Tianhai Lace USA Inc v. Forever 21, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-07512

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 27, 2019 at 11:39 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tianhai Lace USA Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milord & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Milord A Keshishian milord@milordlaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/12/2018 Lindsay A Kyser +1 310 226 7878 +1 310 226 7879 lindsay@milordlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Novian & Novian LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2018 Jorge Nicolas Anwandter +1 310 553 1222 +1 310 553 0222 nicolas@novianlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ostrolenk Faber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 914 821 9075 +1 914 288 0023 reuber@leasonellis.com
v.
No Logo DOES, Defendant
No Logo Farrah 17, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Forever 21, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriela Rivera +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 grivera@birdmarella.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy B Yoo +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 tby@birdmarella.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimmy H Yu +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 kyu@birdmarella.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yoon & Kim, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Steven G Yudin +1 212 584 0058 syudin@yoonkimlaw.com
No Logo Topson Downs Of California, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/20/2018 Justin P Thiele +1 310 282 6204 jthiele@glaserweil.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lathrop & Gage, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erica J Van Loon +1 310 789 4600 +1 310 789 4601 evanloon@lathropgage.com
No Logo Gail M. Title, Mediator (Adr Panel)
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (107) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Dismissing Case
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Erica J. Van Loon for Defendant Topson Downs of California, Inc. in place of Attorney Justin P. Thiele 86 . (gk) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: 9/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                      REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Erica J. Van Loon in place of attorney Justin P. Thiele filed by Defendant Topson Downs of California, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Thiele, Justin)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Erica J Van Loon counsel for Defendant Topson Downs of California, Inc.. Changing Firm Name to Lathrop Gage LLP. Changing e-mail to evanloon@lathropgage.com. Filed by Defendant Topson Downs of California, Inc.. (Van Loon, Erica) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Justin P Thiele counsel for Defendant Topson Downs of California, Inc.. Adding Justin Thiele as counsel of record for Defendant Topson Downs of California, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Topson Downs of California, Inc.. (Attorney Justin P Thiele added to party Topson Downs of California, Inc.(pty:dft))(Thiele, Justin) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF PROCEEDINGS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation 82, it is ORDERED that the Schedule of Pretrial & Trial Dates entered in this action under Docket. No. 81, is hereby modified as follows: Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 11/30/2018. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference 2/1/2019. Last Date to Hear Motions 5/3/2019. Trial Filings (First Round) due by 6/4/2019. Trial Filings (Second Round) due by 6/11/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2019 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Jury Trial set for 7/30/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. See document for further details. (gk) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Settlement Discussions and Mediation or 60 Day Continuance of Proceedings filed by Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Cameron S. Reuber, # 2 Proposed Order)(Keshishian, Milord) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: 6/25/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO ESTABLISH BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CONTINUE DEADLINES AND TRIAL DATE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation 80, the Court orders that the parties will comply with the following deadlines: Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 9/28/2018. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference 11/30/2018. Rule 56 Motion Deadline 1/11/2019. Last Date To Hear Motions 3/1/2019. Trial Filings (First Round) due by 4/5/2019. Trial Filings (Second Round) due by 4/12/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2019 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Jury Trial set for 5/21/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. See document for further details. (gk)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial Date from February 19, 2019 to May 21, 2019 and Establishing Briefing Schedule for Motion for Summary Judgment and Continuing Deadlines Re: Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only 62 filed by Defendant Forever 21 Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Re: Briefing Schedule for Summary Judgment Motions and Related Deadlines)(Rivera, Gabriela) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kimmy H Yu counsel for Defendant Forever 21 Inc. Adding Kimmy Yu as counsel of record for Forever 21, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Forever 21, Inc.. (Attorney Kimmy H Yu added to party Forever 21 Inc(pty:dft))(Yu, Kimmy) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Protective Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. 77 (sbou) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc.(Keshishian, Milord) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                              DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Farrah 17, Inc., a California Corporation. (lom)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Milord A Keshishian counsel for Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc. Lindsay A. Kyser is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff TIANHAI LACE USA, INC.. (Keshishian, Milord) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                  REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Farrah 17, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Milord A. Keshishian) (Keshishian, Milord)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Topson Downs of California, Inc., identifying Topson Downs of California, Inc., Forever 21, Inc., Farrah 17, Inc., and Tianhai Lace USA Inc.. (Van Loon, Erica) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition 57 filed by Defendant Topson Downs of California, Inc..(Attorney Erica J Van Loon added to party Topson Downs of California, Inc.