Ford v. Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00071

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 9, 2019 at 5:44 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Nathan Shain Ford, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Cruse Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Fredrich J. Cruse +1 573 221 1333 +1 573 221 1333 fcruse@cruselaw.com
v.
No Logo Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ANDERECK AND EVANS, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Terry M. Evans +1 816 532 3595 +1 816 532 3899 tevans@lawofficemo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Miles Braden Figg +1 816 532 3895 +1 816 532 3899 MFigg@lawofficemo.com
No Logo Bobby D. Rhoads, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ANDERECK AND EVANS, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Terry M. Evans +1 816 532 3595 +1 816 532 3899 tevans@lawofficemo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Miles Braden Figg +1 816 532 3895 +1 816 532 3899 MFigg@lawofficemo.com
No Logo IBEW Local #53, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blake & Uhlig, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brandon Eric Wood +1 913 321 8884 +1 913 321 2396 bew@blake-uhlig.com
No Logo Lynn Farnen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ANDERECK AND EVANS, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Terry M. Evans +1 816 532 3595 +1 816 532 3899 tevans@lawofficemo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Miles Braden Figg +1 816 532 3895 +1 816 532 3899 MFigg@lawofficemo.com
No Logo Stephen Iwanowicz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ANDERECK AND EVANS, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Terry M. Evans +1 816 532 3595 +1 816 532 3899 tevans@lawofficemo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Miles Braden Figg +1 816 532 3895 +1 816 532 3899 MFigg@lawofficemo.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF REMAND. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Lynn Farnen, Stephen Iwanowicz, and Bobby D. Rhoads' JointMotion to Remand 9 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is remanded to the Circuit Court of Randolph County, Missouri, from which it was removed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are denied as moot and without prejudice to be refiled in the proper forum. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 11/30/17. (EAB)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: 11/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
    REPLY to Response to Motion re 9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Randolph County filed by Defendants Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Lynn Farnen, Stephen Iwanowicz, Bobby D. Rhoads. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Figg, Miles)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
      RESPONSE to Motion re 9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Randolph County filed by Defendant IBEW Local #53. (Wood, Brandon)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
        ANSWER to Complaint Count II by Bobby D. Rhoads.(Figg, Miles)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
          MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Lynn Farnen, and Stephen Iwanowicz filed by Defendants Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Lynn Farnen, Stephen Iwanowicz. (Figg, Miles)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
            Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Lynn Farnen, and Stephen Iwanowicz by Defendants Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Lynn Farnen, Stephen Iwanowicz. (Figg, Miles)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
              MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Party Bobby D. Rhoads filed by Defendant Bobby D. Rhoads. (Figg, Miles)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Dismiss Count I of Complaint Bobby D. Rhoads by Defendant Bobby D. Rhoads. (Figg, Miles) Modified on 10/26/2017 (CBL).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                  ENTRY of Appearance by Miles Braden Figg for Defendants Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Lynn Farnen, Stephen Iwanowicz, Bobby D. Rhoads. (Figg, Miles)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                    MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Randolph County filed by Defendants Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Lynn Farnen, Stephen Iwanowicz, Bobby D. Rhoads. (Evans, Terry)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Randolph County by Defendants Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Lynn Farnen, Stephen Iwanowicz, Bobby D. Rhoads. (Evans, Terry)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                        ENTRY of Appearance by Terry M. Evans for Defendants Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Lynn Farnen, Stephen Iwanowicz, Bobby D. Rhoads. (Evans, Terry)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: 10/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                          ANSWER to Complaint by IBEW Local #53.(Wood, Brandon)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant IBEW Local #53 Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wood, Brandon)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge David D. Noce termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Catherine D. Perry for all further proceedings (KXS) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                CLERK'S ORDER (GJL).. The above styled and numbered case was removed from Randolph County Circuit Court on October 18, 2017 and assigned to the Eastern Division. After a review of the case, it was determined the case was assigned incorrectly. The case should have been assigned to the Northern Division. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled case is transferred to the Northern Division and assigned to the Honorable David D. Noce, United States Magistrate Judge, under cause number 2:17-cv-00071 DDN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that cause number 4:17-cv-02600-UNA be administratively closed. (MFG) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant IBEW Local #53 Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal, # 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Notice of Removal)(MFG) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of Randolph County, filed by Nathan Shain Ford.(MFG) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Randolph County, Missouri, case number 17RA-CV00984, with receipt number 0865-6199072, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local No. 53. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Summons, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Waiver of Service Ford, # 5 Exhibit Dislcosure of Organizational Interests Certificate, # 6 Original Filing Form)(Wood, Brandon) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (MFG)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?