SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC v. MYLAN N v.

Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-09105
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2022 at 4:07 PM EST (3.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE, Plaintiff

Represented by Direct: 973-535-0500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR +1 973 757 1030 wwalsh@walsh.law

Represented by One Newark Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KATELYN O'REILLY +1 973 757 1100 koreilly@thewalshfirm.com

Represented by Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON +1 973 757 1100 cgannon@thewalshfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LIZA M. WALSH +1 973 757 1100 lwalsh@thewalshfirm.com
No Logo SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, Plaintiff

Represented by Direct: 973-535-0500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR +1 973 757 1030 wwalsh@walsh.law

Represented by One Newark Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KATELYN O'REILLY +1 973 757 1100 koreilly@thewalshfirm.com

Represented by Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON +1 973 757 1100 cgannon@thewalshfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LIZA M. WALSH +1 973 757 1100 lwalsh@thewalshfirm.com
No Logo Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Direct: 973-535-0500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR +1 973 757 1030 wwalsh@walsh.law

Represented by One Newark Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KATELYN O'REILLY +1 973 757 1100 koreilly@thewalshfirm.com

Represented by Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON +1 973 757 1100 cgannon@thewalshfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LIZA M. WALSH +1 973 757 1100 lwalsh@thewalshfirm.com
v.
No Logo Biocon Ltd., Defendant

Represented by Saiber Schlesinger Satz & Goldstein, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N ARNOLD B. CALMANN +1 973 622 3333 +1 973 622 3349 abc@saiber.com
No Logo Biocon Research Ltd., Defendant

Represented by Saiber Schlesinger Satz & Goldstein, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N ARNOLD B. CALMANN +1 973 622 3333 +1 973 622 3349 abc@saiber.com
No Logo BIOCON S.A., Defendant

Represented by Saiber Schlesinger Satz & Goldstein, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N ARNOLD B. CALMANN +1 973 622 3333 +1 973 622 3349 abc@saiber.com
No Logo BIOCON SDN.BHD, Defendant

Represented by Saiber Schlesinger Satz & Goldstein, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N ARNOLD B. CALMANN +1 973 622 3333 +1 973 622 3349 abc@saiber.com
No Logo MYLAN GMBH, Defendant

Represented by Saiber Schlesinger Satz & Goldstein, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ARNOLD B. CALMANN +1 973 622 3333 +1 973 622 3349 abc@saiber.com
Space KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR +1 973 622 3333 kae@saiber.com
Space JEFFREY S. SOOS +1 973 622 3333 js@saiber.com
Mylan, Inc. Mylan, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Saiber Schlesinger Satz & Goldstein, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/14/2018 ARNOLD B. CALMANN +1 973 622 3333 +1 973 622 3349 abc@saiber.com
TERMINATED: 02/14/2018 KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR +1 973 622 3333 kae@saiber.com
TERMINATED: 02/14/2018 JEFFREY S. SOOS +1 973 622 3333 js@saiber.com
No Logo MYLAN N.V., Defendant

