Finley v. Livingston
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-00073
District Judge Mary Lou Robinson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 16, 2018 at 1:07 PM EST (3.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Lt Colonel Jaicourrie Finley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by TDCJ No 1354674

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jaicourrie Finley
v.
No Logo Benjamin Gariepy, Defendant
No Logo Bonnie McKibban, Defendant
No Logo Brad Livingston, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Alan Harris +1 817 705 9452
Space Ann Marie Jordan +1 512 329 1995 Ana@JordanLawOffice.us

Toggle Switch Represented by De Leon & Washburn, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Baxter Ward, IV +1 512 478 5308 +1 512 482 8628 gward@dwlawtx.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James C Ho +1 214 698 3264 +1 214 571 2917 jho@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Stephen Notzon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Stephen Notzon +1 512 474 7563 +1 512 852 4788 robert@notzonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attonrey General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amanda Marie Kates +1 512 463 2080 amanda.kates@texasbar.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Nicholas Brezik +1 512 463 2123 +1 512 495 9139
Space Johnathan David Stone +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 495 9139

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Texas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Demetri Anastasiadis +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 495 9139 demetri.anastasiadis@oag.state.tx.us
Space Adam Warren Aston +1 512 936 1700 +1 512 474 2697 adam.aston@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Jerry Stephen Bergman +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 936 2109 jerry.bergman@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Jared E Brehmer +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 936 2109 jared.brehmer@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Patrick Brezik +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 495 9139 Patrick.Brezik@oag.state.tx.us
Space Cynthia Burton +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 936 2109 cynthia.burton@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Jay David Clendenin +1 512 463 1514 +1 512 936 1280 jay.clendenin@oag.texas.gov
Space Kim Coogan +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 495 9139 kim.coogan@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Allan Kennedy Cook +1 512 475 1917 +1 512 495 9139 allan.cook@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Celamaine Cunniff +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 495 9139 cela.cunniff@oag.state.tx.us
Space Jennifer Lynn Daniel +1 512 463 2080 jennifer.daniel@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Seth Byron Dennis +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 495 9139 seth.dennis@oag.state.tx.us
Space C. Daniel DiLizia +1 512 463 2080 c.dilizia@oag.texas.gov
Space Lori K. Erwin +1 512 463 2080 lori.erwin@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Jeffrey E Farrell +1 512 475 4271 +1 512 320 0667 jeffrey.farrell@oag.texas.gov
Space Bruce R Garcia +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 495 9139 bruce.garcia@oag.state.tx.us
Space Carol M.V. Garcia +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 495 9139 carol.garcia@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Deni S Garcia +1 512 936 1400 +1 512 320 8132 deni.garcia@oag.state.tx.us
Space Marjolyn Carol Gardner +1 512 463 2080 carol.gardner@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Matthew J Greer +1 512 475 3079 +1 512 936 2109 matthew.greer@oag.texas.gov
Space Jacqueline Lee Haney +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 495 9139 lee.haney@oag.state.tx.us
Space Katherine Diane Hayes +1 512 936 1400 +1 512 320 8132 katherine.hayes@oag.state.tx.us
Space Ana Marie Jordan +1 512 936 1400 +1 512 320 0667 ana.jordan@oag.state.tx.us
Space Derek Josef Kammerlocher +1 512 463 2080 derek.kammerlocher2@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Calysta Lynn Lantiegne +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 495 9139 calysta.johnson@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Harold Joseph Liller, Jr. +1 512 936 1400 +1 512 495 9139 harold.liller@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Edward Larry Marshall +1 512 936 1400 +1 512 320 8132 edward.marshall@oag.state.tx.us
Space Tina J. Miranda +1 512 936 1400 +1 512 320 8132 tina.miranda@oag.state.tx.us
Space Kevin Andrew Moczygemba +1 512 936 1410 kevin.moczygemba@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Shanna Elizabeth Molinare +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 480 0446 shanna.molinare@oag.texas.gov
Space Shane Dennis Neldner +1 512 475 2270 +1 512 495 9139 shane.neldner@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Daniel Christopher Neuhoff +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 370 9914 daniel.neuhoff@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Leah Jean O'Leary +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 495 9139 leah.o'leary@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Matthew Dennis Ottoway +1 512 463 7463 +1 512 320 8132 matthew.ottoway@oag.state.tx.us
Space Melissa M. Peters +1 512 936 1292 +1 512 495 9139 melissa.peters@oag.state.tx.us
Space Nadine Phillpotts +1 512 463 2080 nadine.phillpotts@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Heather Kriscenski Rhea +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 936 2109 heather.rhea@oag.texas.gov
Space Michael James Ritter +1 512 463 2130 +1 512 495 9139 michael.ritter@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Fredericka Sargent +1 512 936 1600 +1 512 320 8132 fredericka.sargent@oag.texas.gov
Space Johnathan David Stone +1 512 305 7096 +1 512 305 7007 Johnathan.Stone@TMB.state.tx.us
Space Nathan Tadema +1 512 936 1400 +1 512 936 1280 Nathan.Tadema@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Patricia M Tulinski +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 936 2109 pat.tulinski@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Kelli Lynn Weaver +1 512 936 1400 +1 512 320 8132 kelli.weaver@oag.state.tx.us
Space Briana Marie Webb +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 936 2109 briana.webb@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space M. Lawrence Wells +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 495 9139 lawrence.wells@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Space Ariel Nicole Wiley +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 936 2109 ariel.wiley@texasattorneygeneral.gov
No Logo Brian Clark, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by a2xlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Clifton Alexander +1 361 452 1279 +1 361 452 1284 clif@a2xlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Adams, Ferrone & Ferrone

