Hall v. Dept. of Corrections, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-04857
District Judge Joan A. Lenard, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 25, 2017 at 2:46 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Donald Hall, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #384929

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Hall
v.
No Logo B. Marton, Defendant
No Logo C. Matthews, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Glantz +1 954 349 8895 david.glantz@mail.com
No Logo Captain Estevedo, Defendant
No Logo Captain Luke, Defendant
No Logo Charles Shockley, Defendant
No Logo CM Sgt. Smith, Defendant
No Logo Colonel Abel Price, Defendant
No Logo David Worthy, Defendant
No Logo Dr. Lichi, Defendant
No Logo Dr. Solorzano, Defendant
No Logo E. Manuel, Defendant
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant
No Logo Frank Carey, Defendant
No Logo G. Wood, Defendant
No Logo H. J. Sermon, Defendant
No Logo Hiep Nguyen, Defendant
No Logo Jones Bowden, Defendant
No Logo K. Moore, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Glantz +1 954 349 8895 david.glantz@mail.com
No Logo L. Platt, Defendant
No Logo Lisa Hobson, Defendant
No Logo Mailroom Personnel Holton, Defendant
No Logo Marcia Rhoden, Defendant
No Logo Michael Rathman, Defendant
No Logo Officer C. Bernette, Defendant
No Logo Officer Shane Campbell, Defendant
No Logo Property Sgt. Mizell, Defendant
No Logo Rhodes, Defendant
No Logo Robert Williams, Defendant
No Logo Ronald J. Rice, Defendant
No Logo Roundhardt, Defendant
No Logo S. Salem, Defendant
No Logo Salazar, Defendant
No Logo Secretary for the Department of Corrections, Defendant
No Logo Sergeant Betlyon, Defendant
No Logo Sergeant Hollin, Defendant
No Logo Sergeant Juarez, Defendant
No Logo Sgt. Barton, Defendant
No Logo Stanley Bailey, Defendant
No Logo Tanya Ward, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Patterson, Defendant
No Logo U.S. Postal Service Office, Defendant
No Logo Warden Fortner, Defendant
No Logo Warden David Pridgen, Defendant
No Logo Webster Dickens, Defendant
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to 69 Partial Filing Fee Received filed by Donald Hall. (pa) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Partial Filing Fee payment of $ 5.00, receipt number 959150 (nc) (Entered: 06/06/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      NOTICE of Receipt of letters from Donald Hall. **Please see Notice for further information (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 03/31/05) [EOD Date: 4/1/05] (gp, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/01/2005)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        NOTICE OF RECEIPT of several letters complaining about confinement (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/11/05) [EOD Date: 3/14/05] (ss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/14/2005)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER of dismissal from USCA (certified copy) dismissing [55-1] appeal upon reconsideration, appellant's motion for leave to proceed on appeal is DENIED and this appeal is DISMISSED as frivolous. Appellant's motion for an emergency injunction is DENIED USCA #: 04-10322-G USCA Order Date: 9/20/04 (nc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/27/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER denying [62-1] motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal (Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 06/10/04) [EOD Date: 6/14/04] (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/14/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ORDER from USCA because the district court already has determined that the appellant is indigent, and has instituted a partial payment plan, the only issues is whether the appeal is frivolous. This court now finds that this appeal is frivolous and DENIES leave to proceed. (Signed by USCA on 5/12/04) [EOD Date: 5/24/04] (hh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/24/2004)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER denying [57-1] motion to admonish plaintiff to serve copies of pleadings upon defendant's counsel ( Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 04/02/04) [EOD Date: 4/5/04] (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/05/2004)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION by Donald Hall (Attorney ) to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal with affidavit attached (vl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/25/2004)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER denying [60-1] motion to proceed in forma pauperis ( Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 03/05/04) [EOD Date: 3/8/04] (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/08/2004)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      APPLICATION by Donald Hall to proceed in forma pauperis (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/09/2004)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Transcript Information Form re: as to Donald Hall [55-1] appeal by Donald Hall . No transcript requested. (nc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/06/2004)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER denying [55-1] motion for certificate of appealability, denying [54-1] motion for leave to file Amend to include an antitrust claim (Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 01/30/04) [EOD Date: 2/2/04] (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/02/2004)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION by All Defendants to admonish plaintiff to serve copies of pleadings upon defendant's counsel (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/30/2004)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MEMORANDUM by Dept. of Corrections in opposition to [55-1] motion for certificate of appealability (nc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION by Donald Hall for certificate of appealability (nc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/16/2004)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION by Donald Hall for leave to file Amend to include an antitrust claim (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2004)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of filing Arrest Judgment/Final Judgment by Donald Hall (mh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/02/2004)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [51-1] motion to extend time to file certificate of appealability ( Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 12/5/03) [EOD Date: 12/9/03] (nc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/09/2003)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION by Donald Hall to extend time to file certificate of appealability (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER adopting [46-1] report and recommendations and dismissing case for lack of prosecution (Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 10/30/03) [EOD Date: 11/4/03] CCAP (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [47-1] motion to extend time to file an objection to R&R ( Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 10/01/03) [EOD Date: 10/3/03] (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/03/2003)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              OBJECTION by Donald Hall to [46-1] report and recommendations (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/01/2003)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MOTION by Donald Hall to extend time to file an objection to R&R (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/23/2003)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  REPORT of Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White Signed on: 9/5/03 recommending that this complaint be dismissed for lack of prosecution pursuant to Fed. R.Civ.P. 4(m). Case no longer referred. Objections to R and R due by 9/15/03 CCAP (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/08/2003)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Mandatory Injunction by Donald Hall (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/09/2003)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT by Donald Hall , (Answer due 3/3/03 for Dept. of Corrections, for K. Moore, for Shane Campbell, for C. Matthews, for Abel Price, for Estevedo, for Juarez, for Salazar, for Frank Carey, for L. Platt ) amending adding Betlyon, David Pridgen, Thomas Patterson, Stanley Bailey, Michael Rathman, Robert Williams, G. Wood, Hollin, H. J. Sermon, Mizell, Barton, Smith, David Worthy, C. Bernette, S. Salem, Jones Bowden, Lichi, Ronald J. Rice, Lisa Hobson, Hiep Nguyen, B. Marton, Charles Shockley, Webster Dickens, Solorzano, E. Manuel, Fortner, Tanya Ward, Luke, Marcia Rhoden, Holton, Roundhardt, US Postal Sanderson, Postal Jacksonville (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/20/2003)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER denying [41-1] motion to extend time to effectuate amended complaint (Signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 1/27/03) [EOD Date: 1/29/03] (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/29/2003)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER denying as moot [40-1] motion for leave to file amended complaint adding defendants (Signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 1/27/03) [EOD Date: 1/29/03] (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/29/2003)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION by Donald Hall to extend time to effectuate amended complaint (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/27/2003)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              RENEWAL MOTION by Donald Hall for leave to file amended complaint adding defendants (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/06/2003)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [38-1] motion for leave to amend complaint parties, solely to the extent provided in paragraph 2 and its subparagraphs in this Order; the plaintiff shall file wiht the Clerk of Court a superseding amended complaint on or before 1/31/03 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 12/30/02) [EOD Date: 12/31/02] (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/31/2002)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION by Donald Hall for leave to amend complaint parties (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/04/2002)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed for K. Moore on 8/6/02 Answer due on 8/26/02 for K. Moore (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/09/2002)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      SUMMONS(ES) issued for K. Moore (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/26/2002)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER that the US Marshal shall forthwith, upon an expedited basis, at public expense, serve a copy of the complaint and appropriate summons upon Kimberly Moore (Signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 7/24/02) [EOD Date: 7/26/02] (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/26/2002)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER denying [32-1] motion to compel discovery, information and/or documentation for adequate process of summon complaints services of defendants (Signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 7/24/02) [EOD Date: 7/26/02] (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/26/2002)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER adopting [5-1] preliminary report and recommendations all claims against DOC, Michael Moore, Campbell, Matthews, Sermon, Pratt be dismissed pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) and 1915A(b)(1) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; the pendent state law negligence claim be dismissed; the claims of retaliation against the defendants Estevedo, Juarez, Salazar, Carey, Price, K. Moore and Rhodes remain pending (Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 7/11/02) [EOD Date: 7/12/02] CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/12/2002)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION by Donald Hall to compel discovery, information and/or documentation for adequate process of summon complaints services of defendants (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/18/2002)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER of MAGISTRATE JUDGE granting [26-1] motion to extend time to provide information for services of process, denying [27-1] motion/notice for a prison inspector to accept service of process. Plaintiff shall supply the Court with current addresses for defendants Rhoden, Price, K. Moore, Carey, Salazar, Juarez and Estevedo on or before 7/5/02, or risk dismissal of these defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on [EOD Date: 6/10/02] (gp, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/2002)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  CORRECTED ORDER OF REFERENCE Referring Motion(s) [26-1] motion