District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit United States Supreme Court

Wochos v. Tesla, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-05828-CRB
District Judge Charles R. Breyer, presiding

Tags
Last Updated March 16, 2021 at 9:05 PM DT (3.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gregory Wochos, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Alexander Goldberg +1 215 600 2817 jgoldberg@rosenlegal.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LAURENCE M. ROSEN +1 973 313 1887 +1 212 202 3827 lrosen@rosenlegal.com
v.
Ahuja, Deepak P. Ahuja, Deepak P., Defendant
Officially listed as "Deepak Ahuja"
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.
Unknown Role, Fireeye, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Corinne Bretan +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 jbretan@fenwick.com
Space Dean S. Kristy +1 415 875 2324 +1 415 281 1350 dkristy@fenwick.com
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elon R. Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Corinne Bretan +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 jbretan@fenwick.com
Space Dean S. Kristy +1 415 875 2324 +1 415 281 1350 dkristy@fenwick.com
No Logo Jason Wheeler, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Corinne Bretan +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 jbretan@fenwick.com
Space Dean S. Kristy +1 415 875 2324 +1 415 281 1350 dkristy@fenwick.com
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Corinne Bretan +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 jbretan@fenwick.com
Space Dean S. Kristy +1 415 875 2324 +1 415 281 1350 dkristy@fenwick.com
No Logo Kurt Friedman, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Alexander Goldberg +1 215 600 2817 jgoldberg@rosenlegal.com
Space LAURENCE M. ROSEN +1 973 313 1887 +1 212 202 3827 lrosen@rosenlegal.com
Office San Francisco
Filed 10/10/2017
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 77 Securities Fraud
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (79) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Letter Brief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None USCA Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None USCA Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None Transcript Designation Form
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None USCA Case Number
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 71 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 68 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Judgment
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 67 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 63 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 62 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 59 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: 2/15/2019 Request For Judicial Notice
                                    Request for Judicial Notice re [51] Request for Judicial Notice, [56] Request for Judicial Notice, Defendants' Response To Objections To Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of MotionTo Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byDeepak Ahuja, Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Related document(s)[51], [56]) (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 58 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: 2/15/2019 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                      REPLY (re [49] MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof ) Defendants' Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byDeepak Ahuja, Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Kristy, Dean) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: 2/15/2019 Notice of appearance
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Clare Jordan (Jordan, Alison) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 56 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019 Request For Judicial Notice
                                          Request for Judicial Notice re [51] Request for Judicial Notice, [50] Declaration in Support, [54] Opposition/Response to Motion, [55] Declaration in Support, and Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byKurt Friedman, Uppili Srinivasan. (Related document(s)[51], [50], [54], [55]) (Goldberg, Jacob) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 55 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019 Declaration in Support
                                            Declaration of Jacob A. Goldberg in Support of [54] Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byKurt Friedman, Uppili Srinivasan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Related document(s)[54]) (Goldberg, Jacob) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 54 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [49] MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof ) filed byKurt Friedman, Uppili Srinivasan. (Goldberg, Jacob) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                              ORDER RELATING CASE. The following cases are related: C17-5828 CRB and C18-7325 RS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/14/2018. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 52 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER OF REFERRAL FOR RELATED CASE DETERMINATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/12/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 51 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: 11/20/2018 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                  Request for Judicial Notice re [50] Declaration in Support, [49] MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed byDeepak Ahuja, Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Related document(s)[50], [49]) (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: 11/20/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                    Declaration of Jennifer C. Bretan in Support of [49] MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed byDeepak Ahuja, Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits 1-35)(Related document(s)[49]) (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document 49 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: 11/20/2018 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Deepak Ahuja, Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 1/11/2019. Replies due by 2/15/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Kristy, Dean) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 48 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND MODIFYING PAGE LIMITS by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting [47] Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 47 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018, Terminated: 10/3/2018 stipulation
                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [46] Amended Complaint Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Setting Briefing Schedule And Modifying Page Limits filed by Deepak Ahuja, Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 46 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint) against Deepak Ahuja, Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc., Jason Wheeler. Filed byUppili Srinivasan, Kurt Friedman. (Goldberg, Jacob) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 45 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                            Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/24/2018, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [43] Transcript Order, [44] Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2018. (Related documents(s) [43], [44]) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 24, 2018 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Kurt Friedman, Uppili Srinivasan, Gregory Wochos, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Goldberg, Jacob) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/24/2018 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Deepak Ahuja, Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc., for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting [30] Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Motion Hearing held on 8/24/2018 - Re [30] Motion to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Tesla, Inc., Elon R. Musk, Deepak Ahuja. Matter taken under submission. Court will issue an order. (Total Time in Court: 35 Minutes) Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. Plaintiff Attorney: Jacob A. Goldberg. Defendant Attorney: Dean S. Kristy and Jennifer Corinne Bretan. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/24/2018)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 statement
