Paternastro, Deputy Readhead, Samuel Readhead, Casey Webb, Deputy Webb. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/30/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support, # 2 Exhibit 2 Exh 1 - May 4 emails, # 3 Exhibit 2a Exh 1 - May 4 emails, # 4 Exhibit 2b - Exh 1 - May 4 emails, # 5 Exhibit 3 - Exh 2 - May 8 email, # 6 Exhibit 3a - Exh 2 May 8 email, # 7 Exhibit 4 - Exh 3 - May 9 email chain, # 8 Exhibit 4a - Exh 3 - May 9 email chain, # 9 Exhibit 5 - Exh 4 - May 10 email, # 10 Exhibit 5a - Exh 4 - May 10 email - WordPerfect, # 11 Exhibit Pre Trial Order, # 12 Proposed Order, # 13 Notice of Submission)(Lagarde, Jeffrey)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Proposed Pretrial Order
Proposed Pretrial Order by Ronald Matthews (Grodner, Donna)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum as to Trial Witnesses by Ronald Matthews. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Grodner, Donna) Modified on 5/14/2018 (blg).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: 5/10/2018 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re 55 OBJECTION to Charging the Jury on Qualified Immunity . (Lagarde, Jeffrey) Modified text on 5/11/2018 (mm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 55 MOTION to Strike 54 Pretrial Conference Objection to charging the jury on qualified immunity **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Objection. Clerk took corrective action by either re-docketing the event or changing the event.** (sbs) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: 5/8/2018 Strike
OBJECTION to Charging the Jury on Qualified Immunity by Ronald Matthews. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum in Support)(Grodner, Donna) Modified text/link/submission on 5/9/2018 (sbs).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Final Pretrial Conference held on 5/3/2018. Counsel shall comply with deadlines, as stated herein. (blg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 37 Amended Complaint by Shannon Coats, Dereck Hoffman, Mark LeBlanc, Audrey Moss, Nico Paternastro, Samuel Readhead, Casey Webb.Attorney Jeffrey G. Lagarde added to party Shannon Coats(pty:dft).(Lagarde, Jeffrey)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
DEFICIENT: ANSWER to 37 Amended Complaint by Mark LeBlanc, Audrey Moss, Nico Paternastro, Samuel Readhead, Casey Webb, Dereck Hoffman, and Shannon Coats. Attorney Jeffrey G. Lagarde added to party Shannon Coats(pty:dft).(Lagarde, Jeffrey) Modified text on 5/3/2018 (mm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
Proposed Pretrial Order by Ronald Matthews (Grodner, Donna)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER denying as untimely 45, 46, 47 and 48 Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/19/2018. (blg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 45 MOTION in Limine to Disallow Comparative Fault, 46 MOTION in Limine to Suppress Testimony and Evidence, 48 MOTION in Limine to Suppress Testimony and Evidence Regarding Inmate Witnesses, 47 MOTION in Limine to Suppress Testimony and Evidence; Filing attorney should have selected 'No' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Clerk modified docket text. No further action is necessary. (blg) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine to Suppress Testimony and Evidence Regarding Inmate Witnesses by Ronald Matthews. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Pleading, # 3 Exhibit)(Grodner, Donna) Modified on 4/19/2018 (blg).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine to Suppress Testimony and Evidence by Ronald Matthews. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Grodner, Donna) Modified on 4/19/2018 (blg).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine to Suppress Testimony and Evidence by Ronald Matthews. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Grodner, Donna) Modified on 4/19/2018 (blg).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
MOTION in Limine to Disallow Comparative Fault by Ronald Matthews. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Grodner, Donna) Modified on 4/19/2018 (blg).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Shannon Coats served on 4/6/2018, answer due 4/27/2018. (Grodner, Donna) Modified text on 4/18/2018 (jeg).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Shannon Coats on 3/27/2018, answer due 5/29/2018. (Grodner, Donna)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued as to Shannon Coats. (blg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 39 Return of Service (Non Summons & Complaint), 38 Return of Service (Non Summons & Complaint); Documents have been stricken pursuant to Rule 5(d) of the FRCP. (blg) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Grodner, Donna)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
**STRICKEN** Return of Service of subpoena for production served on Denise Mancuso on 03/16/2018 by Ronald Matthews.(Grodner, Donna) Modified on 3/27/2018 (blg).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
**STRICKEN** Return of Service of subpoena for production served on St. Tamany Parish SO on 03/14/2018 by Ronald Matthews.(Grodner, Donna) Modified on 3/27/2018 (blg).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Mark LeBlanc, Audrey Moss, Nico Paternastro, Samuel Readhead, Casey Webb, Dereck Hoffman, Shannon Coats filed by Ronald Matthews.(blg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 34 Motion for Leave to File amended complaint. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 3/19/2018. (blg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 34 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint with consent; Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the district judge. Clerk took corrective action. (blg) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: 3/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint with consent by Ronald Matthews. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Proposed Pleading)(Grodner, Donna) Modified on 3/16/2018 (blg).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
**DEFICIENT** MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint consent sought but not obtained by Ronald Matthews. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/12/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Proposed Pleading)(Grodner, Donna) Modified on 3/13/2018 (blg).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/10/2018, Entered: 3/10/2018 Unknown Document Type
Witness and Exhibit List by Ronald Matthews. (Grodner, Donna)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
