Kent v. Hennelly (PLR1)
Federal Civil Lawsuit Tennessee Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00188

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 19, 2019 at 5:46 PM DT (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None USCA Case Number
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Notice of appeal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
          MEMORANDUM AND OPINION finding that In light of the foregoing discussion, Hennellys 11 motion to dismiss is GRANTED, and this action is DISMISSED.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 7/10/2018. (MDG)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Notice of Consent/Nonconsent
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Stipulation
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None NOTICE of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Order Governing Motions To Dismiss
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Order Governing Depositions
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?