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A McGill +1 805 373 5900 +1 818 874 1382 mmcgill@adamsferrone.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cook Hall & Lampros

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce S H Sarkisian +1 404 876 8100 bsarkisian@cookhall.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Creed & Gowdy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BRYAN SCOTT GOWDY +1 904 350 0075 +1 904 350 0086 bgowdy@appellate-firm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan S. Abady +1 212 763 5000 +1 212 763 5001 jabady@ecbalaw.com
Space Matthew D. Brinckerhoff +1 212 763 5000 +1 212 763 5001 mbrinckerhoff@ecbalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph and Herzfeld

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denise Andrea Schulman +1 212 688 5640 +1 212 688 2548 denise@jhllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Craig R. Zobel, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig Randall Zobel +1 561 277 1819 +1 561 630 9666 czobel@zobellawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MALLON & MCCOOL, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marshall N Perkins +1 410 727 7887 +1 410 727 4770 mperkins@mallonandmccool.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H. Adam Prussin +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 HAPrussin@Pomlaw.Com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Wayne Pepich +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 stevep@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheldon J Schlesinger PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Robert Gdanski +1 954 320 9507 +1 954 320 9509 jonathan@schlesingerlawoffices.com
Space Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com
Space Scott P. Schlesinger +1 954 467 8800 scott@schlesingerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Traber & Voorhees

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theresa M Traber +1 626 585 9611 +1 626 577 7079 tmt@tvlegal.com
No Logo Bruce Zeller, Defendant
No Logo Bryan Collier, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Texas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
In His Official Capacity Only Jeremy C. Greenwell +1 512 463 1600 +1 512 320 8132 jeremy.greenwell@oag.state.tx.us
In His Official Capacity Only Edward Larry Marshall +1 512 936 1400 +1 512 320 8132 edward.marshall@oag.state.tx.us
In His Official Capacity Only Matthew Dennis Ottoway +1 512 463 7463 +1 512 320 8132 matthew.ottoway@oag.state.tx.us
No Logo Colliene Waltz, Defendant
No Logo Darrell Nash, Defendant
No Logo Debra Denton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bedell, Dittmar, DeVault, Pillans & Coxe, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated Michael E. Lockamy +1 904 353 0211 +1 904 353 9307 mel@bedellfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bleichmar Fonti & Auld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated Emily Catherine Aldridge +1 415 445 4013 +1 415 445 4020 ealdridge@bfalaw.com
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated Mili Desai +1 415 445 4006 mdesai@bfalaw.com
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated Matthew Sinclair Weiler +1 415 445 4003 +1 415 445 4020 mweiler@bfalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated Daniel O. Herrera +1 312 782 4880

