Robert Schultz, Jr. v. Midland Credit Management
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 17-2244

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 15, 2018 at 6:21 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012756040 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellee Midland Credit Management, filed. Certificate of Service dated 10/18/2017 by ECF. (JDB)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012727463 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellee Midland Credit Management for Extension of Time to file Appellee's Brief until/for 21 days. Certificate of Service dated 09/15/2017. Service made by ECF. (EBS)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012713778 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Cary L. Flitter on behalf of Appellant(s) Robert A. Schultz and Donna L. Schultz, on behlaf of themselves and all other similary situated. (CLF)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012711976 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellants Donna Schultz and Robert A. Schultz, Jr., filed. Certificate of Service dated 08/28/2017 by ECF. (AMM)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012711998 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Donna Schultz and Robert A. Schultz, Jr., filed. Certificate of service dated 08/28/2017 by ECF. (AMM)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012709367 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Yongmoon Kim on behalf of Appellant(s) Robert A. Schultz, Jr., and Donna L. Schultz, on behalf of themselves and those similarly situated. (YK)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012756040 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellee Midland Credit Management, filed. Certificate of Service dated 10/18/2017 by ECF. (JDB)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012727463 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellee Midland Credit Management for Extension of Time to file Appellee's Brief until/for 21 days. Certificate of Service dated 09/15/2017. Service made by ECF. (EBS)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012713778 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Cary L. Flitter on behalf of Appellant(s) Robert A. Schultz and Donna L. Schultz, on behlaf of themselves and all other similary situated. (CLF)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012711998 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Donna Schultz and Robert A. Schultz, Jr., filed. Certificate of service dated 08/28/2017 by ECF. (AMM)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012711976 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellants Donna Schultz and Robert A. Schultz, Jr., filed. Certificate of Service dated 08/28/2017 by ECF. (AMM)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012709367 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Yongmoon Kim on behalf of Appellant(s) Robert A. Schultz, Jr., and Donna L. Schultz, on behalf of themselves and those similarly situated. (YK)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 20 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?