Samson v. Equifax, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-03448
District Judge Amy Totenberg, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 22, 2017 at 1:17 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Nida Samson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Davis Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Naumon A. Amjed +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 namjed@sbtklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan J Barlieb +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ebarlieb@ktmc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua E. D'Ancona, Esq. +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 jdancona@ktmc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meredith Lambert mlambert@ktmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1120

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa L. Heller +1 404 856 3250 lheller@robbinsfirm.com
v.
Equifax, Inc. Equifax, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth D. Adler +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5139 eadler@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Lewis Balser +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 dbalser@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S Stewart Haskins, II +1 404 572 4687 +1 404 572 5140 shaskins@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phyllis B. Sumner +1 404 572 4600 psumner@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Christopher Toro +1 404 572 2806 +1+1+ 1+1 1+1 +1+1 jtoro@kslaw.com
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER. All proceedings and deadlines in the cases set forth in Exhibit A to this Order are stayed until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the Motions for Consolidation and Transfer under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 filed in In re Equifax, Inc., Customer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2800. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/11/2017. (dfb) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER GRANTING 8 Application of David H. Thompson for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 10/05/2017. (jtj) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER GRANTING 6 Application of Joshua E. D'Ancona for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 10/05/2017. (jtj) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER GRANTING 7 Application of Naumon A. Amjed for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 10/05/2017. (jtj) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER GRANTING 4 Application of Meredith L. Lambert for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 10/05/2017. (jtj) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            NOTICE Of Filing Letter to Chief Judge Thrash by Victoria Kealy re 16 Notice of Filing (Worley, David) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              NOTICE Of Filing Letter to Chief Judge Thrash by Equifax, Inc. (Balser, David) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Equifax, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Balser, David) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Appearance by John Christopher Toro on behalf of Equifax, Inc. (Toro, John) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Dees Adler on behalf of Equifax, Inc. (Adler, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Sidney Stewart Haskins, II on behalf of Equifax, Inc. (Haskins, Sidney) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Phyllis Buchen Sumner on behalf of Equifax, Inc. (Sumner, Phyllis) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of Appearance by David Lewis Balser on behalf of Equifax, Inc. (Balser, David) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            APPLICATION for Admission of Davis Cooper Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7419500)by Nida Samson. (Heller, Lisa) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              APPLICATION for Admission of David H. Thompson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7419477)by Nida Samson. (Heller, Lisa) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                APPLICATION for Admission of Naumon A. Amjed Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7404146)by Nida Samson. (Heller, Lisa) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  APPLICATION for Admission of Joshua E. D'Ancona Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7404134)by Nida Samson. (Heller, Lisa) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    APPLICATION for Admission of Ethan J. Barlieb Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7404117)by Nida Samson. (Heller, Lisa) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      APPLICATION for Admission of Meredith L. Lambert Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7404084)by Nida Samson. (Heller, Lisa) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Return of Service Executed by Nida Samson. Equifax, Inc. served on 9/14/2017, answer due 10/5/2017. (Heller, Lisa) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax, Inc. (dfb) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Nida Samson. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-7375212.) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/13/2017)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 14 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?