Toggle Switch Represented by Kopelowitz Ostrow

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated Scott Adam Edelsberg +1 954 525 4100 edelsberg@kolawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kopelowitz Ostrow Ferguson Weisleberg Gilbert

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated Robert C. Gilbert +1 305 384 7270 +1 954 525 4300 robert@gilbertpa.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LACY PRICE & WAGNER, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated W. Allen McDonald +1 865 246 0800 +1 865 690 8199 amcdonald@lpwpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated Abbye Rose Klamann +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 aklamann@lchb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated Peggy J Wedgworth +1 212 631 8622 pwedgworth@milberg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan - Minneapolis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated Eamon O'Kelly +1 212 980 7400 eokelly@robinskaplan.com
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated Hollis L. Salzman +1 212 980 7400 +1 212 980 7499 HSalzman@RobinsKaplan.com
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated Benjamin D. Steinberg +1 612 349 8793 +1 612 339 4181 bsteinberg@robinskaplan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SCOTT & CAIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated Christopher T Cain +1 865 525 2150 +1 865 525 2120 cain@scottandcain.com
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated Thomas S Scott, Jr. +1 865 525 2150 +1 865 525 2120 scott@scottandcain.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated Joseph Peter Guglielmo +1 212 223 6444 +1 212 223 6334 jguglielmo@scott-scott.com
No Logo Defendants 4-49, Defendant
No Logo Jefferey Brown, Defendant
No Logo Joe Ponder, Defendant
No Logo John Adams, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Brian G. Grayson +1 505 620 7355 +1 505 214 5007 graysonlawoffice@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bauman Dow & Leon PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Alberto Leon +1 505 883 3191 +1 505 883 3194 aal@bdllawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by bdsfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Mark Dow +1 505 883 3191 mcd@bdsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berks County District

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 John Adams

Toggle Switch Represented by bowerlawfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Brandee B. Bower +1 816 506 6397 bbower@bowerlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brady & Associates Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Sara Tess Ballew +1 913 696 0925 +1 913 696 0468 sgold@mbradylaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Michael F. Brady +1 913 696 0925 +1 913 696 0468 brady@mbradylaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Mark A. Kistler +1 913 696 0925 +1 913 696 0468 mkistler@mbradylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cunningham Bounds, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 William Earl Bonner +1 251 471 6191 +1 251 479 1031 web@cunninghambounds.com
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 George Wheeler Finkbohner, III +1 251 471 6191 +1 251 479 1031 gwf@cbcbb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by David A. Bagwell, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 David Ashley Bagwell +1 251 928 2970 +1 251 928 6597 david@bagwellesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Cary Brian Samowitz +1 212 335 4500 +1 212 335 4501 cary.samowitz@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by fchclaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Nikko Harada +1 505 243 6045 +1 505 243 6642 nharada@fchclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodman Acker, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Brian J. Nagy +1 248 483 5000 +1 248 483 3131 bnagy@goodmanacker.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman Herman et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hhkc.com
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Russ M. Herman +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 rwestenfeld@hhkc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Lawrence A. Organ

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Lawrence Anthony Organ +1 415 453 4740 +1 415 785 7352 larry@civilrightsca.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Manning & Marder Kass Ellrod Ramirez LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Patrick L. Hurley +1 415 217 6990 +1 415 227 6999 plh@mmker.com
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Eugene P Ramirez +1 213 624 6900 +1 213 624 6999 epr@manningllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mohrman & Kaardal, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 James V. F. Dickey +1 612 465 0960 +1 612 341 1076 dickey@mklaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Erick G. Kaardal +1 612 341 1074 +1 612 341 1076 kaardal@mklaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 William F Mohrman +1 612 341 1074 +1 612 341 1076 mohrman@mklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan Meyers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Courtney E. Morgan, Jr. +1 313 961 0130 +1 313 961 8178 cmorgan@morganmeyers.com
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Debra N. Pospiech +1 313 961 0130 dpospiech@morganmeyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the General Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Kevin S Reed +1 213 241 7666