                                                                      Statement re [37] Opposition/Response to Motion, of Recent Decisions by Kurt Friedman, Uppili Srinivasan, Gregory Wochos. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Goldberg, Jacob) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: 8/17/2018 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                        Request for Judicial Notice re [36] Objection, [32] Request for Judicial Notice, Defendants' Response To Objection To Request For Judicial Notice and Exhibit A filed byDeepak Ahuja, Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Related document(s)[36], [32]) (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: 8/17/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                          REPLY (re [30] MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof ) Defendants' Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint filed byDeepak Ahuja, Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Kristy, Dean) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [30] MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof ) filed byKurt Friedman, Uppili Srinivasan, Gregory Wochos. (Goldberg, Jacob) (Filed on 7/11/2018)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Objection
                                                                              OBJECTIONS to re [32] Request for Judicial Notice, by Kurt Friedman, Uppili Srinivasan, Gregory Wochos. (Goldberg, Jacob) (Filed on 7/11/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING: Motion Hearing reset for 8/24/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. The hearing set for August 31, 2018 is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF
                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines as to [30] MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                    Declaration of Jennifer C. Bretan in Support of [30] MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [31] filed byDeepak Ahuja, Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-33)(Related document(s)[30]) (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Proposed Order
                                                                                      Proposed Order re [30] MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof by Deepak Ahuja, Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                        Request for Judicial Notice re [30] MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof, [31] Declaration in Support, filed byDeepak Ahuja, Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Related document(s)[30], [31]) (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                          *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE [34] *** Declaration of Jennifer C. Bretan in Support of [30] MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed byDeepak Ahuja, Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-33)(Related document(s)[30]) (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/25/2018) Modified on 5/30/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018, Terminated: 8/27/2018 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Deepak Ahuja, Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 7/11/2018. Replies due by 8/17/2018. (Kristy, Dean) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY PAGE LIMITATIONS by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting [28] Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018, Terminated: 4/17/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation And [Proposed] Order To Modify Page Limitations filed by Deepak Ahuja, Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: 4/2/2018 Status report
                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by Kurt Friedman, Uppili Srinivasan, Gregory Wochos. (Goldberg, Jacob) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: 4/2/2018 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Counsel (Certificate of Service of Standing Orders upon all parties) by Jacob Alexander Goldberg on behalf of Kurt Friedman, Uppili Srinivasan, Gregory Wochos (Goldberg, Jacob) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: 4/2/2018 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gregory Wochos, Uppili Srinivasan, Kurt Friedman. on TESLA, Inc. and other defendants (Attachments: # (1) Waiver for Elon R. Musk, # (2) Waiver for Deepak Ahuja, # (3) Waiver for Jason Wheeler)(Goldberg, Jacob) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against Deepak Ahuja, Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc.. Filed byGregory Wochos, Kurt Friedman, Uppili Srinivasan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                          SCHEDULING STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting [22] Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018, Terminated: 2/12/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Scheduling for Filing of Amended Complaint filed by Kurt Friedman. (Goldberg, Jacob) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting [12] Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Motion Hearing held on 2/2/2018 - Re [12] Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Kurt Friedman - Motion Granted. Court will issue an order. (Total Time in Court: 3 Minutes) (Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo) Plaintiff Attorney: Movant: Jacob Alexander Goldberg. Defendant Attorney: Dean S. Kristy and Jennifer Corinne Bretan. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/2/2018)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Jacob A. Goldberg by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting [18] Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018, Terminated: 1/24/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12046186.) filed by Kurt Friedman. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Goldberg, Jacob) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                      NOTICE on Non-opposition by Kurt Friedman re [12] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 1/2/2018) Modified on 1/3/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING ON JANUARY 19, 2018 at 10:00 A.M. before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel Hearing set for 2/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF
                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines as to [12] Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities by Kurt Friedman (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [12] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Laurence M. Rosen on behalf of Kurt Friedman (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                Declaration of Laurence Rosen in Support of [12] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byKurt Friedman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit)(Related document(s)[12]) (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017, Terminated: 2/2/2018 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Kurt Friedman. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 12/26/2017. Replies due by 1/2/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: 12/5/2017 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR ALL DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ALL ASSOCIATED DEADLINES by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting [10] Stipulation. A Joint Status Report due by 4/2/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017, Terminated: 12/5/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [1] Complaint, [6] INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC Class Action, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time For All Defendants To Respond To Complaint And Continuing Case Management Conference And Associated Deadlines filed by Deepak Ahuja, Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc., Jason Wheeler. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Interested Entities by Deepak Ahuja, Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc., Jason Wheeler (Kristy, Dean) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Dean S. Kristy and Jennifer C. Bretan (Kristy, Dean) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: 10/11/2017 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Deepak Ahuja, Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc., Jason Wheeler. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: 10/11/2017 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order SEC Class Action
                                                                                                                                              INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras SEC Class Action Notice due by 10/31/2017. Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2018 08:30 AM. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: 10/11/2017 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Summons. (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Laurence M. Rosen on behalf of Gregory Wochos (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Interested Entities by Gregory Wochos (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Deepak Ahuja, Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc., Jason Wheeler ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11785804.). Filed byGregory Wochos. (Attachments: # (1) PSLRA Certification, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines as to 12 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 1,516 times.

                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?