Gulf Winds Federal Credit Union v. Equifax, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-03873
District Judge Clarence Cooper, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 21, 2017 at 12:55 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gulf Winds Federal Credit Union, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by 2001 Parkplace North

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Theo Hellums +1 205 322 8880 chrish@pittmandutton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pittman Dutton Kirby & Hellums, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan S. Mann +1 205 322 8880 +1 205 328 2711 jonm@pittmandutton.com
v.
Equifax Information Services LLC Equifax Information Services LLC, Defendant
Equifax, Inc. Equifax, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER. All proceedings and deadlines in the cases set forth in Exhibit A to this Order are stayed until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the Motions for Consolidation and Transfer under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 filed in In re Equifax, Inc., Customer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2800. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/11/2017. (dfb) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Return of Service Executed by Gulf Winds Federal Credit Union. Equifax Information Services LLC served on 10/5/2017, answer due 10/26/2017; Equifax, Inc. served on 10/5/2017, answer due 10/26/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Equifax Information Services LLC)(McGlamry, Michael) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, and Equifax, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Equifax Information Services)(bnw) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Gulf Winds Federal Credit Union. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-7423847.) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/04/2017)
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 9 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?