White v. University of Central Florida
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 6:17-cv-01775

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 13, 2018 at 5:28 PM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Vibert White, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CAIR - Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thania Diaz Clevenger +1 813 514 1414 tclevenger@cair.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nimer Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Tark Richard Aouadi +1 407 490 0407 taouadi@cair.com
v.
No Logo John Sacher, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian T. Bellavia +1 407 872 6011 +1 407 872 6012 bbellavia@qpwblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ramon Vazquez +1 407 872 6011 +1 407 872 6012 ramon.vazquez@qpwblaw.com
No Logo Jose Fernandez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian T. Bellavia +1 407 872 6011 +1 407 872 6012 bbellavia@qpwblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ramon Vazquez +1 407 872 6011 +1 407 872 6012 ramon.vazquez@qpwblaw.com
No Logo Nancy Stanlick, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian T. Bellavia +1 407 872 6011 +1 407 872 6012 bbellavia@qpwblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ramon Vazquez +1 407 872 6011 +1 407 872 6012 ramon.vazquez@qpwblaw.com
No Logo University of Central Florida, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quintairos Prieto Wood Boyer PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian T. Bellavia +1 407 872 6011 +1 407 872 6012 bbellavia@qpwblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ramon Vazquez +1 407 872 6011 +1 407 872 6012 ramon.vazquez@qpwblaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of Settlement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Mediation report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/6/2018, Entered: None Appear Telephonically
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Appear Telephonically
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend Time
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Extend Time
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Extend Time
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of Unavailability
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting in part 18 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/4/2018. (EC)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith: MOTION HEARING held on 4/4/2018 re 18 MOTION for sanctions for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with Court Order and Respond to Discovery filed by University of Central Florida. (Digital) (PML)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          NOTICE of hearing on motion re 18 MOTION for sanctions for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with Court Order and Respond to Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2018 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 C before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. ctp (PML) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION for sanctions for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with Court Order and Respond to Discovery filed by Vibert White. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Explination of Tardy and Deficient Responses, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Sanction Payment 1 of 2, # 3 Exhibit Proof of Sanction Payment 2 of 2)(Clevenger, Thania) Modified on 3/27/2018 (LMM).
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION for sanctions for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with Court Order and Respond to Discovery by University of Central Florida. (Vazquez, Ramon)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting 16 Motion to Compel discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/26/2018. (EC)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  MOTION to Compel Response to Request to Produce and Better Answers to Interrogatories by University of Central Florida. (Vazquez, Ramon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                    AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement re: 6 Interested Persons Order Vibert White (Aouadi, Tark) Modified on 11/20/2017 (LMM).
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Richard G. Wack appointed as Mediator. (LMM) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: 11/13/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/13/2017. (TKW)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: 11/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Vazquez, Ramon)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: 11/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                            ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to 9 Amended Complaint by Jose Fernandez, John Sacher, Nancy Stanlick.(Vazquez, Ramon)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: 11/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                              ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to 9 Amended Complaint by University of Central Florida.(Vazquez, Ramon)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jose Fernandez, John Sacher, Nancy Stanlick, University of Central Florida with Jury Demand. filed by Vibert White.(Aouadi, Tark)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 5 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Vibert White. Related case(s): yes (Aouadi, Tark) Modified on 10/18/2017 (LMM). (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement re: 6 Interested Persons Order Vibert White (Aouadi, Tark) Modified on 10/18/2017 (LMM). (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/31/2017. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/17/2017. Copies mailed. (LAM) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/31/2017. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/17/2017. Copies mailed. (LAM) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jose Fernandez, John Sacher, Nancy Stanlick, University of Central Florida. (Vazquez, Ramon) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jose Fernandez, John Sacher, Nancy Stanlick, University of Central Florida. Related case(s): yes (Vazquez, Ramon) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Vibert White. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) Filed in State Court 9/15/2017.(LMM)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2017-CA-8408-O filed in State Court on 9/15/2017. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL-67751 filed by Nancy Stanlick, John Sacher, University of Central Florida, Jose Fernandez. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(LMM)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?