Southwest Reinsure, Inc. v. Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Mexico District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00689-MCA-KBM
District Judge M. Christina Armijo, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I

This docket is featured in the December 13, 2017 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I.

Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 8:12 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Southwest Reinsure, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Samuel I Roybal

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel I Roybal +1 505 766 9272 +1 505 766 9287

Toggle Switch Represented by Walker & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephanie L Schaeffer +1 505 766 9272
Space Thomas D. Walker +1 505 766 9272 +1 505 766 9287 twalker@walkerlawpc.com
v.
No Logo Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Theodore N Cox

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arlyn G Crow +1 505 427 3227 arlyngcrow@gmail.com
No Logo Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Theodore N Cox

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arlyn G Crow +1 505 427 3227 arlyngcrow@gmail.com
No Logo Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Theodore N Cox

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arlyn G Crow +1 505 427 3227 arlyngcrow@gmail.com
Office Albuquerque
Filed 8/5/2011
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Bernalillo
Terminated 7/10/2015
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CV 11-06175[Second Judicial District Court]
Defendant Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (107) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: 7/10/2015 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo (vv)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015 Notice (Other)
    NOTICE by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd. Notice of Extension of Deadline for Defendants' Answers and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Interrogatories and Requests for Production (Crow, Arlyn)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015 Notice (Other)
      NOTICE by Southwest Reinsure, Inc. of Service of answers to second set of interrogatories and requests for production (Walker, Thomas) Modified text on 6/15/2015 (dmw).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 103 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015 Order on Motion to Extend (other)Court Filing
        ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting [102] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Modify Pretrial Deadlines. Discovery due 7/13/2015. Pretrial Motions due 8/7/2015. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (am)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: 6/5/2015, Terminated: 6/12/2015 Motion to Extend (other)
          Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) Pretrial Deadlines by Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Walker, Thomas)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: 5/19/2015 Certificate of Service
            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Southwest Reinsure, Inc. (Walker, Thomas)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: 4/16/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete DiscoveryCourt Filing
              ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting [99] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery due 6/28/15. (am)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: 4/16/2015, Terminated: 4/16/2015 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd.. (Crow, Arlyn)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Certificate of Service
                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd. for First INTERROGATORIES and First REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION to Plaintiff (Crow, Arlyn) Modified on 4/13/2015 TO REMOVE ABBREVIATIONS AND SPELLED OUT WORDS (vv).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: 1/8/2015 Order Adopting Joint Status ReportCourt Filing
                    ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen (am)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: 1/8/2015 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. Discovery due by 5/14/2015. Motions due by 7/24/2015. (am)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: 1/8/2015 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                        Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 1/8/2015. (am)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: 1/7/2015 Certificate of Service
                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd. (Initial Disclosures) (Crow, Arlyn)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: 1/6/2015 Notice (Other)
                            NOTICE by Southwest Reinsure, Inc. of Service of Amended Initial Disclosures (Walker, Thomas)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: 1/5/2015 Joint Status Report (JSR)
                              Joint Status Report by Southwest Reinsure, Inc. (Walker, Thomas)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: 12/18/2014 Notice (Other)
                                NOTICE by Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd. Notice of Deadline Extension Initial Disclosure (Crow, Arlyn)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: 12/17/2014 Notice (Other)
                                  NOTICE by Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd. Notice of Deadline Extension (Crow, Arlyn)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 89 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Initial Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                    Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen RESETTING the Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 1/8/2015 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. (am) [THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified text on 12/3/2014 (bap).
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                      ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting [87] Motion to Vacate and Reschedule the Scheduling Conference. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due 12/16/14. Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/14 is VACATED and RESET for 1/8/14 at 10:00 a.m. (am)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014, Terminated: 12/2/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Staus Report/Provisional Discovery Plan by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd.. (Crow, Arlyn)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Initial Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen setting a Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 12/4/2014 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 11/26/2014. (am)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                            Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen: Status Conference held on 11/10/2014. Participants included Stephanie Schaeffer for Plaintiff and Arlyn Crow for Defendants. The Court will set a scheduling conference and order the parties to submit an Amended Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (am)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen setting Telephonic Status Conference for 11/10/2014 at 03:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. (am)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: 10/13/2014 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                Defendants ANSWER to [76] Amended Complaint, by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd..(Crow, Arlyn)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo denying [77] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (vv)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: 4/11/2014 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                    NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd. re [77] First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM against Plaintiff filed by Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd. (Crow, Arlyn)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: 4/11/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [77] First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM against Plaintiff Southwest Reinsure, Inc. filed by Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd.. (Crow, Arlyn)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: 3/25/2014 Response to Motion