Toggle Switch Represented by Siro Smith Dickson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Raymond Dake +1 816 471 4881 +1 816 471 4883 rdake@sirosmithdickson.com
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Athena M. Dickson +1 816 471 4881 +1 816 471 4883 adickson@sirosmithdickson.com
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Rik N. Siro +1 816 471 4881 +1 816 471 4883 rsiro@sirosmithdickson.com
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Eric W Smith +1 816 471 4881 +1 816 471 4883 esmith@sirosmithdickson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stone Granade & Crosby PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Samuel N. Crosby +1 334 626 6696 +1 251 626 2617 snc@sgclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SUITE 310

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 David T. Hooper +1 615 661 5472 dhooper@hooperzinn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Woody Law Firm PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2018 Teresa A. Woody +1 816 421 4246 +1 816 221 8449 teresa@woodylawfirm.com
No Logo John Jowers, Defendant
No Logo Kimberly Rowell, Defendant
No Logo Kip Adams, Defendant
No Logo Lannette Unthicum, Defendant
No Logo Levin Fuller, Defendant
No Logo Matthew Borunda, Defendant
No Logo Melinda Fletcher, Defendant
No Logo Ralph Fletcher, Defendant
No Logo Raymond Soto, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Katz Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew A. Katz +1 773 847 8982 matthew@katzlawchicago.com
No Logo Richard Fernandes, Defendant
No Logo Timothy King, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Catherine E. Youngman, Ch. 7 Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Catherine E. Youngman +1 973 992 4800 +1 973 992 9125

Toggle Switch Represented by EAVES LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Arthur Eaves +1 601 355 7770

Toggle Switch Represented by Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rex Hwang +1 310 553 3000 +1 310 843 2626 rhwang@glaserweil.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holder Law Group LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alfred Darwin Holder, Jr. +1 410 296 9550 +1 410 296 9554 darholder@holderlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert Hafif

