Marais v. Reimer Law Co.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00922

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 7, 2019 at 4:23 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1692
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Judgment-Clerk
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None protective order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Vacate
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Notice Setting Mediation
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Notice Setting Mediation
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 19 Motion for Leave to File second amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 4/23/2018. (cmw)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Reply (non motion)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?