FIX THE COURT v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-02189
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 2, 2018 at 6:39 PM EDT (7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Fix The Court, Plaintiff

Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L. Sobel +1 202 246 6180 +1 202 237 7727 sobel@att.net
v.
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: 10/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5169898) filed by FIX THE COURT. (Attachments: # 1 7.1 Certificate, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Att'y General, # 4 Summons DOJ, # 5 Summons U.S. Att'y)(Sobel, David)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 5 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?