Landmark Technology LLC v. Gensco, Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-05872
District Judge Ronald B. Leighton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 5:55 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Landmark Technology, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ali Shalchi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ali Shalchi

Toggle Switch Represented by Banie & Ishimoto LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer L. Ishimoto +1 650 549 5660 +1 415 665 2520 ishimoto@banishlaw.com
Space John Alexander Lee +1 650 549 5660 +1 415 665 2520 jlee@banishlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Alexander Lee +1 650 549 5660 +1 415 665 2520 jlee@banishlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Charles Ainsworth

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Ainsworth

Toggle Switch Represented by Colucci & Umans, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder fcolucci@colucci-umans.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gregory S Cordrey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory S Cordrey

Toggle Switch Represented by Provost Umphrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andy Tindel +1 903 596 0900 +1 903 596 0909 atindel@andytindel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert Christopher Bunt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Christopher Bunt

Toggle Switch Represented by Sand & Sebolt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard L. Wernow +1 330 244 1174 +1 330 244 1173 howardw@sandandsebolt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stanley M Gibson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stanley M Gibson
v.
No Logo Gensco, Inc, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Court Filing
ORDER on STIPULATION re 30 DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE without fees or costs to any party; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Dismiss
    Joint MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Landmark Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/30/2018, (Lee, John)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      MINUTE ORDER - Plaintiff's counsel notified the Court of Settlement; all pending motions and trial dates are stricken; dismissal papers will be due by 7/6/18, if additional time is needed, please contact the Court at 253-882-3842; as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        PROTECTIVE ORDER - STIPULATED; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER For Protective Order by parties (Lee, John) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Landmark Technology, LLC, TO 23 RESPONSE to 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (PARTIAL RE AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS) (Lee, John) Modified on 4/27/2018 (SP). (Entered: 04/13/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Landmark Technology, LLC, TO 23 RESPONSE to 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (PARTIAL RE AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS) (Lee, John) Modified on 4/26/2018 (SP). (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER granting 20 State of Washington's Motion to Intervene; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  RESPONSE, by Defendant Gensco, Inc, to 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (PARTIAL RE AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS). (Hodges, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting 21 Stipulated Motion re 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (PARTIAL RE AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS) : Noting Date 4/13/2018; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) (Main Document 22 replaced on 3/21/2018) (DN). (Entered: 03/21/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Joint Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadlines, filed by Defendant Gensco, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/20/2018, (Hodges, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION to Intervene, filed by Interested Party State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/30/2018, (Colgan, Seann) Modified on 3/27/2018: amended text to correct filer (CMG). (Entered: 03/15/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (PARTIAL RE AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS), filed by Counter Defendant Landmark Technology, LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/30/2018, (Lee, John) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, Amended COUNTERCLAIM Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement and First Amended Counterclaims against plaintiff Landmark Technology, LLC by Gensco, Inc. (Hodges, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *FIVE DAYS*. Jury Trial is set for 9/3/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom B before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Statement of asserted claims and preliminary infringement contentions due 8/31/2018, Statement of preliminary invalidity contentions due 9/20/2018, Reports from expert witnesses regarding Markman issues due 10/17/2018, Joinder of Parties due by 11/2/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 11/13/2018, Rebuttal expert reports regarding Markman issues due 11/20/2018, Proposed terms and Claim Elements and Preliminary Claim Chart due 11/30/2018, Joint claim chart due 12/31/2018, Opening claim construction briefs due 1/14/2019, Responsive claim construction briefs due 1/28/2019, Markman Hearing set for 2/19/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ronald B. Leighton, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/8/2019, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 4/8/2019, Motions due by 4/15/2019, Discovery completed by 5/6/2019, Dispositive motions due by 6/3/2019, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 7/29/2019, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 8/6/2019, Motions in Limine due by 8/6/2019, Pretrial Order due by 8/22/2019, Trial briefs to be submitted by 8/29/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 8/29/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Authorized by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 4-5. (Lee, John) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (PARTIAL), filed by Counter Defendant Landmark Technology, LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/23/2018, (Lee, John) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Gensco, Inc (Hodges, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement and Declaratory Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 6,289,319 and unfair competition against plaintiff Landmark Technology, LLC by Gensco, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hodges, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting 11 Stipulated Motion; Gensco, Inc answer due 1/5/2018. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Joint Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline, filed by Defendant Gensco, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/20/2017, (Hodges, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin J Hodges on behalf of Defendant Gensco, Inc. (Hodges, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Jared Aurand on 11/7/2017, filed by Plaintiff Landmark Technology, LLC. (Lee, John) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/29/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/16/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/22/2018, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald B. Leighton for all further proceedings. Judge Robert J. Bryan no longer assigned to case. s/Tyler Campbell, as directed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Cc to RBL. (TC) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Gensco, Inc. (CMG) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent. E-mailed to the U.S. Patent Office. (DJ) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Landmark Technology LLC (Lee, John) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Landmark Technology LLC (Lee, John) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Gensco, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5064837) Attorney John A Lee added to party Landmark Technology LLC(pty:pla), filed by Landmark Technology LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Lee, John) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE TO FILER: The incorrect divisional office was selected upon case opening (CV17-1580). This case is now assigned a Tacoma case number and judge. All future documents shall bear the following: CV17-5872-RJB. In the future before opening a new case, filer is directed to read the Attorney Case Opening instructions to confirm the correct jurisdictional district. Thank you. (DJ)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  PLEASE DISREGARD: filed in error NOTICE to Filer: SUMMONS FORM INCORRECT: The summons form you submitted has the incorrect case number. Please resubmit your summons form with the correct case number and the summons will be issued. Thank you (DJ) Modified on 10/26/2017: Notice stricken as summons corrected and issued. (CMG).
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    PLEASE DISREGARD: posted in error NOTICE to Filer: JURY DEMAND: The Clerk has removed plaintiff's jury demand flag entered by counsel upon case opening. Pursuant to LCR 101, plaintiff(s) counsel must now file a separate Jury Demand in order to advise the court of this request. Thank you. (DJ) Modified on 10/26/2017: Jury Demand Flag re-instated, opening document is not a removal (CMG).
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re Notices to Filer: Stricken as the Summons was corrected & issued; and Jury Demand flag was re-instated - initiating document is a complaint and not a removal from state court. (CMG)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?