Brite Financial Services, LLC v. Bobby's Towing Service, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-13516-AC-MKM
District Judge Avern Cohn, presiding

Tags
Last Updated February 18, 2021 at 1:47 PM ST (2.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brite Financial Services, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by katz2law.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason M. Katz +1 248 702 6310 +1 248 702 6311 jkatz@katz2law.com
v.
No Logo Bobby's Towing Service, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc A. Deldin +1 586 741 8116 +1 586 690 4130 marc@deldinlaw.com
No Logo Denise Boyce-Hardison, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc A. Deldin +1 586 741 8116 +1 586 690 4130 marc@deldinlaw.com
No Logo Robert L Hardison, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc A. Deldin +1 586 741 8116 +1 586 690 4130 marc@deldinlaw.com
Office Detroit
Filed 10/27/2017
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Wayne
Terminated
Origin 2
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case 17119492GZ[36th District Court]
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (86) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: None Judgment*
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: None Judgment*
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/3/2020, Entered: None Leave to File
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Joinder/Concurrence
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Declaratory Judgment
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Withdrawal of Attorney
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Petition/Request/Application
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/31/2019, Entered: None Withdrawal of Attorney
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None Joinder/Concurrence
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: None Declaratory Judgment
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: None Appear*
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Appear*
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint, Amended
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Appear*
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Withdraw
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Leave to File
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint, Amended
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/30/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/18/2018 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 6/18/2018 Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2018 02:00 PM before District Judge Avern Cohn Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (Refer to image for additional dates) (MVer)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Notice of Remand
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE remanding case to 36TH DISTRICT COURT. (DPer)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Order Partially Remanding CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction and remanding state law claims to 36th District Court. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (DPer)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Avern Cohn: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/18/2018 (MVer)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Brite Financial Services, LLC (Katz, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference IS RESCHEDULED AS A PHONE CONFERENCE ON 1/18/2018 10:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled
                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 1/19/2018 is Cancelled re [4] Notice to Appear (MVer)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 1/19/2018 10:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Deldin, Marc) Modified on 12/7/2017 (DWor). [DOCUMENT ENTITLED "DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES"]
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/2/2017 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bobby's Towing Service, LLC (Deldin, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017 notice of removal
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from 36th District Court, case number 17119492GZ. Receipt No: 0645-6456486 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3) (Deldin, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (Krause, S)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?