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Greg K Hafif +1 909 624 1671 +1 909 625 7772 ghafif@hafif.com
Space Fenja Klaus +1 909 624 1671 +1 909 625 7772 fklaus@hafif.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Liston/Lancaster, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Liston +1 662 283 2132 +1 662 283 3742 bliston@listonlancaster.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDonnell Crowley, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Thomas Crowley +1 732 383 7233 +1 732 383 7531
Space John Michael McDonnell +1 732 383 7233 +1 732 383 7531 jmcdonnell@mcdonnellcrowley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moreno and Perez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Miguel G Caballero +1 213 745 6300 +1 213 746 6060 mcaballero@mpforlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marissa Christina Langhoff +1 949 234 6032 +1 949 429 0892 MLanghoff@napolibern.com
Space Jessica You Lee +1 949 234 6032 +1 949 429 0892 jlee@napolibern.com
Space Hunter Jay Shkolnik +1 212 267 3700 +1 212 587 0031 hunter@napolibern.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Odenbreit Law, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine J Odenbreit +1 888 490 3510 kodenbreit@kjolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Karen Atkins +1 205 986 1017 +1 205 328 6000 lisa.atkins@ogletreedeakins.com
Space Josh Chandler Harrison +1 205 714 4414 +1 205 328 6000 josh.harrison@ogletreedeakins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schumann Rallo & Rosenberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley R Mathews +1 714 850 0210 +1 714 850 0551 bmathews@srrlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Gallagher Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael T. Gallagher , +1 713 222 8080 +1 713 222 0066 shawnaf@gld-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trenk, DiPasquale, Della Fera & Sodono, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Sodono +1 973 243 8600 +1 973 243 8600 asodono@trenklawfirm.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER denying 45 Motion to Vacate Magistrate's Informa [sic] Pauperis Order" (Ordered by Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 8/1/2011) (plh) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MOTION to Vacate 44 Order Regarding Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal ("Plaintiff's Motion to District Judge to Vacate Magistrate's In forma Pauperis Order") filed by Jaicourrie Finley. (awc) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER Regarding Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal - Order For Initial Partial Filing Fee in amount of $0.62 is assessed. ORDER for Collection and Payment of the balance of the Full Filing Fee of $455.00. Jaicourrie Finley shall pay in monthly installments as mandated by the PLRA. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Clinton E Averitte on 4/27/2011) (djs) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal with certificate of trust account filed by Jaicourrie Finley (djs) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER of USCA as to 40 Notice of Appeal filed by Jaicourrie Finley. Under 5th Cir. R. 42.3, the appeal is dismissed as of 11/19/2010 for want of prosecution. The appellant failed to timely pay the docketing fee (djs) Modified on 11/30/2010 (awc). (Entered: 11/29/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            USCA Case Number 10-10893 in USCA5 for 40 Notice of Appeal filed by Jaicourrie Finley. (djs) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit as to 39 Judgment by Jaicourrie Finley. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (djs) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                JUDGMENT - Of equal date herewith, the Court has entered an Order of Dismissal in the above-referenced and numbered cause. Judgment is entered accordingly. (Ordered by Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 8/3/2010) (djs) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER of Dismissal - Based on the analysis set forth in the 6/14/2010 Report and Recommendation, and plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit, the Civil Rights Complaint is dismissed with prejudice as frivolous. ADOPTING 33 Report and Recommendation. (Ordered by Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 8/3/2010) (djs) Modified on 8/4/2010 (awc). (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION to Dismiss "Notice of Non-Suit" filed by Jaicourrie Finley (djs) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER denying 30 Motion to Consider Withdrawal (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Clinton E Averitte on 6/14/2010) (djs) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER denying Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Extension (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Clinton E Averitte on 6/14/2010) (djs) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER Denying as Moot Plaintiff's 31 Motion for Consideration. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Clinton E Averitte on 6/14/2010) (djs) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Recommending that the Civil Rights Complaint be dismissed with prejudice as factually frivolous. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Clinton E Averitte on 6/14/2010) (djs) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Status Request by Jaicourrie Finley with Deputy Clerk Response -- mailed copy of docket sheet to plaintiff. (awc) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION to Dismiss "Motion to Consider Withdrawl (sic)" filed by Jaicourrie Finley. (awc) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION for Extension of Time, MOTION for Consideration by Magistrate of Amended Complaint filed by Jaicourrie Finley. (awc) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION for Extension to Objections to Magistrate Report Enlight [sic] of Magistrate Order to Cure Deficiencies and Amend and Motion to Vacate Magistrate Report to Cure Deficiencies filed by Jaicourrie Finley (djs) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brad Livingston, Bruce Zeller, John Adams, Benjamin Gariepy, Debra Denton, Bonnie McKibban, Brian Clark, John Jowers, Raymond Soto, Levin Fuller, Colliene Waltz, Jefferey Brown, Kimberly Rowell, Matthew Borunda, Kip Adams, Timothy King, Joe Ponder, Darrell Nash, Richard Fernandes, Ralph Fletcher, Melinda Fletcher filed by Jaicourrie Finley. (djs) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER denying Without Prejudice 22 Motion to Serve Defendants by Marshal's Service (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Clinton E Averitte on 5/10/2010) (djs) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER denying as Moot 21 Motion for Consideration of in forma pauperis (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Clinton