                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re [77] First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM against Plaintiff filed by Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Schaeffer, Stephanie)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                          NOTICE by Southwest Reinsure, Inc. re [77] First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM against Plaintiff of Extension of Time to Reply (Schaeffer, Stephanie)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: 2/18/2014, Terminated: 9/29/2014 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                            First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM against Plaintiff by Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd.. (Crow, Arlyn)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Amended Complaint
                                                              THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd.. terminating Bakersfield Mitsubishi, Bashirtash, Inc., Dealers Alliance Corporation, Golden State Motors, Haddad Dodge, Masoud Bashirtash, Nissan of Bakersfield, BMW of Bakersfield and Bakersfield Chyrsler Jeep Mazda., filed by Southwest Reinsure, Inc..(Walker, Thomas) Modified text on 1/31/2014 (eh).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo denying [70] Motion for Leave to File (eh)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Memorandum Opinion and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo regarding [60] Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. (eh)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                    NOTICE of Briefing Complete by All Defendants re [70] Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd. (Crow, Arlyn)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 6/20/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [70] Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd.. (Crow, Arlyn)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: 6/4/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [70] Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Walker, Thomas)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013, Terminated: 1/23/2014 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                          Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd.. (Crow, Arlyn)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: 5/9/2013 Notice of Briefing Complete
                                                                            NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Southwest Reinsure, Inc. re [60] Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Southwest Reinsure, Inc. (Walker, Thomas)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: 5/7/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [60] Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Walker, Thomas)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: 5/6/2013 Notice (Other)
                                                                                NOTICE by Southwest Reinsure, Inc. of Extension (Walker, Thomas)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: 4/30/2013 Notice (Other)
                                                                                  NOTICE by Southwest Reinsure, Inc. of Extension of Time to File Reply (Walker, Thomas)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 65 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: 4/3/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [60] Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J)(Crow, Arlyn)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: 3/29/2013 Notice (Other)
                                                                                    NOTICE by Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd. of Extension to File Response to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Leave to Amend (Crow, Arlyn)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: 3/26/2013 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen VACATING the Status Conference set for 3/26/2013 at 2:00 p.m. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (tah)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: 3/25/2013 Notice (Other)
                                                                                        NOTICE by Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd. Of Extension to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion For Leave to File Third-Amended Complaint (Crow, Arlyn)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: 3/15/2013 Notice (Other)
                                                                                          NOTICE by Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd. for Extension to File Response to Motion for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint (Crow, Arlyn)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: 3/6/2013, Terminated: 1/23/2014 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                            Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Schaeffer, Stephanie)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: 3/6/2013 Notice of Attorney Substitution
                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Substitution: Thomas D. Walker substituted for David T. Thuma (Walker, Thomas)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen setting an in-person status conference for 3/26/2013 at 2:00 PM in Albuquerque - 730 Judge Karen B. Molzen Chambers before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. (tah)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/28/2013. Participants included Stephanie Schaeffer on behalf of Plaintiff and Arlyn Crow on behalf of Defendant. Ms. Schaeffer will have Mr. Thuma removed as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Ms. Schaeffer shall file Plaintiff's motion to file third amended complaint by the end of next week. The Court will schedule an in-person status conference on 3/26/13 at 2:00 p.m. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (tah)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen setting a telephonic status conference for 2/28/2013 at 11:00 AM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. (tah)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: 12/27/2012 Notice of Attorney Substitution
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by Shannon A. Parden (Parden, Shannon) Modified text on 12/27/2012 (eh).
