Weiler v. IRS
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-02226

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 7, 2019 at 11:17 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Shawn K. Weiler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Shawn K. Weiler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shawn K. Weiler
v.
No Logo IRS, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7422
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None order adopting report and recommendation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Report and Recommendation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Case Management Conference Plan/Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Order of Referral
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Extension (answer complaint)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued over the counter to plaintiff for service upon IRS. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form) (W,Jo) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: 10/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                        Complaint with jury demand against IRS. Filing fee paid. $400.00. Receipt # 14660099240. Filed by Shawn K. Weiler. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons - Attorney General/U.S. Attorney/IRS) (W,Jo)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 4 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?