Represented by Saiber Schlesinger Satz & Goldstein, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/14/2018 ARNOLD B. CALMANN +1 973 622 3333 +1 973 622 3349 abc@saiber.com
TERMINATED: 02/14/2018 KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR +1 973 622 3333 kae@saiber.com
TERMINATED: 02/14/2018 JEFFREY S. SOOS +1 973 622 3333 js@saiber.com
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Saiber Schlesinger Satz & Goldstein, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ARNOLD B. CALMANN +1 973 622 3333 +1 973 622 3349 abc@saiber.com
Space KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR +1 973 622 3333 kae@saiber.com
Space JEFFREY S. SOOS +1 973 622 3333 js@saiber.com
Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit Unknown
Timeline
  Entries (371) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 2/4/2022, Entered: None Federal Circuit Mandate (Terminates Appeal)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 12/30/2021, Entered: None USCA Order (Terms Appeal)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None Appeal Remark
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit Washington DC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 9/1/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Seal Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None Seal Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None Trial Brief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None Trial Brief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Trial Brief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Trial Brief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 224 Letter request for an extension of time to file the Joint Motion to Seal to 12/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/6/2018. (gl, ) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting Defendants' 225 Letter request for an additional extension of time to file the Motion to Seal and Redacted versions of Plaintiffs' letters to 12/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/6/2018. (gl, ) (Main Document 227 replaced on 12/6/2018) (gl, ). (Entered: 12/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Stanley R. Chesler, U.S.D.J. re 223 Letter. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 12/05/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Requesting Extension of Time to File Motion to Seal. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re: Extension to File Motion to Seal Markman Submissions. (WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Stanley Chesler regarding Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief. (WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting Defendants' request for an additional extension of time to file the motion to seal until 12/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 17-9105. (sm) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh on Behalf of the Parties to the Honorable Stanley R. Chesler, U.S.D.J. re: Markman Hearing. (WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Requesting Extension of Time to File Motion to Seal. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 1/16/19 at 4pm. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/27/18. (tjg, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BIOCON LTD., BIOCON RESEARCH LTD., BIOCON S.A., BIOCON SDN.BHD, MYLAN GMBH re 216 Declaration,, 217 Markman Response Brief,, (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MARKMAN RESPONSE BRIEF re 197 Markman Opening Brief, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 44 to the Declaration of Elham F. Steiner in Support of Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit 45)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Entered: 11/20/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Elham F. Steiner in Support of Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief by BIOCON LTD., BIOCON RESEARCH LTD., BIOCON S.A., BIOCON SDN.BHD, MYLAN GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 43 to the Declaration of Elham F. Steiner, # 2 Exhibit 46, # 3 Exhibit 47, # 4 Exhibit 48, # 5 Exhibit 49, # 6 Exhibit 50, # 7 Exhibit 51, # 8 Exhibit 52, # 9 Exhibit 53, # 10 Exhibit 54, # 11 Exhibit 55, # 12 Exhibit 56, # 13 Exhibit 57, # 14 Exhibit 58)(CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Liza M. Walsh re 214 Markman Response Brief,, by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 20-22, # 2 Declaration of Dr. Lee E. Kirsch, # 3 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MARKMAN RESPONSE BRIEF re 201 Markman Opening Brief,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 19)(WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Entered: 11/20/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER that Defendants shall have authorization to file three additional pages to their responsive Markman brief. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 11/20/2018. (sm) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Stanley R. Chesler, U.S.D.J. Requesting Extension of Pagination for Responsive Markman Brief. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting defendants a two-week extension of time from 11/12/2018 until 11/27/2018 to file a motion to seal documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/14/2018. (sm) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Requesting Extension of Time to File Motion to Seal re 182 Letter, 187 Letter,, 195 Letter, 203 Letter,, 183 Exhibit (to Document),,. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 11/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING Discovery Confidentiality Order (ECF 53) and Addendum thereto (ECF 136). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/7/2018. (sm) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh to Hon. Cathy Waldor enclosing Stipulation and Proposed Order amending Discovery Confidentiality Order. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting Defendants' request for a two-week extension of time until and including 11/12/2018 to file a motion to seal the documents re: letter 206 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/29/2018. (sm) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Requesting Extension of Time to File Motion to Seal re 182 Letter, 187 Letter,, 195 Letter, 203 Letter,, 183 Exhibit (to Document),,. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Regarding Proposed Case Schedule. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TEXT ORDER: The Court will not rule on the sample issue raised by plaintiff in dkt. 112. The issue may be resurrected, and more fully briefed pending further discovery by both parties.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/15/18. (tjg, ) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re 195 Letter,. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Entered: 10/15/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BIOCON LTD., BIOCON RESEARCH LTD., BIOCON S.A., BIOCON SDN.BHD, MYLAN GMBH re 199 Exhibit (to Document), 198 Declaration,,, 200 Declaration, 201 Markman Opening Brief,, (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MARKMAN OPENING BRIEF of Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9 to the Declaration of Elham F. Steiner, Esq. in Support of Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit 14, # 3 Exhibit 21, # 4 Exhibit 26)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Entered: 10/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Dr. Jorge A. Ochoa in Support of Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief by BIOCON LTD., BIOCON RESEARCH LTD., BIOCON S.A., BIOCON SDN.BHD, MYLAN GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dr. Robert S. Langer in Support of Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief)(CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Exhibit to 198 Declaration,,, --Exhibit 32 to the Declaration of Elham F. Steiner, Esq. in Support of Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief-- by BIOCON LTD., BIOCON RESEARCH LTD., BIOCON S.A., BIOCON SDN.BHD, MYLAN GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 33, # 2 Exhibit 34, # 3 Exhibit 35, # 4 Exhibit 36, # 5 Exhibit 37, # 6 Exhibit 38, # 7 Exhibit 39, # 8 Exhibit 40, # 9 Exhibit 41, # 10 Exhibit 42)(CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Elham F. Steiner, Esq. in support of Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief by BIOCON LTD., BIOCON RESEARCH LTD., BIOCON S.A., BIOCON SDN.BHD, MYLAN GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Elham F. Steiner, Esq. in support of Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Supplement 10, # 10 Exhibit 11, # 11 Exhibit 12, # 12 Exhibit 13, # 13 Exhibit 15, # 14 Exhibit 16, # 15 Exhibit 17, # 16 Exhibit 18, # 17 Exhibit 19, # 18 Exhibit 20, # 19 Exhibit 22, # 20 Exhibit 23, # 21 Exhibit 24, # 22 Exhibit 25, # 23 Exhibit 27, # 24 Exhibit 28, # 25 Exhibit 29, # 26 Exhibit 30, # 27 Exhibit 31)(CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MARKMAN OPENING BRIEF by Plaintiffs Sanofi Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH, and Sanofi Winthrop Industrie (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Liza M. Walsh w/ Exhibits 1-14, # 2 Declaration of Charles F. Reinholtz w/ Exhibits A-B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER that the parties shall have authorization to file 4 additional pages to their respective opening Markman briefs. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 10/11/2018. (sm) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh. (WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Entered: 10/11/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq., on behalf of the parties, to the Honorable Stanley R. Chesler, U.S.D.J. Requesting Extension of Pagination for Opening Markman Briefs. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATEMENT from all Parties re Joint Claim Construction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 10/08/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Nicole W. Stafford, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 10/08/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh re 187 Letter,,. (WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting Defendants' Unopposed 178 Motion to Seal Documents 176 Redacted Document, 174 Redacted Document, 132 Amended Complaint, 151 Answer to Amended Complaint, 149 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, 129 Letter, 177 Redacted Document, 175 Redacted Document, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/21/2018. (sm) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 144 Joint Motion to Seal Documents 102 Exhibit (to Document), 103 Brief in Support of Motion, 113 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, 111 Brief in Opposition to Motion, 105 Brief in Support of Motion, 116 Redacted Document, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/21/2018. (sm) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Exhibit to 187 Letter,, --Exhibit C-- by BIOCON LTD., BIOCON RESEARCH LTD., BIOCON S.A., BIOCON SDN.BHD, MYLAN GMBH. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq., on behalf of Defendants, to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re 182 Letter, 183 Exhibit (to Document),,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Entered: 09/21/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Nicole W. Stafford, Esq., etc. re 184 Application/Petition.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/21/18. (cm, ) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting Defendant's 172 Motion to Seal Document 156 Letter, by MYLAN GMBH, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/21/18. (cm, ) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Nicole W. Stafford, Esq. on behalf of Defendants (On Consent) for by BIOCON LTD., BIOCON RESEARCH LTD., BIOCON S.A., BIOCON SDN.BHD, MYLAN GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nicole W. Stafford, Esq., # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Exhibit to 182 Letter, from Liza M. Walsh by All Plaintiffs. (WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Entered: 09/17/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh. (WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Entered: 09/17/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 158 Motion to Redact 142 Transcript, that Mylan GmbH's unopposed Motion, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c), to permanently seal the transcript of the July 12, 2018 hearing on Mylan GmbHs Motion for Leave to Amend its Invalidity Contentions (ECF No. 142), is hereby GRANTED; that the transcript of the July 12, 2018 hearing on Mylan GmbH's Motion for Leave to Amend its Invalidity Contentions (ECF No. 142), shall be permanently sealed and maintained under seal by the Court; that, pursuant to L. Civ. R. 5.3(g)(2), Mylan GmbH shall submit to the court reporter the redacted version of the Transcript within seven days of the date of receipt of the within Order; etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/14/2018. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 163 Motion to Seal Document; that Mylan GmbH's unopposed Motion, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c), to permanently seal (1) Letter dated June 8, 2018 from Liza M. Walsh, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. (ECF No. 112); (2) Letter dated June 15, 2018 from Arnold B.Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. (ECF No. 117); (3) Letter dated June 19, 2018 from Liza M. Walsh, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. (ECF No. 120); and (4) Exhibits 1-9 to the June 19, 2018 Letter from Liza M. Walsh (ECF No. 120-1), is hereby GRANTED; etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/14/2018. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 110 MOTION to Seal Document 92 Mylan GmbHs May 1, 2018 Letter to the Court, 91 Sanofis April 30, 2018 Letter to the Court; Sanofis April 30, 2018 Letter to the Court (ECF No.91), the redacted version of which has been filed under ECF No. 94 and Mylan GmbHs May 1, 2018 Letter to the Court (ECF No. 92), the redacted version of which has been filed under ECF No. 95, shall be permanently sealed and maintained under seal by the Court; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 09/14/2018. (sms) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Seal Document 132 Amended Complaint,,, 151 Answer to Amended Complaint,, 129 Letter,, 149 Answer to Amended Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, by BIOCON LTD., BIOCON RESEARCH LTD., BIOCON S.A., BIOCON SDN.BHD, MYLAN GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew F. Greinert, Esq., # 2 Exhibit 1 - Index in support of Unopposed Motion to Seal, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REDACTION to 151 Answer to Amended Complaint,, by BIOCON LTD., BIOCON RESEARCH LTD., BIOCON S.A., BIOCON SDN.BHD. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REDACTION to 149 Answer to Amended Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, by MYLAN GMBH. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
REDACTION to 132 Amended Complaint,,, with Redacted Exhibits 1 - 26 by All Plaintiffs. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
REDACTION to 129 Letter,, by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Stanley R. Chesler, U.S.D.J. re: Status. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Seal Document
MOTION to Seal Document 156 Letter, by MYLAN GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew F. Greinert in support of Unopposed Motion to Seal, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Index in support of Unopposed Motion to Seal, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Redacted Document
REDACTION to 156 Letter, by All Plaintiffs. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 answer to counterclaim