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: 11/1/2012 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo granting [46] Motion to Amend/Correct [THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.](cab)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: 9/4/2012 Notice of Judge ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                          PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: 8/30/2012 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER by District Judge M. Christina Armijo: The Call of Calendar and Bench Trial presently scheduled for 10/4/12 and 10/9/12 are hereby vacated along with all previously imposed deadlines. This matter will be reset by separate order at a later date.[THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cab)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: 8/29/2012 Order on Motion for SanctionsCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson denying [37] Motion for Sanctions; finding as moot [48] Motion for Leave to File (ns)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: 8/23/2012 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER by District Judge M. Christina Armijo: The Pretrial Conference presently scheduled for 9/4/12 is hereby VACATED and will be reset at a later time by separate order.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cab)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: 7/27/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re [48] MOTION for Leave to File A SURREPLY TO PLAINTIFFS REPLY (DOC. NO. 46) IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SANCTION DEFENDANTS FOR PARTICIPATING IN SETTLEMENT MEDIATION IN BAD FAITH MOTION for Leave to File A SURREPLY TO PLAINTIFFS REPLY (DOC. NO. 46) IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SANCTION DEFENDANTS FOR PARTICIPATING IN SETTLEMENT MEDIATION IN BAD FAITH filed by Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Thuma, David)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012, Terminated: 8/29/2012 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File A SURREPLY TO PLAINTIFFS REPLY (DOC. NO. 46) IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SANCTION DEFENDANTS FOR PARTICIPATING IN SETTLEMENT MEDIATION IN BAD FAITH by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd.. (Crow, Arlyn)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: 7/9/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [37] Opposed MOTION for Sanctions filed by Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Thuma, David)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: 7/6/2012, Terminated: 11/1/2012 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Thuma, David)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: 6/20/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re [37] Opposed MOTION for Sanctions filed by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Crow, Arlyn)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: 6/18/2012 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd. for Extension of Time to Respond (Gilchrist, Grieta)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: 6/15/2012, Terminated: 8/23/2012 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                            "FILED IN ERROR" MOTION to Amend/Correct [42] Amended Complaint, by Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Thuma, David) Modified text on 8/23/2012 (eh).
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: 6/15/2012 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                              "FILED IN ERROR" AMENDED COMPLAINT for Restitution, Debt and Money Due, Conversion and Enforcement of Guaranty against All Defendants. adding Bakersfield Chyrsler Jeep Mazda, Bakersfield Mitsubishi, BMW of Bakersfield, Golden State Motors, Haddad Dodge, Nissan of Bakersfield, Bashirtash, Inc., Masoud Bashirtash and Dealers Alliance Corporation., filed by Southwest Reinsure, Inc..(Thuma, David) Modified text on 8/23/2012 (eh).
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: 6/4/2012 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson granting [36] Plaintiff's Opposed Motion to Reconsider Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Modify Case Management Deadlines and Reopen Discovery. Court's Order on Motion to Modify Case Management Deadlines and Reopen Discovery [34] is withdrawn. Defendants' Motion to Modify Case Management Deadlines and Reopen Discovery [33] is denied as moot. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend and proposed Order due by 6/15/2012. (kc) Modified on 6/4/2012 to add linking (dc).
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: 6/4/2012 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/1/2012. Case Management Order to be entered separately. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: 6/1/2012 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Southwest Reinsure, Inc., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd. Expert Witness Disclosures (Crow, Arlyn)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: 5/31/2012 Witness List
                                                                                                                                      "FILED IN ERROR" Witness List by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd.. (Crow, Arlyn) Modified text on 6/1/2012, attorney to file the certificate of service (eh).
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 37 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: 5/31/2012, Terminated: 8/29/2012 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                        Opposed MOTION for Sanctions by Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Thuma, David)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: 5/29/2012, Terminated: 6/4/2012 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                          Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration re [34] Order by Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Thuma, David) Modified text on 5/30/2012 (eh).
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: 5/29/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [33] MOTION to Extend (other) MOTION TO MODIFY CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES AND REOPEN DISCOVERY filed by Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Thuma, David) Modified text on 5/30/2012 (eh).
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: 5/25/2012 Order on Motion to Extend (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson granting [33] Motion to Modify Case Management Deadlines and Reopen Discovery (ns)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: 5/9/2012, Terminated: 5/25/2012 Motion to Extend (other)
                                                                                                                                                MOTION TO MODIFY CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES AND REOPEN DISCOVERY by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I)(Crow, Arlyn) Modified text on 5/10/2012 (eh).
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: 4/11/2012 Order on Motion to Extend (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson granting [30] Motion to Extend Defendants' Expert Witness Disclosure Deadline. Disclosure due by 5/31/2012. (kc)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Answers to First Set of Interrogatories by Southwest Reinsure, Inc. (Thuma, David) Modified text on 3/29/2012 (eh).
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: 2/29/2012, Terminated: 4/11/2012 Motion to Extend (other)