(pty:dft))(Van Loon, Erica) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Gail M. Title has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                          STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Gail Migdal Title, Esq. may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc(Keshishian, Milord)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc, upon Defendant Topson Downs of California, Inc. served on 2/23/2018, answer due 3/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alejandra Roque, Reception c/o Mr. Robert L. Handler, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. Re Second Amended Complaint (Keshishian, Milord) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc, upon Plaintiff Farrah 17, Inc. served on 2/23/2018, answer due 3/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jmee Lee, Manager c/o Mr. Sun Tae Yu, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. Re Second Amended Complaint (Keshishian, Milord) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lindsay A Kyser counsel for Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc. Adding Lindsay A. Kyser as counsel of record for TIANHAI LACE USA, INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff TIANHAI LACE USA, INC.. (Attorney Lindsay A Kyser added to party Tianhai Lace USA Inc(pty:pla))(Kyser, Lindsay) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Milord A Keshishian counsel for Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc. J. Nicolas Anwandter is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff TIANHAI LACE USA, INC.. (Keshishian, Milord) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition 57 and Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant Forever 21 Inc.(Rivera, Gabriela) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      21-Day Summons Issued re Second Amended Complaint 57 as to Defendants Forever 21, Inc., Topson Downs of California, Inc. and Farrah 17, Inc. (gk) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 11/16/2018. (cb)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER RE JURY/COURT TRIAL by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/1/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Jury Trial set for 2/19/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cb)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the February 16, 2018, Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc.. (Keshishian, Milord)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition 57 filed by Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc. (Keshishian, Milord) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc, identifying TIANHAI LACE USA INC.; FOREVER 21, INC.; TOPSON DOWNS OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; FARRAH 17, INC.. (Keshishian, Milord) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending COMPLAINT - event converted from ICMS,, 11, Complaint - (Discovery), 1, filed by Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-S)(Keshishian, Milord) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT 54 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs Motion is GRANTED. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file its First Amended Complaint no later than Friday, February 2, 2018. The hearing set for January 26, 2018, is hereby VACATED.granting 54 MOTION for Leave to File (yl)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT (Dkt. No. 54 ) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: If the Monday or Friday in a given week is a holiday, the Court will NOT have a Friday calendar. The next available hearing date is the following Friday. The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion is CONTINUED to Friday, January 26, 2018, at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/09/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint (Unopposed) filed by Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/19/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Redlined SAC, # 2 Exhibit B - SAC, # 3 Proposed Order) (Anwandter, Jorge)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 2/16/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Forever 21 Inc, (Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                ANSWER to COMPLAINT - event converted from ICMS,, 11 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Forever 21 Inc.(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Non-Resident Attorney Cameron S. Reuber to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA, Inc., designating Milord A. Keshishian as local counsel 49 . (gk)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: 11/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cameron S. Reuber to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20788973) filed by Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Keshishian, Milord)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER ON TIANHAI LACE USA INC.'S REQUEST FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION FOR CAMERON SEAN REUBER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court has reviewed the Tianhai Lace USA Inc.'s Status Report and Request of Enlargement of Time to File Pro Hac Vice Application for Cameron Sean Reuber 46, and finding good cause therefore, IT IS HERBY ORDERED THAT Tianhai shall have until November 7, 2017, to file Mr. Reuber's Pro Hac Vice application or to file another status report. (iv)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Forever 21 Inc answer now due 12/1/2017, filed by Defendant Forever 21 Inc.(Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: 10/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          REQUEST for Enlargement of Time to File Pro Hac Vice Application For Cameron S. Reuber filed by Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order to enlarge time) (Keshishian, Milord)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), 44 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ekwan E Rhow counsel for Defendant Forever 21 Inc. Adding Gabriela C. Rivera as counsel of record for Forever 21, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Forever 21, Inc.. (Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Paul Fields on behalf of Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jorge Nicolas Anwandter counsel for Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc. Adding J. Nicolas Anwandter as counsel of record for Tianhai Lace USA Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA, Inc.. (Attorney Jorge Nicolas Anwandter added to party Tianhai Lace USA Inc(pty:pla))(Anwandter, Jorge) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Milord A Keshishian counsel for Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc. Adding Milord A. Keshishian as counsel of record for Tianhai Lace USA, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA, Inc.. (Attorney Milord A Keshishian added to party Tianhai Lace USA Inc(pty:pla))(Keshishian, Milord) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Victoria T Polidoro on behalf of Plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Cameron Sean Reuber. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Victoria T Polidoro. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Paul Fields. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (jtil) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from New York Southern (Entered: 10/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting 17 Motion to Change Venue. The Court, having considered the relevant factors, finds that transfer of this matter to the Central District of California is appropriate. Two primary factors - the convenience of the witnesses and the locus of operative facts - strongly support transfer. Two less significant factors also favor transfer. In contrast, the most significant factor that weighs against transfer is Tianhai's decision to bring suit here. However, even though a plaintiff's choice of forum is entitled deference, that deference can be overcome where, as here, the other factors collectively "weigh strongly in favor of transfer." ESPN, 581 F. Supp. 2d at 547. The only other factors in favor of transfer are the parties' relative convenience and this forum's familiarity with governing law. As noted however, the latter factor has been recognized as "one of the least important factors in determining a motion to transfer." Id. at 550-51. On balance, the Court thus concludes that the Defendant has met its burden of justifying transfer. For the reasons stated above, the Defendant's motion to transfer this case to the Central District of California pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ?? 