Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., et al v. Kerry Sweeney
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 12-16053

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 2, 2017 at 11:59 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3380 - TORTS PERSONAL PROPERTY-Other
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Filed order (Deputy Clerk: LJ) Appellant Kerry Ann Sweeney’s unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal no. 12-16053 is granted. Appeal no. 12-16053 is severed from these consolidated appeals and dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court for appeal no. 12-16053 only. [8278519] (WL) [Entered: 08/07/2012 02:44 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Filed (ECF) Appellant Kerry Ann Sweeney in 12-16053 Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 07/25/2012. [8263824] [12-16053, 12-15757, 12-15782] (Palmer, Joseph) [Entered: 07/25/2012 05:47 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AKT): Appellant Jeremy Lee’s unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal No. 12-15816 is granted. Appeal No. 12-15816 is severed from these consolidated petitions and dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). All other pending motions in these consolidated cases shall be addressed by separate order. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court for appeal No. 12-15816. [8257934] [12-15757, 12-15782, 12-16053] (WL) [Entered: 07/20/2012 02:59 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon in 12-15782 reply to response (, ,motion to strike portion or whole of document,motion for sanctions). Date of service: 07/13/2012. [8250470] [12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053] (Frank, Theodore) [Entered: 07/13/2012 07:18 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Filed (ECF) Appellant Jeremy Lee in 12-15816 Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 07/11/2012. [8248718] [12-15816, 12-15757, 12-15782, 12-16053] (Palmer, Joseph) [Entered: 07/12/2012 04:41 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman in 12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053 response opposing motion (,motion to strike portion or whole of document,motion for sanctions). Date of service: 07/06/2012. [8239963] [12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053] (Briskin, Craig) [Entered: 07/06/2012 12:38 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman in 12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053 reply to response (). Date of service: 07/06/2012. [8239960] [12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053] (Briskin, Craig) [Entered: 07/06/2012 12:35 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon in 12-15782 response opposing motion (,motion to file oversized brief). Date of service: 07/05/2012. [8238644] [12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053] (Frank, Theodore) [Entered: 07/05/2012 02:48 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman in 12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053 Motion to file oversized brief. Date of service: 07/05/2012. [8238217] [12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053] (Briskin, Craig) [Entered: 07/05/2012 12:59 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon in 12-15782 Motion to strike whole of Class Counsel's "Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal" filed in violation of Fed. R. App. Proc. 27(d)(2), Motion for sanctions. Date of service: 07/03/2012. [8237371] [12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053] (Frank, Theodore) [Entered: 07/03/2012 05:29 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053 reply to response (, ). Date of service: 07/02/2012. [8234627] [12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053] (Briskin, Craig) [Entered: 07/02/2012 12:13 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon in 12-15782 response opposing motion (,motion to dismiss the case). Date of service: 06/25/2012. [8227530] [12-15782, 12-15757]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread filing to cons cases 12-15816,12-16053; resent notice. 06/26/2012 by ASW] (Frank, Theodore) [Entered: 06/25/2012 09:05 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon in 12-15782 reply to response (, ,motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies)). Date of service: 06/25/2012. [8227529] [12-15782, 12-15757]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread filing to cons cases 12-15816,12-16053; resent notice. 06/26/2012 by ASW] (Frank, Theodore) [Entered: 06/25/2012 09:03 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AT): Appellant Dale Funk’s unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal No. 12-15740 is granted. Appeal No. 12-15740 is dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The court sua sponte consolidates appeal No. 12-16053 with appeal Nos. 12- 15757, 12-15782, and 12-15816. The pending motion to vacate or modify the appeal bond and motion to dismiss filed in appeal No. 12-15782 shall be addressed by separate order. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court for appeal No. 12-15740. [8220145] [12-15757, 12-15782, 12-15816, 12-16053] (WL) [Entered: 06/19/2012 02:27 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Nick S. Movaghar for - MagSafe Apple Power Adapter Litigation and Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman. Date of service: 06/14/2012. [8215218]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected notice and certificate of service. Resent NDA. 06/19/2012 by RY] (Movaghar, Nick) [Entered: 06/14/2012 03:33 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Filed (ECF) Appellee Apple, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/17/2012. [8181974] (Preovolos, Penelope) [Entered: 05/17/2012 11:24 AM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Kerry Ann Sweeney Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/16/2012. [8180509]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF with correct version provided by csl, resent notice. 05/17/2012 by ASW] (Palmer, Joseph) [Entered: 05/16/2012 12:12 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/11/2012. Transcript ordered by 06/01/2012. Transcript due 07/02/2012. Appellant Kerry Ann Sweeney opening brief due 08/10/2012. Appellees Apple, Inc., Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten answering brief due 09/10/2012. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8164717] (GR) [Entered: 05/04/2012 07:58 AM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?