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Extend (other) MOTION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE DEADLINE by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Crow, Arlyn)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: 2/24/2012 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Southwest Reinsure, Inc. of Answers to Defendant Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Thuma, David)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson Vacating Rule 16 Discovery Status Conference. Discovery Status Conference set for 2/22/2012 is VACATED. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Order on Motion to VacateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson granting [26] Motion to Vacate Rule 16 Settlement Conference and Appoint Mediator. (kc)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: 2/8/2012, Terminated: 2/9/2012 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Vacate JOINT MOTION TO APPOINT A MEDIATOR AND VACATE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd.. (Crow, Arlyn)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: 12/15/2011 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answers to First Set of Interrogatories and Response to First Set of Requests for Production by Southwest Reinsure, Inc. (Thuma, David) Modified text on 12/16/2011 (eh).
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 11/30/2011 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER by District Judge M. Christina Armijo: Pretrial Order due by 9/11/2012. Call of the Calendar set for 10/4/2012 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before District Judge M. Christina Armijo. Bench Trial set for 10/9/2012 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before District Judge M. Christina Armijo. Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2012 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before District Judge M. Christina Armijo. (Attachments: # (1) Trial Preparation Instructions)(dmw)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to [22] Amended Complaint FOR RESTITUTION by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd..(Crow, Arlyn)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: 11/9/2011 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Restitution against All Defendants., filed by Southwest Reinsure, Inc..(Thuma, David)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/7/2011 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Set Of Interrogatories and Request For Production of Documents To Southwest Reinsure, Inc. by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd. (Crow, Arlyn) Modified text on 11/8/2011 (eh).
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/7/2011 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Set Of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Southwest Reinsure, Inc. by Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd. (Crow, Arlyn) Modified text on 11/8/2011 (eh).
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/7/2011 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Set Of Interrogatories and Request For Production of Documents to Southwest Reinsure, Inc. by Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd. (Crow, Arlyn) Modified text on 11/8/2011 (eh).
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: 11/2/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson Setting Rule 16 Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 2/22/2012 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 380-3 ADR Conference Room before Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson. (kc)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: 11/2/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson Adopting Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan With Changes and Setting Case Management Deadlines. Discovery due by 4/30/2012; Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 1/31/2012; Defendants' Expert Witness List due by 3/1/2012; Discovery Motions due by 5/9/2012; Pretrial Motions due by 6/18/2012; Pretrial Order Plaintiff to Defendants due by 8/22/2012; Pretrial Order Defendants to Court due by 9/4/2012; Plaintiff has until 12/21/2011 to add parties or amend pleadings; Defendants have until 1/21/2012 to add parties or amend pleadings. Telephone Discovery Status Conference set for 2/22/2012 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson. The parties are to call chambers on the "meet-me-conference line" at (505) 348-2688.(kc)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: 11/2/2011 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson: Scheduling Conference held on 10/31/2011. (kc)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: 10/24/2011 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd. Initial Disclosures (Crow, Arlyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: 10/24/2011 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Southwest Reinsure, Inc. of Initial Disclosures (Thuma, David) Modified text on 10/25/2011 (bap).
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: 10/20/2011 Joint Status Report (JSR)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Status Report AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd. (Crow, Arlyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: 10/18/2011 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd. Re: Defendants Answers and Responses to Southwest Re, Inc.'s First Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Request for Admissions (Crow, Arlyn) Modified text on 10/19/2011 (eh).
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: 9/23/2011 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER by Matthew J. Dykman, Clerk of Court, reassigning case to District Judge M. Christina Armijo. Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott is no longer assigned to case. (jc)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/10/2011, Entered: 9/10/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd. (Crow, Arlyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: 9/6/2011 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Arlyn G Crow on behalf of Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd. (Crow, Arlyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: 9/6/2011 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd. NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT RECORD (Crow, Arlyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: 8/29/2011 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Southwest Reinsure, Inc. (Thuma, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: 8/24/2011 Initial Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson. Joint Status Report due by 10/21/2011. Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2011 at 03:30 PM in Albuquerque - 670 Judge Alan C. Torgerson Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson. (kc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: 8/12/2011 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER filed by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd. re [1] Notice of Removal, OF FILING ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR RESTITUTION AND/OR MONEY HAD AND RECEIVED (Crow, Arlyn) Modified on 8/15/2011 (jc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filing fee: $350.00, receipt number ALB016779 (jrm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011 Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment (Text Only)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott and Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson assigned. (ah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: 8/5/2011 Appendix/Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re [1] Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd. (Crow, Arlyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: 8/5/2011 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd. from Second Judicial District, case number CV-2011-06175. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Bakersfield Group Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Vehicle Extended Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Saffa Reinsurance Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Crow, Arlyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 149 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?