1404(a) is GRANTED. This resolves docket number 17. Consistent with this Court's general practice, and notwithstanding Local Rule 83.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to wait fifteen days and then transfer this case to the Central District of California. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/27/2017) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 09/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 29 Motion for Timothy B. Yoo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/05/2017) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 01/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 28 Motion for Ekwan E. Rhow to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/05/2017) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 01/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              AMENDED MOTION for Timothy B. Yoo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Affidavit of Timothy B. Yoo, # 3 Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Yoo, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 01/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                AMENDED MOTION for Ekwan E. Rhow to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Affidavit of Ekwan E. Rhow, # 3 Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Rhow, Ekwan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 01/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Timothy B. Yoo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13154729. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Yoo, Timothy) Modified on 1/3/2017 (bcu). [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 01/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Ekwan E. Rhow to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13154567. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Rhow, Ekwan) Modified on 1/3/2017 (bcu). [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 01/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Defendant Forever 21, Inc. dated 12/28/2016 re: Request for Oral Argument. Document filed by Forever 21, Inc..(Yudin, Steven) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 12/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 MOTION to Change Venue . . Document filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (Yudin, Steven) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 12/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 17 MOTION to Change Venue . . Document filed by Tianhai Lace USA Inc. (Reuber, Cameron) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 12/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 17 MOTION to Change Venue . . Document filed by Tianhai Lace USA Inc. (Reuber, Cameron) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Forever 21 Retail, Inc. for Forever 21, Inc.. Document filed by Forever 21, Inc..(Yudin, Steven) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 11/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Motion to Change Venue served on Tianhai Lace USA Inc on 11/22/2016. Service was made by First Class Mail. Document filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (Yudin, Steven) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Michael Roberts in Support re: 17 MOTION to Change Venue .. Document filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (Yudin, Steven) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 MOTION to Change Venue . . Document filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (Yudin, Steven) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Change Venue . Document filed by Forever 21, Inc..(Yudin, Steven) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel that the time for defendant Forever 21, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint of plaintiff Tianhai Lace USA Inc. shall be and hereby is extended to and including November 22, 2016. SO ORDERED., Forever 21, Inc. answer due 11/22/2016. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/15/2016) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 11/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Geffrey Yudin on behalf of Forever 21, Inc.. (Yudin, Steven) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (dgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for additional pleading submitted to court for review.(Reuber, Cameron) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Forever 21, Inc. served on 10/20/2016, answer due 11/10/2016. Service was accepted by Daisy Montenegro, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Tianhai Lace USA Inc. (Reuber, Cameron) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against Does 1-10, Forever 21, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Tianhai Lace USA Inc. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Tianhai Lace USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S)(Reuber, Cameron) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Victoria T Polidoro on behalf of Tianhai Lace USA Inc. (Polidoro, Victoria) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 07/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Fields on behalf of Tianhai Lace USA Inc. (Fields, Paul) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 07/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Reuber, Cameron) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 07/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 07/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Forever 21, Inc.. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 07/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Tianhai Lace USA Inc.(Reuber, Cameron) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Reuber, Cameron) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Forever 21, Inc., re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Tianhai Lace USA Inc. (Reuber, Cameron) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Reuber, Cameron) Modified on 7/27/2016 (pc). [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against DOES 1-10, Forever 21, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12577279)Document filed by Tianhai Lace USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Reuber, Cameron) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.] (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Central District of California. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 28 AMENDED MOTION for Ekwan E. Rhow to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., 29 AMENDED MOTION for Timothy B. Yoo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 26 MOTION for Ekwan E. Rhow to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13154567. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., 27 MOTION for Timothy B. Yoo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13154729. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney Affidavit Missing. Please Read Local Rule 1.3;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Cameron Sean Reuber to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Citizenship of principal parties were filled out despite the case having a Federal Question Jurisdiction. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Cameron Sean Reuber. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Tianhai Lace USA Inc, DOES 1-10, Forever 21, Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/16/2017.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?