Orndorff v. Village of Marvin
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Western District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-00618

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 14, 2020 at 10:37 PM DT (1.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441cv
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None Report of Mediation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Designation of Mediator
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: None Mandate - USCA
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Opinion - USCA
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Case Number - USCA
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of appeal
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a ClaimCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting 31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/24/2018. (brl)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a ClaimCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Marvins Motion to Dismiss as to negligent hiring, retention, and supervision; various state constitutional claims; and Sections 1983 and 1988 violations is GRANTED. Orndorffs Corum claim is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Marvins Motion to Dismiss as to the slander and malicious prosecution claims is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/17/2018. (brl)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER Dismissing Without Prejudice 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/21/2017. (jaw)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Third Party Complaint
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?