SIERRA CLUB v. PRUITT
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-02174

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 16, 2021 at 4:15 PM EST (11.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo SIERRA CLUB, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathryn Mina Amirpashaie +1 703 771 8394 kmalawoffice@gmail.com
Space James B. Dougherty +1 202 488 1140 +1 202 484 1789 jimdougherty@aol.com
Space Matthew Evan Gerhart +1 510 847 7721 megerhart@gmail.com
Space Matt G. Kenna +1 970 385 6914 +1 970 797 9133 mattkenna@gmail.com
Space Terry J. Lodge +1 419 255 7552 +1 419 255 8582 tjlodge50@yahoo.com

Represented by Andrea C. Ferster

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea Carol Ferster +1 202 974 5142 +1 202 223 9257 aferster@railstotrails.org

Represented by APPALACHIAN CENTER FOR THE ECONOMY AND THE ENVIRONMENT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Alan Luckett +1 304 645 0125 +1 304 645 9008 bluckett@appalmad.org
Space Derek O. Teaney +1 304 645 9006 +1 304 645 9008 dteaney@appalmad.org

Represented by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY - SEATTLE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tanya Sanerib +1 503 544 8512 tsanerib@biologicaldiversity.org
Space Ryan Adair Shannon +1 214 476 8755 +1 503 283 8755 rshannon@biologicaldiversity.org
Space James Jay Tutchton +1 720 301 3843 jtutchton@biologicaldiversity.org
Space Robert Steven Ukeiley +1 720 496 8568 +1 866 618 1017 rukeiley@biologicaldiversity.org

Represented by Center for Food Safely

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Andreas Kimbrell +1 415 826 2770 +1 415 826 0507 gkimbrell@centerforfoodsafety.org
Space Paige Michele Tomaselli +1 415 826 2770 +1 415 826 0507 ptomaselli@centerforfoodsafety.org

Represented by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kateryna Rakowsky +1 415 826 2700 +1 415 826 0507 kateryna@icta.org

Represented by COWAN CONSULTING FOR NONPROFITS, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justine Thompson Cowan +1 407 506 4109

Represented by DANE COUNTY CORPORATION COUNSEL'S OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carlos A. Pabellon +1 608 215 5525 pabellon@countyofdane.com

Represented by Direct: 415-977-5695

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Devorah Ancel +1 415 977 5721 +1 415 977 5793 devorah.ancel@sierraclub.org
Space Zachary Max Fabish +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 zachary.fabish@sierraclub.org
Space Douglas P Hayes +1 303 449 5595 doug.hayes@sierraclub.org
Space Eric Eugene Huber +1 303 449 5595 +1 303 449 6520 eric.huber@sierraclub.org
Space Aaron Isherwood +1 415 977 5680 +1 415 977 5793 aaron.isherwood@sierraclub.org
Space Matthew E. Miller +1 202 650 6069 +1 202 547 6009 matthew.miller@sierraclub.org
Space Casey Austin Roberts +1 415 421 7151 casey.roberts@sierraclub.org
Space Elena Saxonhouse +1 415 977 5765 +1 415 977 5793 elena.saxonhouse@sierraclub.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karimah Schoenhut +1 202 548 4584 +1 202 547 6009 karimah.schoenhut@sierraclub.org
Space Joshua Douglas Smith +1 415 977 5560 joshua.smith@sierraclub.org
Space Joshua R. Stebbins +1 202 675 6273 josh.stebbins@sierraclub.org

Represented by Direct: 828-258-2023

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Timothy Suttles, Jr. +1 919 967 1450 +1 919 929 9421 jsuttles@selcnc.org

