United States v. Poole
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alabama Southern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00373

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 5, 2019 at 1:43 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo William S. Poole, Jr., Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Elizabeth N. Duncan +1 202 514 6546 +1 202 514 4963 elizabeth.n.duncan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bruce T. Russell +1 202 514 5900 +1 202 514 9868 Bruce.T.Russell@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7402
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Remark
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Judgment - Default
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against William S. Poole, Jr. in the amount of $328,127.77 as of December 8, 2017, plus accruing interest and penalties according to law. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 12/28/2017. Copy mailed to William S. Poole, Jr., as set out. (tgw) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 12 Motion for Default Judgment. Default Judgment will be entered against Poole in the amount of $328,127.77 as of December 8, 2017, plus accruing interest and penalties according to law, for unpaid income taxes for tax years 2005 through 2013. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 12/28/2017. Copy mailed to William S. Poole, Jr., as set out. (tgw) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for Default Judgment as to William S. Poole, Jr. by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit) (Duncan, Elizabeth)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Response to Order to Show Cause 10 filed by United States of America. (Steele, William) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: 8 Order to Show Cause filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit) (Duncan, Elizabeth)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth N. Duncan on behalf of United States of America (Duncan, Elizabeth)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing the Government to show cause by 12/13/2017 why it has not moved for default judgment against the defendant. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 11/29/2017. (tgw)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge William H. Steele and Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix WS-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (mpp) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                        Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to William S. Poole, Jr. re: Application 5 . (mpp) Copy mailed to Dft. Poole.
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: 10/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                          Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against William S. Poole, Jr . (Russell, Bruce)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. William S. Poole, Jr waiver sent on 8/22/2017, answer due 10/23/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Waiver of the Service of Summons)) (Russell, Bruce) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              Service Order entered 8/18/2017. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 10/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/18/2017. Copies to parties (mpp) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Summons Issued as to William S. Poole, Jr. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (mpp) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  COMPLAINT against William S. Poole, Jr ( IFP.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Summons on Poole) (Russell, Bruce) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2017: # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mpp). (Entered: 08/18/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTIONS REFERRED: 12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to William S. Poole, Jr. to Judge Steele (tgw)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?