to extend time to provide information for services of process referred to Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino (signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 5/31/02) [EOD Date: 6/3/02] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/03/2002)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER OF REFERENCE Referring Motion for order relinquising process of services on all defendants to designated prison inspector to Magistrate Simonton (signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 5/29/02) [EOD Date: 5/30/02] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/30/2002)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address of part by Donald Hall (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2002)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE relinquishing process of services on all defendants to designated prison inspector by Donald Hall (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2002)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MOTION by Donald Hall to extend time to provide information for services of process (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/08/2002)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting to 5/3/02 [24-1] motion to extend time to provide information for service of process (Signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 4/2/02) [EOD Date: 4/3/02] (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/03/2002)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MOTION by Donald Hall to extend time to provide information for service of process (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/01/2002)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER that on or before 3/29/02, the plaintiff shall provied the full name, title, if any, and address of the defendants described in the complaint as 1) Rhodes, Assistant Warden, 2) Coloenl Abel Price, 3) K. Moore, Classification Officer, 4) Frank Carey, Classification Officer, 5) Salazar, Classification Officer, 6) Sgt. Juarez, 7) Captain Estevedo (Signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 2/20/02) [EOD Date: 2/22/02] (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/22/2002)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons returned as undeliverable as to defendant Salazar (gp, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/20/2002)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons returned as undeliverable as to defendant K. Moore (gp, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/20/2002)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons returned as undeliverable as to defendant Frank Carey (gp, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/20/2002)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Response by All Defendants to [18-1] order to respond to preliminary report of magistrate and plaintiff's objections (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/07/2002)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER directing defendants to respond to preliminary report and recommendation and objections (Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 2/4/02) [EOD Date: 2/5/02] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/05/2002)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons returned as undeliverable as to defendant Juarez (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2002)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons returned as undeliverable as to defendant Estevedo (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2002)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons returned as undeliverable as to defendant Abel Price (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2002)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons returned as undeliverable as to defendant Rhodes (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/17/2002)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    OBJECTION by Donald Hall to [5-1] report and recommendations (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/02/2002)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service for summons as to K. Moore Mailed on: 12/14/01; 30 days to file waiver. (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service for summons as to Frank Carey Mailed on: 12/14/01; 30 days to waiver. (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service for summons as to Salazar Mailed on: 12/14/01; 30 days to waiver. (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service for summons as to Juarez Mailed on: 12/14/01; 30 days to file waiver. (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service for summons as to Estevedo Mailed on: 12/14/01; 30 days to file waiver. (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service for summons as to Rhodes Mailed on: 12/14/01; 30 days to file waiver. (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service for summons as to Abel Price Mailed on: 12/14/01; 30 days to file waiver. (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    PRELIMINARY REPORT of Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino Signed on: 12/14/01 recommending that 1) all claims against the defendant DOC, Michael Moore, Campbell, Matthews, Sermon, and Platt be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) and 1915A(b)(1) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; 2) the pendent state law negligence claim be dismissed; and 2) the claims of retaliation against the defendants Estevedo, Juarez, Salazar, Carey, Price, K. Moore and Rhodes remain pending. Objections to R and R due by 12/24/01 CCAP (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by C. Matthews, K. Moore : amends [3-1] answer (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/11/2001)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Answer and affirmative defenses by C. Matthews, K. Moore (Attorney David Jay Glantz) (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Clerk's Order of Magistrate Judge Assignment to Magistrate Charlene H. Sorrentino, re: Administrative Order (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/04/2001)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL from: the Eleventh Judicial Circuit in and for Miami-Dade County Florida; FILING FEE $150.00 RECEIPT # 853531; B-3; CHS (ea, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/04/2001)
                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 23 times.

                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?