ANSWER to Counterclaim by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting defendant's request for a two-week extension to file a motion to seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/15/2018. (sm) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Letter
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Requesting Extension of Time to File Motion to Seal re 156 Letter,. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Mylan GmbH's Counterclaims.. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 11/27/18 at 3:30 PM. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/8/18. (tjg, ) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018 Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice William Sutton Ansley to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8937455.) (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Letter
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Regarding Status Update re 139 Order. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Seal Document
MOTION to Seal Document 112 Letter,, 117 Letter,, 120 Letter,, by MYLAN GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew F. Greinert, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Index in support of Motion to Seal, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Redacted Document
REDACTION to 117 Letter,, by MYLAN GMBH. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Redacted Document
REDACTION to 120 Letter,, by SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 - 9 (Redacted Version))(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Redacted Document
REDACTION to 112 Letter,, by SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to unseal the transcript of the July 16 Opinion 148 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/31/2018. (sm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording
MOTION to Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording 142 Transcript, by MYLAN GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew F. Greinert, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Letter
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re 148 Transcript, 140 Order,. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Letter
Letter from Liza M. Walsh. (WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting Pro Hac Vice Application of William Sutton Ansley, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/19/2018. (ld, ) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting Defendant Mylan GmbH'S re 153 Letter request to extend the deadline to file the motion to seal, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/23/18. (cm, ) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Letter
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Requesting Extension of Time to File Consolidated Motion to Seal re 132 Amended Complaint,,, 151 Answer to Amended Complaint,, 149 Answer to Amended Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, 129 Letter,,. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BIOCON LTD., BIOCON RESEARCH LTD., BIOCON S.A., BIOCON SDN.BHD. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Answer to amended complaint
ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Separate Defenses by BIOCON LTD., BIOCON RESEARCH LTD., BIOCON S.A., BIOCON SDN.BHD.(CALMANN, ARNOLD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Certificate of service
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MYLAN GMBH re 149 Answer to Amended Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Answer to amended complaint
ANSWER to Amended Complaint, Separate Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC by MYLAN GMBH.(CALMANN, ARNOLD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 148 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
**SEALED** Transcript of Proceedings of ORAL OPINIONS held on July 16, 2018, before Judge CATHY L. WALDOR. Court Reporter/Transcriber KING TRANSCRIPTION SERVICES ((973) 237-6080). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (ek).
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting a two-week extension of time for Mylan GmbH to file a motion to seal the submissions regarding a discovery dispute between the parties from 7/17/2018 to 7/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/18/2018. (sm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 Letter
Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re: Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of William Sutton Ansley, # 2 Supporting Certification of Liza M. Walsh, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Letter
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Requesting Extension of Time to File Motion to Seal re 112 Letter,, 120 Letter,, 117 Letter,,. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Seal Document
Joint MOTION to Seal Document 111 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, 105 Brief in Support of Motion,, 102 Exhibit (to Document),, 103 Brief in Support of Motion,, 113 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, by MYLAN GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew F. Greinert, # 2 Declaration of Liza M. Walsh, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Redacted Document
REDACTION to 111 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, by SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Anna E. Dwyer with Exhibits 1 - 8 (Redacted Version), # 2 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 142 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None transcriptCourt Filing
**SEALED** Transcript of Hearing held on July 12, 2018, before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (jml) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Acknowledgment of Service
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE. BIOCON LTD. served on 7/13/2018, answer due 8/3/2018; BIOCON RESEARCH LTD. served on 7/13/2018, answer due 8/3/2018; BIOCON S.A. served on 7/13/2018, answer due 8/3/2018; BIOCON SDN.BHD served on 7/13/2018, answer due 8/3/2018. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TEXT ORDER: Based upon the opinion read into the record on 7/16/18 the Motion to Amend Contentions is GRANTED. Sanofi will have until 8/12/18 to respond. The parties will meet and confer and submit a new scheduling order. The transcript will be sealed pending a Motion to Seal to be filed within 14 days of this order. The transcript will be available to the parties. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/16/18. (tjg, ) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 8/2/18 at 1:30 PM. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/13/18. (tjg, ) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 Summons issued
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BIOCON LTD., BIOCON RESEARCH LTD., BIOCON S.A., BIOCON SDN.BHD Attached is the official court Summons on Amended Complaint, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Susan Miller* (sm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Summons - Request for Issue
Request for Summons to be Issued by SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE as to BIOCON LTD., BIOCON RESEARCH LTD., BIOCON S.A., BIOCON SDN.BHD. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Discovery Confidentiality Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Discovery Confidentiality OrderCourt Filing
ADDENDUM TO STIPULATED DISCOVERY CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/9/2018. (sm) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 Letter
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re 120 Letter,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TEXT ORDER: The Court will grant counsels request and reschedule the 7/12/18 oral argument to 3pm.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/9/18. (tjg, ) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 Certificate of service
