Sassower v. Atty. Grievance Comm

Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:91-cv-01308-MJG
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo George Sassower, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Attorney Grievance Commission of Maryland, Respondent
Attributes
Office Baltimore
Filed 5/8/1991
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County 88888
Terminated 5/21/1991
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
Timeline
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 10/29/1991, Entered: 11/1/1991 USCA Mandate
JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) Re: [4-1] appeal by George Sassower "DISMISSING" the Appeal, and copy of Opinion attached hereto. (has, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 10/29/1991, Entered: 11/1/1991 Remark
Complete Record on Appeal Returned to U. S. District Court. (has, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 7/15/1991, Entered: 7/19/1991 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER denying reconsideration [6-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis ) (c/m 7/16/91ld) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 7/15/1991, Entered: 7/19/1991, Terminated: 7/15/1991 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
MOTION by George Sassower for reconsideration of Order denying request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 6/26/1991, Entered: 6/26/1991 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
Certified and transmitted record on appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals: [4-1] appeal by George Sassower (Volume 1) (jmk, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 6/25/1991, Entered: 6/26/1991 Description not availableCourt Filing
Motion by George Sassower to proceed in forma pauperis, affidavit and order signed 6/24/91 by Judge Marvin J. Garbis denying leave. (c/m 6/26/91 jk) (jmk, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 6/6/1991, Entered: 6/6/1991 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [4-1] appeal by George Sassower (c/s 5/31/91 akc)(d/s mailed to pltf.) (jmk, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 5/29/1991, Entered: 5/31/1991 Notice of Appeal
NOTICE OF APPEAL by George Sassower . Fee Status: not paid Appeal record due on 6/28/91 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 5/21/1991, Entered: 5/22/1991 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER dated 5/20/91, "DISMISSING" Case. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis )(c/m & microfilmed 5/22/91 dmt) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 5/21/1991, Entered: 5/22/1991 Terminated Case
Case closed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 5/8/1991, Entered: 5/22/1991 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
MOTION by George Sassower to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 5/8/1991, Entered: 5/22/1991 Complaint
COMPLAINT for WRIT OF MANDAMUS filed; (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 5 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?