E Averitte on 5/10/2010) (djs) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER denying 23 Ex Parte Motion to File Motion for Hearing on Injunctive Relief Under Seal and ORDER denying as Moot 24 Ex Parte Motion for Hearing on Motion for Injunctive Relief (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Clinton E Averitte on 5/10/2010) (djs) Modified on 5/11/2010 (djs). (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              EX PARTE MOTION for Hearing on Motion for Injunctive Relief filed by Jaicourrie Finley (djs) Modified on 5/11/2010 (djs). (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                EX PARTE MOTION to Seal Motion for Hearing on Injunctive Relief filed by Jaicourrie Finley (djs) Modified on 5/11/2010 (djs). (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION to Serve Defendants by Marshal's Service filed by Jaicourrie Finley (djs) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION for Consideration of Informa Pauperis Status filed by Jaicourrie Finley (djs) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER denying Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Injunctive Relief (Ordered by Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 5/3/2010) (djs) Modified on 5/3/2010 (djs). (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER to Cure Deficiencies by Amended Complaint and FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATIONS: If plaintiff wishes to cure the deficiencies noted, he shall file an Amended Complaint on the attached complaint form within 20 days from the date of this Order. If plaintiff fails to amend and cure the noted defects, then it is recommended that the Civil Right Complaint be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted and with prejudice as factually frivolous. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Clinton E Averitte on 5/3/2010) (djs) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER denying Plaintiff's 14 Ex Parte Motion to File Objections Under Seal (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Clinton E Averitte on 5/3/2010) (djs) Modified on 5/4/2010 (djs). (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER denying Plaintiff's 8 Ex Parte Motion to File Motion for Injunctive Relief and Affidavit Under Seal. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Clinton E Averitte on 5/3/2010) (djs) Modified on 5/4/2010 (djs). (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              Order Unfiling 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint filed by Jaicourrie Finley due to the following deficiency: A motion for leave to amend must have a copy of the proposed amended pleading attached as an exhibit. LR 15.1(a) and (b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Clinton E Averitte on 5/3/2010) (djs) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                FILING FEE ORDER - Order For Initial Partial Filing Fee in amount of $5.82 is assessed. Order for Collection and Payment of the balance of the Full Filing Fee of $350.00. Plaintiff shall pay in monthly installments as mandated by the PLRA. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Clinton E Averitte on 4/28/2010) (djs) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  EX PARTE MOTION to File Objections -Plaintiff- to the Magistrate Order Transferring Civil Action Under Seal filed by Jaicourrie Finley (NOD) (djs) Modified on 5/3/2010 (djs). Modified on 5/4/2010 (djs). (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Certificate of Trust Account by Jaicourrie Finley TDCJ #01354674. (djs) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jaicourrie Finley and Request for Copies. Clerk's response: Docket sheet mailed to Jaicourrie Finley (djs) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        RESPONSE filed by Jaicourrie Finley re: 3 VACATED Order And Notice of Deficiency (djs) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          EX PARTE DOCUMENT - Affidavit in Support of Motion for Injunctive Relief (Doc #9) filed by Jaicourrie Finley (NOD) (Attachments: # 1 envelope) (djs) Modified on 5/3/2010 (djs). (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            EX PARTE MOTION for Injunctive Relief - Temporary Restraining Order & Emergency Hearing filed by Jaicourrie Finley (NOD) (Attachments: # 1 envelope) (djs) Modified on 5/3/2010 (djs). (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              EX PARTE MOTION to File Motion for Injunctive Relief and Attached Affidavit Under Seal filed by Jaicourrie Finley (NOD) (Attachments: # 1 envelope) (djs) Modified on 5/3/2010 (djs). Modified on 5/4/2010 (djs). (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                UNFILED (per Order 5/3/10 Doc #16) MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint filed by Jaicourrie Finley (NOD) (Attachments: # 1 envelope) (djs) Modified on 5/3/2010 (djs). (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Letter notifying plaintiff of transfer of case. (awc) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    Order Transferring to Another Division. This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Amarillo Division. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma C Ramirez on 4/1/2010) (klm) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER: The Court issued a Notice of Deficiency and Order directing Plaintiff to submit a properly signed certificate of inmate trust account. After the order was issued, the Clerk's Office docketed Plaintiff's certificate of inmate trust account. See Doc. 2 (modified 3/31/2010). Accordingly, the Notice of Deficiency and Order is hereby VACATED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma C Ramirez on 4/1/2010) (klm) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ***VACATED PER ORDER OF 4/1/2010, DOC. 4*** NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER that plaintiff has thirty (30) days to cure the following deficiency: Plaintiff's 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, does not provide enough information to decide if in forma pauperis status is appropriate. Please submit a properly signed Certificate of Inmate Trust Account. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma C Ramirez on 3/31/2010) (twd) Modified on 4/2/2010 (klm). (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jaicourre Finley. (jrb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2010: # 1 trust account) (jrb). (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Brad Livingston, Bryan Collier, Lannette Unthicum filed by Jaicourre Finley. (jrb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2010: # 1 envelope) (jrb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2010: # 2 complaint) (jrb). (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 20 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?