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re 132 Amended Complaint,,, (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT against MYLAN GMBH, BIOCON LTD., BIOCON RESEARCH LTD., BIOCON SDN.BHD, BIOCON S.A., filed by SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC; SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH; SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7, # 2 Exhibit 8 Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 8 Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 8 Part 3, # 5 Exhibit 9-26)(sm)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 Letter
Letter from Liza M. Walsh on Behalf of All Parties. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 Letter
Letter from Arnold B.Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Enclosing Addendum to Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order re 53 Discovery Confidentiality Order. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 Letter
Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: 7/5/2018 Letter
Letter from Liza M. Walsh re 125 Order. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: 7/3/2018 Letter
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Requesting Extension of Time to File Motion to Seal. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting Sanofi and Mylan a one week extension to amend pleadings until 7/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/29/2018. (sm) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TEXT ORDER: At the parties request, Oral Argument (see ECF No. 119), will be rescheduled to July 12, 2018 at 10 AM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/2/18. (tjg, ) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Letter
Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J.. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting a two-week extension of time until 7/6/2018 for Mylan GmbH to file a Motion to Seal certain documents relating to its Motion for Leave to Amend its Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/25/2018. (sm) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 Letter
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re 119 Order. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018 Letter
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Requesting Extension of Time to File Motion to Seal re 113 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, 111 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, 105 Brief in Support of Motion,, 102 Exhibit (to Document),, 103 Brief in Support of Motion,,. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/19/2018 Letter
Letter from Liza M. Walsh re 117 Letter,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-9)(WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold Oral Argument on the Motion to Amend (ECF No. 101) as well as ECF Nos. 112 and 117 on July 24, 2018 at 12:30 PM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/19/18. (tjg, ) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that the request of Defendant Mylan GmbH to submit its response to Plaintiff's letter application 12 by 6/15/2018 is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/14/2018. (sm) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Letter
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re 112 Letter,,. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Redacted Document
REDACTION to 113 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, by MYLAN GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 REDACTED Exhibit A to the Declaration of Nathaniel R. Scharn)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Letter
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Regarding Timing of Mylan GmbH's response to re 112 Letter,,. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018 Declaration
DECLARATION of Nathaniel R. Scharn in support of Mylan GmbH's Reply in support of Motion for Leave to Amend its Invalidity Contentions re 113 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, by MYLAN GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B-D, # 2 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MYLAN GMBH re 101 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Nathaniel R. Scharn)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018 Letter
Letter from Liza M. Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Brief in Opposition to Motion
BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re 101 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Anna E. Dwyer with Exhibits 1-6, # 2 Exhibit 7-8, # 3 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Seal Document
MOTION to Seal Document 92 Letter,, 91 Letter, by MYLAN GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew F. Greinert, Esq., # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER Granting Mylan GMBH Leave To Amend Its Non-Infringement and Invalidity Contentions, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/31/2018. (sm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Redacted Document
REDACTION to 105 Brief in Support of Motion,, 102 Exhibit (to Document),, 103 Brief in Support of Motion,, by MYLAN GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 REDACTED Exhibit 2, # 2 REDACTED Exhibit 3, # 3 REDACTED Exhibit 5, # 4 REDACTED Exhibit 6, # 5 REDACTED Exhibit 7, # 6 REDACTED Exhibit 8, # 7 REDACTED Exhibit 9, # 8 REDACTED Exhibit 10, # 9 REDACTED Exhibit 12)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Letter
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Requesting Extension of Time to File Motion to Seal re 92 Letter,, 91 Letter,. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Letter
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Enclosing Proposed Order Granting Mylan GmbH Leave to Amend its Non-Infringement and Invalidity Contentions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Brief in Support of Motion
BRIEF in Support filed by MYLAN GMBH re 101 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions --Corrected Brief-- (CALMANN, ARNOLD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Letter
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re 103 Brief in Support of Motion,,. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Brief in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Brief in Support of Motion
BRIEF in Support filed by MYLAN GMBH re 101 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions (CALMANN, ARNOLD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Entered: 05/25/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
Exhibit to 101 Motion to Amend/Correct, by MYLAN GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Arthur P. Dykhuis, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit 7, # 5 Exhibit 8, # 6 Exhibit 9, # 7 Exhibit 10, # 8 Exhibit 12)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Entered: 05/24/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions by MYLAN GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Arthur P. Dykhuis, # 2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Arthur P. Dykhuis, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 11, # 5 Exhibit 13, # 6 Exhibit 14, # 7 Text of Proposed Order, # 8 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TEXT ORDER: Motion Schedule for briefing on opposed amendments to invalidity contentions: Opening brief-May 24, 2018; Opposition-June 4, 2018; Reply-June 8, 2018. Plaintiff Sanofi-Aventis has 30 days from May 22, 2018 to respond to unopposed invalidity and non-infringement contentions. Plaintiff has 2 weeks from the Courts decision on the opposed amendments to respond to those amendments in the event they are granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/22/18. (tjg, ) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: 5/22/2018 Letter
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re 98 Letter. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 Letter