Witness and Exhibit List by All Defendants. (Lagarde, Jeffrey)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Status Conference held on 1/9/2018. (blg) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: 1/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT Amended submitted by Ronald Matthews (Grodner, Donna)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: 1/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT submitted by Ronald Matthews (Grodner, Donna)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT by All Defendants (Lagarde, Ross)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/9/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Lance M Africk. Counsel shall comply as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/13/2017.(blg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/9/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Lance M Africk. All discovery must be completed by 3/19/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2018 10:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Jury Trial set for 6/4/2018 08:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Magistrate Judge)(blg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: 11/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/28/2017 10:15 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (blg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: 11/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order Vacating Case Referral to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 11/6/2017.(blg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: 11/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF 636(c) NON CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 11/6/2017. (NEF: Judge Africk)(ajn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Deputy Hoffman, M. LeBlanc, A. Moss, N. Paternastro, Deputy Readhead, Deputy Webb.(Lagarde, Ross)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Deputy Hoffman, M. LeBlanc, A. Moss, N. Paternastro, Deputy Readhead, and Deputy Webb. Answer due as to all defendants is 10/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 10/10/2017. (ajn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Deputy Hoffman, M. LeBlanc, A. Moss, N. Paternastro, Deputy Readhead, Deputy Webb. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: # 1 Order)Attorney Ross Forrest Lagarde added to party Deputy Hoffman(pty:dft), Attorney Ross Forrest Lagarde added to party M. LeBlanc(pty:dft), Attorney Ross Forrest Lagarde added to party A. Moss(pty:dft), Attorney Ross Forrest Lagarde added to party N. Paternastro(pty:dft), Attorney Ross Forrest Lagarde added to party Deputy Readhead(pty:dft), Attorney Ross Forrest Lagarde added to party Deputy Webb(pty:dft).(Lagarde, Ross)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed; M. LeBlanc served on 9/15/2017, answer due 10/6/2017. (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Deputy Webb served on 9/15/2017, answer due 10/6/2017. (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Deputy Readhead served on 9/15/2017, answer due 10/6/2017. (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Deputy Hoffman served on 9/15/2017, answer due 10/6/2017. (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed; N. Paternastro served on 9/15/2017, answer due 10/6/2017. (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed; A. Moss served on 9/15/2017, answer due 10/6/2017. (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued as to Deputy Hoffman, M. LeBlanc, A. Moss, N. Paternastro, Deputy Readhead, Deputy Webb. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(ajn) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $0.00 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Ronald Matthews in monthly payments as set out in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 9/12/2017. (CC: Financial, Sheriff St. Tammany Parish Prison and Def. Counsel)(ajn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2017: # 1 Pauper Letter) (ajn). (Entered: 09/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:17-cv-00472. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (clc) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/17/2017. (SGO) [Transferred from lamd on 9/11/2017.] (Entered: 08/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Main Document 8 replaced on 7/24/2017) (ELW). Modified on 7/24/2017 to flatten document(ELW). [Transferred from lamd on 9/11/2017.] (Entered: 07/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/24/2017) (ELW). Modified on 7/24/2017 to flatten document (ELW). [Transferred from lamd on 9/11/2017.] (Entered: 07/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/24/2017) (ELW). Modified on 7/24/2017 to flatten document (ELW). [Transferred from lamd on 9/11/2017.] (Entered: 07/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/24/2017) (ELW). Modified on 7/24/2017 to flatten document (ELW). [Transferred from lamd on 9/11/2017.] (Entered: 07/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/24/2017) (ELW). Modified on 7/24/2017 to flatten document (ELW). [Transferred from lamd on 9/11/2017.] (Entered: 07/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/24/2017) (ELW). Modified on 7/24/2017 to flatten document (ELW). [Transferred from lamd on 9/11/2017.] (Entered: 07/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Ronald Matthews. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading;)(Grodner, Donna) [Transferred from lamd on 9/11/2017.] Modified text on 9/11/2017 (clc). (Entered: 07/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT with civil coversheet against All Defendants, filed by Ronald Matthews. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Grodner, Donna) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/24/2017) (ELW). Modified on 7/24/2017 to flatten document(ELW). [Transferred from lamd on 9/11/2017.] (Entered: 07/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 0 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?