Smith v. Department of Treasury/Internal Revenue Service
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-05394

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 18, 2019 at 11:47 PM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Martin D Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert L. Goldstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Lawrence Goldstein +1 415 391 8700 +1 415 391 8701 rgoldstein@taxexit.com
v.
No Logo United States Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Landon M. Yost +1 202 307 2144 landon.m.yost@usdoj.gov
Defendant Landon M. Yost +1 202 307 2144 landon.m.yost@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7422
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/7/2018. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, and Denying as Moot 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 1/26/2018 re 19 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Martin D Smith, 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. For the reasons stated on the record, the case is dismissed. Court to issue order. Total Time in Court: 18 minutes. Court Reporter: Kathy Sullivan. Attorney for Plaintiff: Robert Goldstein. Attorney for Defendant: Landon Yost. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/26/2018) Modified on 1/26/2018 (bpfS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/26/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        CLERK'S NOTICE resetting 19 MOTION to Certify Class, 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Initial Case Management Conference from 1/25/2018 to Friday 1/26/2018 at 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Unknown Document Type
          JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. (Yost, Landon) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: 12/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 19 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byUnited States Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. (Yost, Landon) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              MOTION to Certify Class filed by Martin D Smith. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 12/26/2017. Replies due by 1/2/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Goldstein, Robert) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                REPLY to Plaintiff's Response (re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction) filed by United States Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. (Yost, Landon) (Filed on 12/11/2017) Modified on 12/12/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2018. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/11/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    CLERK'S NOTICE Set/Reset Deadlines as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing reset for 1/25/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2017) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/8/17. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2017) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Martin D Smith.. (Goldstein, Robert) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            CLERK'S NOTICE: Directing Plaintiff to file consent or declination to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction no later than December 15, 2017. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
                              OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) Reply to Motion to Dismiss filed byMartin D Smith. (Goldstein, Robert) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service.. (Yost, Landon) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 12/6/2017. Replies due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Chong S. Hong, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Yost, Landon) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Martin D Smith (Goldstein, Robert) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                      Summons Issued as to United States Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                        Proposed Summons. (Goldstein, Robert) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Martin D Smith Filing Orders (San Francisco), ECF Registration Information, Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of A Summons, Waiver of the Service of Summons, Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge with Election Form, Magistrate Judge James Standing Order re Discovery, Magistrate Judge James Case Management Standing Order, Standing Order For All Judges Of The Northern District Of California (Goldstein, Robert) (Filed on 9/21/2017) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            COMPLAINT (1) REQUEST FOR ABATEMENT OF TAXES ASSESSED TAX YEAR 2001; (2) REQUEST FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; (3) RULE 23(A) CLASS- ACTION STATUS SOUGHT against United States Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. Filed byMartin D Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit #1, # 2 Exhibit #2, # 3 Exhibit #3, # 4 Exhibit #4, # 5 Exhibit #5, # 6 Exhibit #6, # 7 Exhibit #7, # 8 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 9 Summons, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldstein, Robert) (Filed on 9/21/2017) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/2/2017. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Martin D Smith re 1 Complaint,, RE:(1) Request for Abatement of Taxes Assessed Tax Year 2001; (2) Request for Declaratory Relief; (3) Rule 23(A) Class-Action Status Sought (Goldstein, Robert) (Filed on 9/18/2017) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  COMPLAINT (1) Request for Abatement of Taxes Assessed Tax Year 2001; (2) Request for Declaratory Relief; (3) Rule 23(A) Class-Action Status Sought against United States Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11726501.). Filed byMartin D Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit #1, # 3 Exhibit #2, # 4 Exhibit #3, # 5 Exhibit #4, # 6 Exhibit #5, # 7 Exhibit #6, # 8 Exhibit #7)(Goldstein, Robert) (Filed on 9/18/2017) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?