Letter from Liza M. Walsh. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting defendant Mylan GmbH a two-week extension of time to file a Motion to Seal portions of Sanofi's 4/30/2018 letter until 5/29/2017, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/16/2018. (sm) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Letter
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Requesting Extension of Time to File Motion to Seal re 92 Letter,, 91 Letter,. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
REDACTION to 92 Letter,, by MYLAN GMBH. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
REDACTION to 91 Letter, by All Plaintiffs. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 5/22/18 at 11:00 AM. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/2/18. (tjg, ) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re 91 Letter,. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Entered: 05/01/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh. (WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. re 89 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 79 Consent MOTION to Seal Document 65 Letter by MYLAN GMBH, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/13/2018. (JB, ) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR on behalf of All Plaintiffs (WALSH, WILLIAM)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to Counterclaim by SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC.(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrew Gesior to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8572322.) (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kathryn Kantha to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8572228.) (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Granting 81 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Regarding Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent for Kathryn Kantha, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/15/2018. (JB, ) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Regarding Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Kathryn Kantha, # 2 Certification of Andrew Gesior, # 3 Supporting Certification of Liza M. Walsh, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael Taylor Dimler, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
Consent MOTION to Seal Document 65 Letter by MYLAN GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew F. Greinert, Esq., # 2 Exhibit 1 - Index in support of Mylan's Unopposed Motion to Seal, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER ORDER Granting 76 Letter from Liza M. Walsh regarding modification to the upcoming deadlines set in the Court's 12/20/2018 scheduling order (Dkt No. 23).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/12/2018. (JB, ) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
REDACTION to 65 Letter by SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice James P.H. Stephens, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Alina Litoshyk, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Nathan R. Scharn, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Arthur P. Dykhuis, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Elham F. Steiner, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Douglas H. Carsten, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 5/2/18 at 2:00 PM. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/2/18. (tjg, ) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq.to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re 65 Letter. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to Complaint, Separate Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC by MYLAN GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: 2/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re 22 Order. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Granting 37 MOTION to Seal Document 28 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, 11 Brief in Support of Motion, 20 Brief in Opposition to Motion, by MYLAN GMBH, MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., etc Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/26/2018. (JB, ) Modified on 2/27/2018 (JB, ). (Entered: 02/27/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Granting 62 APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Taylor Dimler, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/26/2018. (JB, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/24/2018, Entered: 2/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Taylor Dimler, Esq. (On Consent) on behalf of Defendant Mylan GmbH for by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Taylor Dimler, Esq., # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER, that Sanofi hereby dismisses without prejudice its claims as to Mylan N.V. Myland Inc., and Myland Pharmaceuticals Inc., pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(1)(1)(A). Myland N.V. Mylan Inc., and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., including any affiliates or subsidiaries who are in active concert or participation with Mylan N.H., Myland Inc. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., agree to be bound by any judgment, order, and/or decision rendered as to Myland GMbh in the action (including appeals)as if Mylan N.V., Mylan INC. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. were named defendants, etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 2/21/2018. (JB, ) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Anna E. Dwyer to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8482709.) (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Granting 31 APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James P.H. Stephens, Esq. (On Consent) for by MYLAN GMBH, MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/15/2018. (JB, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Granting 19 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Douglas H. Carsten, Esq., Elham F.Steiner, Esq., Nathaniel R. Scharn, Esq., and Alina Litoshyk, Esq. (On Consent) for by MYLAN GMBH, MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/15/2018. (JB, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Granting 40 APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Arthur P. Dykhuis, Esq. (On Consent) for by MYLAN GMBH, MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/15/2018. (JB, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER, that Sanofi hereby dismisses without prejudice its claims as to MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., MYLAN INC. and MYLAN N.V. including any affiliates or subsidiaries, etc. Parties terminated. etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 2/14/2018. (JB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Granting 54 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor Regarding Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent. Anna E. Dwyer, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/13/2018. (JB, ) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor Regarding Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Certification of Liza M. Walsh, # 2 Certification of Anna E. Dwyer, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Discovery Confidentiality Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/7/2018. (JB, ) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh on Behalf of All Parties. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order, # 2 Declaration of Liza M. Walsh in Support of Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order, # 3 Declaration of Matthew F. Greinert in Support of Discovery Confidentiality Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Matthew D. Sieger to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8457848.) (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Christopher M. Pepe to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8457836.) (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Robert T. Vlasis III to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8457824.) (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Aaron L. Pereira to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8457814.) (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Anish Desai to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8457805.) (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Elizabeth S. Weiswasser to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8457784.) (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Stanley R. Chesler, U.S.D.J. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Proposed Order of Dismissal as to Mylan N.V., Mylan Inc., and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.)(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Granting 18 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Regarding Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent of Elizabeth S. Weiswasser, Anish Desai, Aaron L. Pereira, Robert T. Vlasis III, Christopher M. Pepe, Matthew D. Sieger, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/31/2018. (JB, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh re 18 Letter,,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Stipulated-Discovery Plan and Order, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/25/2018. (JB, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER extending deadline to submit the proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order to February 6, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/25/2018. (ld, ) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Arthur P. Dykhuis, Esq. (On Consent) for by MYLAN GMBH, MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Arthur P. Dykhuis, Esq., # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh enclosing Stipulated E-Discovery Plan. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated E-Discovery Plan)(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Seal Document 28 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, 11 Brief in Support of Motion,,, 20 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, by MYLAN GMBH, MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew F. Greinert, Esq. in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Index in support of motion to seal, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER ORDER, that this Court will hereby permit and consider both letter when determining Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for improper venue, lack of subject matter jurisdiction, and failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted (Docket No. 10)., etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 1/18/2018. (JB, ) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Stanley R. Chesler, U.S.D.J. re 33 Letter. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Enclosing Proposed Consent Order Amending Scheduling Order re 23 Scheduling Order. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh re 28 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,,. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re 18 Letter,,. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Audrey Maness)(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: 1/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James P.H. Stephens, Esq. (On Consent) for by MYLAN GMBH, MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James P.H. Stephens, Esq., # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: 1/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
REDACTION to 28 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, by MYLAN GMBH, MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. in support of Defendants' Reply Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss re 28 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, by MYLAN GMBH, MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MYLAN GMBH, MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Improper Venue, Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim (CALMANN, ARNOLD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Graning 25 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Stanley R. Chesler, U.S.D.J. Requesting Extension of Time for Defendants to file Reply in further support of Motion to Dismiss re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Improper Venue, Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim. from 12/26/2017 until 1/5/2018. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 1/2/2018. (JB, ) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh re 20 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,. (Attachments: # 1 3G Licensing, S.A. v. HTC Corp, No. 17-83 (D. Del. Dec. 18, 2017))(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Stanley R. Chesler, U.S.D.J. Requesting Extension of Time for Defendants to file Reply in further support of Motion to Dismiss re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Improper Venue, Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
REDACTION to 20 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, 21 Declaration, by SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Exhibits 3 - 4 to the Declaration of Liza M. Walsh)(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amended Pleadings due by 8/13/2018. Fact discovery due by 12/7/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 8/13/2018. etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/19/2017. (sms) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 3/1/18 at 3:00 PM. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/19/17. (tjg, ) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: 12/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Liza M. Walsh with Exhibits 1 - 2 re 20 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, by SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 5 - 10 to the Declaration of Liza M. Walsh, # 2 Certificate of Service)(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: 12/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
BRIEF in Opposition filed by SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Improper Venue, Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim (Confidential Version) (Attachments: # 1 Confidential Exhibits 3 - 4 to the Declaration of Liza M. Walsh)(WALSH, LIZA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Douglas H. Carsten, Esq., Elham F.Steiner, Esq., Nathaniel R. Scharn, Esq., and Alina Litoshyk, Esq. (On Consent) for by MYLAN GMBH, MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas H. Carsten, Esq., # 2 Declaration of Elham F. Steiner, Esq., # 3 Declaration of Nathaniel R. Scharn, Esq., # 4 Declaration of Alina Litoshyk, Esq., # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Regarding Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Certification of Liza M. Walsh, # 2 Certification of Elizabeth S. Weiswasser, # 3 Certification of Anish Desai, # 4 Certification of Aaron L. Pereira, # 5 Certification of Robert T. Vlasis III, # 6 Certification of Christopher M. Pepe, # 7 Certification of Matthew D. Sieger, # 8 Certification of Priyata Y. Patel, # 9 Text of Proposed Order on Consent)(WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Improper Venue, Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim . (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
