Morillo v. Trexx
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Northern District Court, Case No. 5:17-cv-01125

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 12, 2018 at 11:50 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    DECISION AND ORDER accepting and adopting # 8 Magistrate Judge Dancks' Report and Recommendation in its entirety. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is dismissed; and the Court declines to exercise jurisdiction over any Plaintiff's state law claims, without prejudice, subject to refilling in state court. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 12/12/17. (lmw) (Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular and certified mail)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jose A. Morillo, Jr., 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Jose A. Morillo, Jr., 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jose A. M orillo, Jr. ORDERED that Plaintiffs first IFP Application (Dkt. No. 2) is GRANTED FOR PURPOSES OF FILING ONLY; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs second IFP Application (Dkt. No. 5) is DENIED AS MOOT; and it is RECOMMENDED that the amended complaint (Dkt. No. 4) be DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; and it is RECOMMENDED that the District Court decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over any state law claims without prejudice subject to refiling in state court; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel (Dkt. No. 6) is denied without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 11/24/2017 Case Review Deadline 11/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 11/6/2017. (Copy served via regular and certified)(khr)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 6 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?