Represented by EARTHJUSTICE LEGAL DEFENSE FUND - BOZEMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Henry Achitoff +1 808 599 2436 +5216 521 521 6841 achitoff@earthjustice.org
Space Timothy David Ballo +1 202 667 2356 tballo@earthjustice.org
Space David S. Baron +1 202 667 4500 +1 202 667 2356 dbaron@earthjustice.org
Space Kristen Lee Boyles +206 343 734 0x33 +1 206 343 1526 kboyles@earthjustice.org
Space Jennifer C. Chavez +2026 674 500 x208 jchavez@earthjustice.org
Space Emma C. Cheuse +1 202 667 2356 echeuse@earthjustice.org
Space Yuting Chi +1 303 996 9623 ychi@earthjustice.org
Space Thomas Cmar +1 312 663 9900 tcmar@earthjustice.org
Space Laura Marie Colangelo Dumais +1 202 797 5250 +1 202 667 2356 ldumais@earthjustice.org
Space Robin Cooley +1 303 623 9466 +1 303 623 8083 rcooley@earthjustice.org
Space Khushi K. Desai +1 202 667 4500 +1 202 667 2356 kdesai@earthjustice.org
Space Abigail M Dillen +1 406 579 9844 +1 406 586 9695 adillen@earthjustice.org
Space Lisa Gollin Evans +1 781 631 4119 levans@earthjustice.org
Space Michael Stephen Freeman +1 303 623 9466 +1 303 623 8083 mfreeman@earthjustice.org
Space Patti A. Goldman +1 206 343 7340 +1 206 343 1526 pgoldman@earthjustice.org
Space Amanda W. Goodin +1 206 343 7340 +1 206 343 1526 agoodin@earthjustice.org
Space Neil E. Gormley +1 202 797 5239 +1 202 797 2356 ngormley@earthjustice.org
Space Jan E Hasselman +1 206 343 7340 +1 206 343 1526 jhasselman@earthjustice.org
Space Seth Lee Johnson +1 202 667 4500 +1 202 667 2356 sjohnson@earthjustice.org
Space Eric Paul Jorgensen +1 907 586 2751 +1 907 463 5891 ericj@earthjustice.org
Space Bridget M. Lee +1 212 791 1881 +1 212 918 1556 blee@earthjustice.org
Space Heidi J. McIntosh +1 303 623 9466 hmcintosh@earthjustice.org
Space Nicholas James Morales +1 202 667 4500 nmorales@earthjustice.org
Space James S. Pew +1 202 667 4500 +1 202 667 2356 jpew@earthjustice.org
Space Timothy Joseph Preso +1 406 586 9699 +1 406 586 9695 tpreso@earthjustice.org
Space Katherine D. Renshaw +1 202 667 4500 +1 202 667 2356 krenshaw@earthjustice.org
Space Stephen Elston Roady +1 202 667 4500 +1 202 667 2356 sroady@earthjustice.org
Space Gordon Elliott Sommers +1 202 797 5257 gsommers@earthjustice.org
Space Thomas S. Waldo +1 907 586 2751 +1 907 463 5891 twaldo@earthjustice.org
Space Edward Breckenridge Zukoski +1 303 623 9466 +1 303 623 8083 tzukoski@earthjustice.org

Represented by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer S. Duggan +1 802 225 6774 +1 202 296 8822 jduggan@environmentalintegrity.org
Space Sparsh Khandeshi +1 202 263 4446 skhandeshi@environmentalintegrity.org
Space Adam M. Kron +1 202 263 4451 +1 202 296 8822 akron@environmentalintegrity.org
Space Abel J. Russ +1 202 263 4453 +1 202 296 8822 aruss@environmentalintegrity.org

Represented by GREAT RIVERS ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen Green Henry +1 314 231 4181 +1 314 231 4184 khenry@greatriverslaw.org

Represented by Harmon, Curran, Spielberg & Eisenberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Diane J. Curran +1 202 328 3500 dcurran@harmoncurran.com

Represented by HENRICHSEN SIEGEL, P.L.L.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neil Lawrence Henrichsen +1 202 293 7766 +1 202 379 9792 Nhenrichsen@hslawyers.com

Represented by KAMPMEIER & KNUTSEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul August Kampmeier +1 206 223 4088 paul@kampmeierknutsen.com

Represented by Law Offices of K.E. Purcie Bennett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam M. Kron +1 202 772 3224 akron@defenders.org

Represented by McGillivray Westerberg & Bender LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Craig Bender +1 608 310 3560 +1 608 310 3561 bender@mwbattorneys.com
Space James Neville Saul +1 608 310 3568 +1 608 310 3561 saul@mwbattorneys.com

Represented by National Wildlife Federation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James G. Murphy +1 802 552 4325 jmurphy@nwf.org

Represented by Natural Resources Defense Council

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon Buccino +1 202 289 6868 +1 202 289 1060 sbuccino@nrdc.org
Space Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence +1 360 534 9900 +1 360 534 9909 nlawrence@nrdc.org

Represented by OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF VERMONT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas F Persampieri +1 802 828 6902 nick.persampieri@vermont.gov