REDACTION to 11 Brief in Support of Motion,,, by MYLAN GMBH, MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 REDACTED Declaration of Keith Meckstroth in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR on behalf of MYLAN GMBH, MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (ESCANLAR, KATHERINE)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY S. SOOS on behalf of MYLAN GMBH, MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (SOOS, JEFFREY)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4C on 12/19/17 at 4:15pm. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a Joint Discovery Plan to chambers via email to CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/14/17. (tjg, ) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MYLAN GMBH, MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. identifying Mylan Inc. and Mylan N.V. as Corporate Parent.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Brief in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF in Support filed by MYLAN GMBH, MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Improper Venue, Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Keith Meckstroth in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Entered: 11/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Improper Venue, Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim by MYLAN GMBH, MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Arnold B. Calmann, Esq., # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: 11/8/2017 Unknown Document Type
AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4) (JB, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH. MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. waiver sent on 10/31/2017, answer due 1/1/2018. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH. MYLAN N.V. waiver sent on 10/31/2017, answer due 1/1/2018. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH. MYLAN INC. waiver sent on 10/31/2017, answer due 1/1/2018. (WALSH, LIZA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH. MYLAN GMBH waiver sent on 10/31/2017, answer due 1/1/2018. (WALSH, LIZA) Modified on 11/1/2017 (JB, ).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by KATELYN O'REILLY on behalf of SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC (O'REILLY, KATELYN)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON on behalf of SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC (GANNON, CHRISTINE)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC identifying Sanofi as Corporate Parent.. (WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT against MYLAN GMBH, MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8185795), filed by SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - Y, # 2 Exhibits Z - PP, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 AO120 Patent Form (I of IV), # 5 AO120 Patent Form (II of IV), # 6 AO120 Patent Form (III of IV), # 7 AO120 Patent Form (IV of IV))(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set/Reset Hearings: Markman Hearing set for 1/7/2019 10:00 AM. ORDERED ALL PARTIES TO APPEAR READY TO PROCEED. (tt, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 11/27/2018. (tjg, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Pro Hac Vice fee as to Nicole Stafford, Esq.: $ 150, receipt number NEW037623 (sm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set Deadlines as to 178 MOTION to Seal Document 132 Amended Complaint,,, 151 Answer to Amended Complaint,, 129 Letter,, 149 Answer to Amended Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, . Motion set for 10/15/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set Deadlines as to 172 MOTION to Seal Document 156 Letter, . Motion set for 10/1/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Clerk`s Text Order - The document submitted by SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE to answer, move or otherwise respond to Mylan's Counterclaims has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/24/2018. (sm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 8/2/2018. Court Reporter: ECR. (tjg, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set Deadlines as to 163 MOTION to Seal Document 112 Letter,, 117 Letter,, 120 Letter,, . Motion set for 9/4/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set Deadlines as to 158 MOTION to Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording 142 Transcript, . Motion set for 9/4/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set Deadlines as to 144 Joint MOTION to Seal Document 111 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, 105 Brief in Support of Motion,, 102 Exhibit (to Document),, 103 Brief in Support of Motion,, 113 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, . Motion set for 8/20/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Opinion read into the record held on 7/16/2018. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tjg, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Discovery Hearing held on 7/12/2018. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tjg, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set Deadlines as to 110 MOTION to Seal Document 92 Letter,, 91 Letter, . Motion set for 7/2/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set Deadlines as to 101 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions. Motion set for 6/18/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 5/22/2018. (tjg, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 5/2/2018. (tjg, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Pro Hac Vice counsel, KATHRYN KANTHA and ANDREW GESIOR, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set Deadlines as to 79 Consent MOTION to Seal Document 65 Letter . Motion set for 4/16/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Pro Hac Vice counsel, MICHAEL TAYLOR DIMLER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Clerk`s Text Order - The document 75 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SANOFI WINTHROP INDUSTRIE, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/4/2018. (JB, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Pro Hac Vice fee: for the admission of Michael T. Dimber $ 150, receipt number NEW035811 (JB, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Pro Hac Vice counsel, JAMES P.H. STEPHENS, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Pro Hac Vice counsel, DOUGLAS H. CARSTEN, ELHAM F. STEINER, ARTHUR P DYKHUIS, NATHANIEL R. SCHARN, ESQ and ALINA LITOSHYK, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 3/1/2018. (tjg, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Pro Hac Vice fee: for the admission of Arthur P. Dykhuis $ 150, receipt number NEW035754 (JB, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Pro Hac Vice fee: for the admission of James P.H. Stephens, Esq. $ 150, receipt number NEW035757 (JB, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Pro Hac Vice fee: for the admission of Douglas H. Carsten, Esq., Elham F. Steiner, Esq., Nathan R. Scharn, Esq., and Alina Litoshyk, Esq., $ 600.00, receipt number NEW035755 (JB, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Pro Hac Vice counsel, ANNA E. DWYER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Pro Hac Vice counsel, ELIZABETH S. WEISWASSER, ANISH DESAI, AARON PEREIRA, ROBERT T. VLASIS, III, CHRISTOPER PEPE and MATHEW D. SIEGER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stanley R. Chesler: Status Conference held on 2/1/2018. COUNSEL INDICATED MOTION DOC. 10 IS MOOT. (tt, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set/Reset Deadlines as to 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Improper Venue, Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim. Motion set for 2/1/2018 10:30 AM before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. ORDERED ALL PARTIES TO APPEAR READY TO PROCEED (tt, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set Deadlines as to 37 MOTION to Seal Document 28 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, 11 Brief in Support of Motion,,, 20 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, . Motion set for 2/20/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/19/2017. (tjg, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set/Reset Deadlines as to 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Improper Venue, Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim. Motion set for 12/18/2017 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice of Judicial Preferences. Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 20 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?