Cohen v. Safeway Stores, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:91-cv-00870-JFM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Vivian Fay Cohen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KATOR, PARKS & WEISER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 mkator@katorparks.com
v.
No Logo Safeway Stores, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Safeway Stores, Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah Ashare Collins +1 410 841 5421 +1 410 841 6591
Office Baltimore
Filed 3/27/1991
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $500000
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County 88888
Terminated 11/20/1991
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 91CV21[USDC DC]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MAG
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 11/20/1991, Entered: 11/26/1991, Terminated: 11/20/1991 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [14-1] joint motion to Dismiss case with prejudice as settled, each party to bear her/its own costs. ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 11/19/91 ) (c/m 11/19/91-jt) (Microfilmed) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 14 Filed: 11/20/1991, Entered: 11/26/1991, Terminated: 11/20/1991 Motion to Dismiss
    JOINT MOTION by Safeway Stores, Inc., Vivian Fay Cohen to Dismiss (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/20/1991, Entered: 12/9/1991 Terminated Case
      Case closed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 9/26/1991, Entered: 10/23/1991 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Catherine C. Blake ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 9/12/91 ) (c/m 9/26/91/91-jh) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/24/1991
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 9/18/1991, Entered: 10/23/1991, Terminated: 9/18/1991 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time for expert witness designation be extended until 10/4/91, and that the discovery deadline be extended until November 4, 1991. ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 9/18/91 ) (c/m 9/18/91-gl) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/24/1991
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 9/18/1991, Entered: 10/23/1991, Terminated: 9/18/1991 Motion for Extension of Time to File
            MOTION by Safeway Stores, Inc. to Extend Time for Discovery. (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/24/1991
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 9/13/1991, Entered: 10/23/1991 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
              Suppplemental SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz9/12/91 ) (c/m 9/12/91-gl) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 9/9/1991, Entered: 9/9/1991, Terminated: 11/20/1991 Motion to Compel
                MOTION by Safeway Stores, Inc. to Compel Discovery and Request for Hearing. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 6/12/1991, Entered: 6/18/1991 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER dated 6/12/91 (c/m 6/18/91 kjb) ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 6/3/1991, Entered: 6/5/1991 Answer
                    ANSWER to Complaint by Safeway Stores, Inc. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 4/15/1991, Entered: 4/19/1991 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of attorney appearance for Vivian Fay Cohen by Michael J. Kator, Kator, Scott & Heller, Chtds. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 4/8/1991, Entered: 4/17/1991 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of attorney appearance for Safeway Stores, Inc. by Deborah Ashare (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 3/27/1991, Entered: 4/3/1991 Response in Opposition to Motion
                          MEMORANDUM by Vivian Fay Cohen in opposition to [3-1] motion to Dismiss, [3-2] motion to Transfer Case (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 3/27/1991, Entered: 4/3/1991 Summons Returned Executed
                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Safeway Stores, Inc. on 1/10/91 by serving resident agent Answer due on 1/30/91 for Safeway Stores, Inc. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 3/27/1991, Entered: 4/3/1991 Motion to Dismiss
                              MOTION with memorandum in support by Safeway Stores, Inc. to Dismiss ,or in the alternative to Transfer Case (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 3/27/1991, Entered: 4/3/1991 Jury Demand
                                DEMAND for jury trial by Vivian Fay Cohen (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/27/1991, Entered: 4/3/1991 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT filed; (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/27/1991, Entered: 4/3/1991 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                                    Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from District of Columbia (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1991, Entered: 4/23/1991 Remark
                                      ALL OF THE ABOVE PLEADINGS WERE FILED IN THE U.S. District Court for the district of DC (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 54 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?