District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Massachusetts District Court Court of Appeals for the First Circuit United States Supreme Court

Ayyadurai v. Floor64, Inc., et al

Appeal Court of Appeals for the First Circuit, Case No. 17-1945
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 23, 2022 at 9:37 PM EDT (2.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Floor64, Inc., Defendant - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
Officially listed as "Floor64, Inc., D/b/a Techdirt"

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Bertsche +1 857 303 6938
Space Jeffrey J. Pyle +1 617 456 8143 +1 617 456 8100
No Logo Leigh Beadon, Defendant - Appellee/Cross-Appellant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Bertsche +1 857 303 6938
Space Jeffrey J. Pyle +1 617 456 8143 +1 617 456 8100
No Logo Masnick, Michael David, Defendant - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
Officially listed as "Michael David Masnick"

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Bertsche +1 857 303 6938
Space Jeffrey J. Pyle +1 617 456 8143 +1 617 456 8100
No Logo Ayyadurai, V. A. Shiva, Plaintiff - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
Officially listed as "Shiva Ayyadurai"

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy M. Cornell +1 617 580 9036
Space Dilan A. Esper +1 310 275 5351 +1 310 273 8706 vflugge@earthlink.net
Space Charles J Harder +1 424 203 1600 +1 424 203 1601 charder@harderllp.com
Space Douglas E. Mirell +1 310 201 7415 +1 310 201 4447
Space RYAN J. STONEROCK +1 424 203 1600 +1 424 203 1601 rstonerock@hmafirm.com
Attributes
Nature of Suit 4320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.mad.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:17-cv-10011-FDS&caseId=0
Lower Court Case https://ecf.mad.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:17-cv-10011-FDS&caseId=0
Timeline
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107440222 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None ?
MANDATE issued. [17-1945, 17-1991] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107440216 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None ?
JUDGMENT entered: Upon consideration of the parties' joint motion, it is hereby ordered that these cross-appeals be voluntarily dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) with each party to bear its own costs. Mandate to issue forthwith. [17-1945, 17-1991] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107440006 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None ?
JOINT MOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick and Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai in 17-1945, 17-1991. Certificate of service dated 05/16/2019. [17-1945, 17-1991] (JJP)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107420757 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None ?
ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick and Leigh Beadon. Brief due 05/13/2019 for appellee Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc. and Michael David Masnick. [17-1945, 17-1991] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107419797 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None ?
MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick and Leigh Beadon in 17-1945, 17-1991. Certificate of service dated 03/29/2019. [17-1945, 17-1991]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (JJP)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107406650 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None ?
ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick and Leigh Beadon. Brief due 03/29/2019 for appellee Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc. and Michael David Masnick. [17-1945, 17-1991] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107406563 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None ?
ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick and Leigh Beadon in 17-1945, 17-1991. Certificate of service dated 02/27/2019. [17-1945, 17-1991] (JJP)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107393348 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None ?
ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai and Appellees/Cross-Appellants Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick and Leigh Beadon. Brief due 02/27/2019 for appellee Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc. and Michael David Masnick. [17-1945, 17-1991] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107392977 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None ?
ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc. and Michael David Masnick in 17-1945, 17-1991. Certificate of service dated 01/25/2017. [17-1945, 17-1991] CLERK'S NOTE: Party selection was incorrect. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (JJP)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107381783 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None ?
ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick and Leigh Beadon. Brief due 01/28/2019 for appellee Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc. and Michael David Masnick. [17-1945, 17-1991] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107381343 Filed: 12/24/2018, Entered: None ?
ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick and Leigh Beadon in 17-1945, 17-1991. Certificate of service dated 12/24/2018. [17-1945, 17-1991] (JJP)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107380644 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None ?
ORDER entered: Attorney Thomas R. Sutcliffe has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record for Appellees/Cross-Appellants Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick, and Leigh Beadon ("Floor64 Defendants"). Upon consideration, the motion is allowed. The Floor64 Defendants will continue to be represented by their remaining counsel of record. [17-1945, 17-1991] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107379598 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None ?
MOTION for Attorney Thomas R. Sutcliffe to withdraw as counsel filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc. and Michael David Masnick in 17-1945. Certificate of service dated 12/19/2018. [17-1945, 17-1991] (TRS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107371840 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None ?
ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick and Leigh BeadonBrief due 12/28/2018 for appellees/cross-appellants Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc. and Michael David Masnick. [17-1945, 17-1991] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107370601 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None ?
ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick and Leigh Beadon. Certificate of service dated 11/28/2018. [17-1945, 17-1991] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional case, 17-1991. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (JJP)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107359420 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None ?
ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick and Leigh Beadon. Brief due 11/28/2018 for appellee Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc. and Michael David Masnick. [17-1945, 17-1991] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107357342 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None ?
ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc. and Michael David Masnick in 17-1945, 17-1991. Certificate of service dated 10/25/2018. [17-1945, 17-1991] (RAB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107343464 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None ?
ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick and Leigh Beadon. Brief due 10/29/2018 for appellees Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc. and Michael David Masnick. [17-1945, 17-1991] (GB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107343391 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None ?
ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc. and Michael David Masnick in 17-1945, 17-1991. Certificate of service dated 09/25/2018. [17-1945, 17-1991] (RAB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107330029 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None ?
ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick and Leigh Beadon. Brief due 09/28/2018 for appellee Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc. and Michael David Masnick. [17-1945, 17-1991] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107329526 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None ?
ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc. and Michael David Masnick in 17-1945, 17-1991. Certificate of service dated 08/22/2018. [17-1945, 17-1991] (RAB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107317731 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None ?
ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Floor64, Inc., Michael David Masnick and Leigh Beadon. Brief due 08/29/2018 for appellees Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc. and Michael David Masnick. [17-1945, 17-1991] (GB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107317535 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None ?
ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc. and Michael David Masnick in 17-1945, 17-1991. Certificate of service dated 07/24/2018. [17-1945, 17-1991] (RAB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None ?
NINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [6180993-2] submitted by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai. [17-1945, 17-1991] (DK)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None ?
APPENDIX filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai in 17-1945, 17-1991. Number of volumes: 1. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 06/28/2018. [17-1945, 17-1991] (AP)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107308914 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None ?
APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELEE'S PRINCIPAL BRIEF filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai in 17-1945, 17-1991. Certificate of service dated 06/28/2018. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 07/09/2018. Brief due 07/30/2018 for APPELLEE/CROSS-APPELLANTS Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc. and Michael David Masnick. [17-1945, 17-1991] (AP)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107307891 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None ?
BRIEF tendered by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai in 17-1945, 17-1991. [17-1945, 17-1991] (CJH)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107307071 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None ?
NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai in 17-1945, 17-1991 filed by Attorney Dilan A. Esper. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2018. [17-1945, 17-1991] (DAE)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107307068 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None ?
NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai in 17-1945, 17-1991 filed by Attorney Charles J. Harder. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2018. [17-1945, 17-1991] (CJH)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107293352 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None ?
ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai. Brief and Appendix due 06/28/2018 for appellant Shiva Ayyadurai. [17-1945, 17-1991] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107292799 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None ?
ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai. Certificate of service dated 05/22/2018. [17-1945, 17-1991] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional case 17-1991. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (TMC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107280883 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None ?
ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai. Brief and Appendix due 05/29/2018 for appellant Shiva Ayyadurai. [17-1945, 17-1991] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107280759 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None ?
MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai. Certificate of service dated 04/24/2018. [17-1945, 17-1991] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional case 17-1991. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (TMC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107270308 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None ?
ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai. Brief and Appendix due 04/27/2018 for appellant Shiva Ayyadurai. [17-1945, 17-1991] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107269523 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None ?
ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai in 17-1991. Certificate of service dated 03/23/2018. [17-1945, 17-1991] (TMC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107257651 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None ?
ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai. Brief and Appendix due 03/28/2018 for appellant/cross-appellee Shiva Ayyadurai. [17-1945, 17-1991] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107257121 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None ?
ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai. Certificate of service dated 02/16/2018. [17-1945, 17-1991] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional case 17-1991. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (TMC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107245329 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None ?
ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai in 17-1945, 17-1991. Brief and Appendix due 02/26/2018 for appellant/cross-appellee Shiva Ayyadurai. [17-1945, 17-1991] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107245241 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None ?
CORRECTED MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai. Certificate of service dated 01/19/2018. [17-1945, 17-1991] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional case 17-1991. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (TMC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107244841 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None ?
CORRECTED MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai. Certificate of service dated 01/18/2018. [17-1945] CLERK'S NOTE: The name of the ECF Filer must be preceded by an "s/" and typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. The cross appeal case 17-1991 caption must be included on the filing.THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS (January 22, 2018). (TMC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107243710 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None ?
ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai. Certificate of service dated 01/16/2018. [17-1945] (TMC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107230757 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None ?
ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai. Brief and Appendix due 01/25/2018 for appellant Shiva Ayyadurai. [17-1945, 17-1991] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107230687 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None ?
ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Shiva Ayyadurai in 17-1945, 17-1991. Certificate of service dated 12/07/2017. [17-1945, 17-1991] (TMC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107215766 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None ?
CROSS-APPEAL briefing schedule set pursuant to F.R.A.P. 28.1. Brief and Appendix due 12/11/2017 for appellant/cross-appellee Shiva Ayyadurai. [17-1945, 17-1991] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107215644 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None ?
NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Charles J. Harder for Shiva Ayyadurai, Douglas E. Mirell for Shiva Ayyadurai and Ryan J. Stonerock for Shiva Ayyadurai. [17-1945] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107215077 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None ?
NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees/Cross-Appellants Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc. and Michael David Masnick in 17-1991, 17-1945 filed by Attorney Thomas R. Sutcliffe. Certificate of service dated 10/26/2017. [17-1991, 17-1945] (TRS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107215005 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None ?
NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees/Cross-Appellants Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc. and Michael David Masnick in 17-1945, 17-1991 filed by Attorney Robert A. Bertsche. Certificate of service dated 10/26/2017. [17-1945, 17-1991] (RAB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107214982 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None ?
NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees/Cross-Appellants Leigh Beadon, Floor64, Inc. and Michael David Masnick in 17-1945, 17-1991 filed by Attorney Jeffrey J. Pyle. Certificate of service dated 10/26/2017. [17-1945, 17-1991] (JJP)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107211199 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None ?
ORDER setting cross-appeal briefing schedule pursuant to F.R.A.P. 28.1. The briefing schedule set in Appeal No. 17-1945 is hereby vacated. A new briefing schedule will be set once the record on appeal in Appeal No. 17-1991, including all necessary transcripts, is complete. The attached information sheet sets forth the filing requirements for briefs filed pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28.1. [17-1945, 17-1991] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107210022 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None ?
NOTICE issued. After 10/26/2017, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Charles J. Harder for Shiva Ayyadurai, Douglas E. Mirell for Shiva Ayyadurai and Ryan J. Stonerock for Shiva Ayyadurai. [17-1945] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107209989 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None ?
TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Shiva Ayyadurai indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 10/11/2017. [17-1945] CLERK'S NOTE: The ECF filer did not select the option that best describes the document. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (TMC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107209498 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None ?
BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 11/20/2017 for appellant Shiva Ayyadurai. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 14 days following service of appellee's brief. [17-1945] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107209473 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None ?
DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Shiva Ayyadurai. Certificate of service dated 10/10/2017. [17-1945] (TMC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107209469 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None ?
NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Shiva Ayyadurai filed by Attorney Timothy Cornell. Certificate of service dated 10/10/2017. [17-1945] (TMC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107205959 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None ?
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #50) filed by Appellant Shiva Ayyadurai. Docketing Statement due 10/11/2017. Transcript Report/Order form due 10/11/2017. Appearance form due 10/11/2017. [17-1945] (KPC)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 48 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?