Represented by REED ZARS, ATTORNEY AT LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reed Zars +1 307 745 7979 reed@zarslaw.com

Represented by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE (SLC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen H. Bloch +1 801 486 3161 steve@suwa.org
Space David Garbett +1 801 486 3161 +1 801 486 4233 david@suwa.org

Represented by The Humane Society of the United States

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hannah Mary Margaret Connor +1 202 676 2354 hconnor@humanesociety.org

Represented by Unknown Entity QF

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ann B. Weeks +1 617 624 0234 +1 617 624 0230 aweeks@catf.us

Represented by WESTERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER - EUGENE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Jane McKibben Brown +1 503 914 1323 brown@westernlaw.org
v.
No Logo SCOTT PRUITT, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency Sue Chen +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2786 Sue.Chen@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency Justin D. Heminger +1 202 514 2689 +1 202 514 8865 justin.heminger@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency Eileen T. McDonough +1 202 514 3126 +1 202 353 7763 eileen.mcdonough@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency Steven A. Myers +1 202 305 8648 +1 202 616 8460 steven.a.myers@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency James R. Powers +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 james.r.powers@usdoj.gov
in his official capacity as Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency Damon William Taaffe +1 202 252 2544 damon.taaffe@usdoj.gov
No Logo URBAN AIR INITIATIVE, INC., Amicus

Represented by boydengrayassociates.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam R.F. Gustafson +1 202 955 0620 gustafson@boydengrayassociates.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 7604
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Stay
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Modify
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Order on Motion for Briefing ScheduleCourt Filing
                                            MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule. The court orders the following with regard to further proceedings in this matter: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before June 29, 2018; Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before August 13, 2018; Plaintiff's Reply and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before October 1, 2018; and Defendant's Reply shall be filed on or before October 22, 2018. See the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/01/2018. (lcapm3)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Briefing Schedule
                                              Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by SCOTT PRUITT (Chen, Sue)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 Stay
                                                Joint MOTION to Stay proceedings by SCOTT PRUITT (Chen, Sue)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 Status report
                                                  Joint STATUS REPORT by SCOTT PRUITT. (Chen, Sue)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re 17 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Urban Air Initiative as Amicus Curiae in Support of Neither Party filed by SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Schoenhut, Karimah)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                      Joint MOTION to Stay proceedings by SCOTT PRUITT (Chen, Sue)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                        Joint STATUS REPORT by SCOTT PRUITT. (Chen, Sue)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: 4/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Urban Air Initiative as Amicus Curiae in Support of Neither Party by URBAN AIR INITIATIVE, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Proposed Amicus Brief)(Gustafson, Adam)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: 4/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R.F. Gustafson on behalf of URBAN AIR INITIATIVE, INC. (Gustafson, Adam) (Main Document 16 replaced on 4/6/2018) (znmw).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                              Joint MOTION to Stay proceedings by SCOTT PRUITT (Chen, Sue)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                Joint STATUS REPORT by SCOTT PRUITT. (Chen, Sue)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this Clean Air Act case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before February 5, 2018, that proposes a briefing schedule for dispositive motions. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/03/2018. (lcapm3)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint by SCOTT PRUITT.(Chen, Sue) Modified to add link on 1/3/2018 (znmw).
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: 11/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/30/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/29/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Schoenhut, Karimah)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: 11/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/30/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Schoenhut, Karimah)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: 11/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SCOTT PRUITT served on 10/30/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Schoenhut, Karimah)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Sue Chen on behalf of SCOTT PRUITT (Chen, Sue)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Devorah Ancel, :Firm- Sierra Club, :Address- 2101 Webster St., Ste 1300, Oakland, CA 94612. Phone No. - 4158457847. Fax No. - 5102183140 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5173272. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SIERRA CLUB (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schoenhut, Karimah)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SIERRA CLUB, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Notice and Consent)(znmw)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint filed by SIERRA CLUB. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by SIERRA CLUB.(Schoenhut, Karimah)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint filed by SIERRA CLUB. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by SIERRA CLUB.(Schoenhut, Karimah)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint filed by SIERRA CLUB. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by SIERRA CLUB.(Schoenhut, Karimah)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by SIERRA CLUB. (Schoenhut, Karimah) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          COMPLAINT against SCOTT PRUITT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5166817) filed by SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Schoenhut, Karimah) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?